Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 97 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 2032 Week
» 17034 Month
» 361213 Year
» 872315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Westhouses


Depot Details
Depot Name Westhouses
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
18B187531/08/1963
16G01/09/196303/10/1966
WU06/05/197304/01/1975
WT05/01/1975
Date Opened 1890
Date Closed 03/10/1966
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the line, south of the station, adjacent to the Blackwell Colliery Branch. The yard is parfially visible from the main line.

Turn left outside Westhouses and Blackwell Station along the main road. Turn left again after a short distance along a rough path. This leads under the main line and the Blackwell Colliery branch to the shed. Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 18B
1890Depot opened
01/09/1963Change of code to 16G
03/10/1966Depot closed
06/05/1973Change of code to WU
05/01/1975Change of code to WT