Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 255 Today
» 1286 Yesterday
» 1541 Week
» 29015 Month
» 326029 Year
» 402616 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Belle Vue


Depot Details
Depot Name Belle Vue
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
21187531/12/1922
M2101/01/192331/01/1935
19E01/02/193531/01/1950
13B01/01/195030/04/1950
26G01/05/195030/09/1955
26F01/10/195516/04/1956
Date Opened 1870
Date Closed 16/04/1956
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is in the fork of the Ashburys-Belle Vue L.M.S. and Ashburys-Gorton L.N.E. lines. The yard is visible from the Gorton line.

Turn right outside Belle Vue Station into Station Road. Turn right into Church Lane at the large road junction at the end of Station Road. Turn left into Taylor Street, left into Gorton Lane, and right into Preston Street. A path leads to the shed from the left hand side, just before the railway over-bridge. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1870Depot opened
1875Change of code to 21
01/01/1923Change of code to M21
01/01/1935Change of code to 19E
01/01/1950Change of code to 13B
01/05/1950Change of code to 26G
01/10/1955Change of code to 26F
16/04/1956Depot closed