Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 289 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18092 Week
» 71108 Month
» 190635 Year
» 3217488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: St Albans
Depot Details
Depot Name |
St Albans |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 15S | 1875 | 31/12/1922 | M15S | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 14C | 01/01/1923 | 11/01/1960 |
|
Date Opened |
1868 |
Date Closed |
11/01/1960 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the main line south of St. Albans City
Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn right out of St. Albans City Station yard over Grimston Road
railway bridge. Turn first right into a rough road. A cinder path leads
from this road to the shed. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1868 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 15S | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M15S | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 14C | 11/01/1960 | Depot closed |
|
|
|