Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Ramsgate


Depot Details
Depot Name Ramsgate
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
RAM187531/01/1950
74B01/02/195030/09/1958
73G01/10/195805/05/1973
RM06/05/197330/11/1976
RE01/12/197631/08/1999
RM01/09/1999
Big 4 Company SR
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the line west of the station. The yard is partially visible from the line.

Bear right from the station approach to Wilfred Road, and almost immediately turn right along a cinder path oarallel to the railway. Turn right into Newington Road at the end of the path. The shed entrance is a gate on the right hand side just p at the railway underbridge. Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to RAM
01/02/1950Change of code to 74B
01/10/1958Change of code to 73G
06/05/1973Change of code to RM
01/12/1976Change of code to RE
01/09/1999Change of code to RM