Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3490 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16896 Week
» 69912 Month
» 189439 Year
» 3216292 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Staveley (G.C.)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Staveley (G.C.) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | STV | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 38D | 01/02/1950 | 30/06/1958 | 41H | 01/05/1958 | 20/05/1965 |
|
Date Opened |
01/06/1892 |
Date Closed |
14/06/1965 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MSLR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line south of Staveley Town
Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Cross the main road outside Staveley Town Station, and proceed
down the roadway of railway cottages on the east side of the line. Turn
right into an opening where the roadway bends to the left. Ascend the
railway embankment on the left hand side just before the railway overbridge. This embankment is the top of the shed yard. Walking time 5 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to STV | 01/06/1892 | Depot opened | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 38D | 01/05/1958 | Change of code to 41H | 14/06/1965 | Depot closed |
|
|
|