Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 255 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1541 Week
» 29015 Month
» 326029 Year
» 402616 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bedford


Depot Details
Depot Name Bedford
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
14187531/12/1922
M1401/01/192331/01/1935
15D01/02/193531/03/1958
14E01/04/195831/08/1963
14C01/09/196331/10/1971
BE06/05/1973
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the avoiding line south of Midland Road Station. The yard is visible from the main line.

Turn sharp right into Midland Road from Bedford Midland Road Station yard. Cross both sets of lines by means of the long road bridge and the shed entrance, is on the left hand side just past the avoiding line. Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 14
01/01/1923Change of code to M14
01/01/1935Change of code to 15D
01/04/1958Change of code to 14E
08/1963Closed to steam locomotives
01/09/1963Change of code to 14C
06/05/1973Change of code to BE