Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 711 Today
» 863 Yesterday
» 2435 Week
» 12570 Month
» 328801 Year
» 839903 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Wellingborough


Depot Details
Depot Name Wellingborough
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
13187531/12/1922
M1301/01/192331/01/1935
15A01/02/193531/08/1963
15B01/09/196330/09/1968
WO06/05/1973
Date Opened 1868
Date Closed 29/03/1969
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the main line north of Wellingborough Midland Road Station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn right out of Wellingborough Midland Road Station yard along a cinder path running parallel to the railway. Turn right at the end of this path over Mill Road railway bridge. The shed entrance is on the left hand side, just past the bridge. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1868Depot opened
1875Change of code to 13
01/01/1923Change of code to M13
01/01/1935Change of code to 15A
01/09/1963Change of code to 15B
13/06/1966Closed to steam locomotives
29/03/1969Depot closed
06/05/1973Change of code to WO