Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1066 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14472 Week
» 67488 Month
» 187015 Year
» 3213868 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Reddish
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Reddish |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | RS | 1875 | | 39a | 01/06/1954 | 31/01/1958 | 9h | 01/02/1958 | 19/04/1958 | 9g | 20/04/1958 | 08/09/1963 | 9C | 01/09/1963 | 05/05/1973 |
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to RS | 01/06/1954 | Change of code to 39a | 01/02/1958 | Change of code to 9h | 20/04/1958 | Change of code to 9g | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 9C |
|
|
|