Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 270 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5848 Week
» 25581 Month
» 322595 Year
» 399182 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Aberdare


Depot Details
Depot Name Aberdare
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
26187531/01/1946
ABDR01/01/190831/01/1950
86J01/02/195009/09/1960
88J10/09/196028/02/1965
Date Opened 1867
Date Closed 01/03/1965
Big 4 Company GWR
British Railways Region WR
GWR Division NEWPORT
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the line west of Aberdare H.L. Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left out of the short approach road to Aberdare H.L. Station. After a few yards turn left again into the goods yard. A cinder path leads through this goods yard to the shed.
Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1867Depot opened
1875Change of code to 26
01/01/1908Change of code to ABDR
01/02/1950Change of code to 86J
10/09/1960Change of code to 88J
01/03/1965Depot closed