Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 321 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18124 Week
» 71140 Month
» 190667 Year
» 3217520 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Truro
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Truro |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | TR (213) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 83F | 01/02/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 84C | 01/09/1963 | 30/09/1965 |
|
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
GWR Division |
NEWTON ABBOT |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line west of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside the station along Station Road. Turn right
over the railway bridge at the top of the hill, and right again just the
other side. A path leads from the right-hand side of this road to the
shed. Walking time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 213 | 1875 | Change of code to TR | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 83F | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 84C |
|
|
|