Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 308 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14351 Week
» 79305 Month
» 281969 Year
» 3308822 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Skipton
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Skipton |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 30 | 1875 | 31/12/1922 | M30 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 20F | 01/01/1923 | 31/05/1950 | 23A | 01/06/1950 | 06/10/1951 | 20F | 07/10/1951 | 31/01/1957 | 24G | 01/02/1957 | 31/08/1963 | 10G | 01/09/1963 | 31/03/1967 |
|
Date Opened |
1877 |
Date Closed |
03/04/1967 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the main line west of the station.
The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside the station. Proceed up the slope (Carleton New
Road) on the right hand side of the main road, and turn left over the
railway bridge. Almost immediately after crossing the railway turn right
into a lane running parallel with the line. The shed entrance is on the
right hand side. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 30 | 1877 | Depot opened | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M30 | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 20F | 01/06/1950 | Change of code to 23A | 07/10/1951 | Change of code to 20F | 01/02/1957 | Change of code to 24G | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 10G | 03/04/1967 | Depot closed |
|
|
|