Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 555 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 4017 Week
» 23750 Month
» 320764 Year
» 397351 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bath Green Park (S&D)


Depot Details
Depot Name Bath Green Park (S&D)
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
8B187531/12/1910
8a01/01/191131/12/1922
M8B01/01/192331/01/1935
22C01/02/193528/02/1948
71G01/03/194831/01/1958
82F01/02/195828/02/1966
Date Opened 04/08/1869
Date Closed 07/03/1966
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region WR
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the line west of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn right outside Bath L.M.S. Station along Midland Road. Turn right into Lower Bristol Road and right again into Bridge Road. A. cinder path leads to the shed from the right hand side of this road just past the railway bridge. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
04/08/1869Depot opened
1875Change of code to 8B
01/01/1911Change of code to 8a
01/01/1923Change of code to M8B
01/01/1935Change of code to 22C
01/03/1948Change of code to 71G
01/02/1958Change of code to 82F
07/03/1966Depot closed