Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 107 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17910 Week
» 70926 Month
» 190453 Year
» 3217306 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Nuneaton
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Nuneaton |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 4 | 01/01/1890 | 31/12/1922 | W4 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 2D | 01/01/1923 | 30/06/1950 | 2B | 01/07/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 5E | 01/09/1963 | 31/05/1966 |
|
Date Opened |
13/07/1847 |
Date Closed |
06/06/1966 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in the fork of the main and Coventry lines south of the
station. The yard is visible from both lines.
Leave Nuneaton Trent Valley Station by the west exit into Broad
Street. Turn left almost immediately into Regent Street. and left into
Wheat Street. Just before the railway bridge, a cinder path leads from
the right hand side of this road, along the back of a row of houses to the
shed. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 13/07/1847 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 2D | 01/07/1950 | Change of code to 2B | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 5E | 06/06/1966 | Depot closed |
|
|
|