Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Barrow in Furness


Depot Details
Depot Name Barrow in Furness
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
11B01/02/193531/03/1958
11A01/04/195831/05/1960
12E01/06/196031/08/1963
12C01/09/196305/05/1973
BW06/05/1973
Date Opened 1874
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
Information Originally built by the Furness Railway
1947 Directions The shed adjoins the old Furness Railway Works close to the docks.

Cross the station yard, turn left across Abbey Road into Rawlinson Street, continue for about a mile, and turn right at the end into Salthouse Road. A path leads through the old Furness Railway Works to the shed, from a lodge gate on the left hand side. Walking time 30 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1874Depot opened
1875Change of code to 11B
01/04/1958Change of code to 11A
01/06/1960Change of code to 12E
01/09/1963Change of code to 12C
12/12/1966Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to BW