Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Perth South


Depot Details
Depot Name Perth South
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
29A01/05/193831/01/1950
63A01/02/195031/05/1967
PH06/05/1973
Date Opened 14/05/1938
Date Closed 05/10/1969
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region ScR
Information Replaced an earlier shed going back to Caledonian Railway days
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the line about one mile south of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

Leave the General Station by the main exit, and cross the station yard into Kings Place. Continue into Marshal Place, and turn right into Edinburgh Road (A90). Continue along this road for about ¾ mile, cross the railway bridge, and the shed yard will be seen on the left hand side. Walking time 25 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
01/05/1938Change of code to 29A
14/05/1938Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 63A
14/05/1967Closed to steam locomotives
05/10/1969Depot closed
06/05/1973Change of code to PH