Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 17 Today
» 772 Yesterday
» 3439 Week
» 15217 Month
» 304609 Year
» 815711 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Wath


Depot Details
Depot Name Wath
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
36b01/04/195230/06/1958
41f01/07/195803/11/1963
41C04/11/196305/05/1973
WH06/05/1973
Date Closed 01/1983
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
01/04/1952Change of code to 36b
01/07/1958Change of code to 41f
04/11/1963Change of code to 41C
06/05/1973Change of code to WH
01/1983Depot closed