Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 50 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17853 Week
» 70869 Month
» 190396 Year
» 3217249 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Springs Branch (Wigan)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 25 | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W25 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 10A | 01/01/1923 | 31/03/1958 | 8F | 21/03/1958 | 05/05/1973 | SP | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the main line about one mile South of
Wigan, North Western Station. The yard is partially visible from the line.
Turn right outside Wigan North Western Station into Wallgate, and
turn right into King Street. Continue into Darlington Street, and turn
right into Warrington Lane. Continue along Warrington Road for about
one mile, and turn right into Morris Street. The shed entrance is at the
end of this cul-de-sac. Walking time 30 minutes. |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 10A | 21/03/1958 | Change of code to 8F | 04/12/1967 | Closed to steam locomotives | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to SP |
|
|
|