Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 755 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14161 Week
» 67177 Month
» 186704 Year
» 3213557 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Wrexham Rhosddu
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | WRX | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 6E | 01/02/1950 | 31/01/1958 | 84K | 01/02/1958 | 31/12/1959 |
|
Date Opened |
01/01/1866 |
Date Closed |
04/01/1960 |
Pre Grouping Company |
WMCQR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
Information |
Originally opened by the Wrexham, Mold & Connah's Quay Railway, the depot became a Great Central shed on the acquisition of the former company by the latter. In 1923, the GCR was taken over by the LNER which resulted in the curious paradox of a Welsh depot belonging to the London and North Eastern Railway! |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line north of Wrexham
Exchange Station. At this point the L.N.E. and G.W. lines are running parallel, and the yard is visible from both lines.
Turn right outside the main entrance to the G.W.R. Station, and
turn right into Mold Road crossing the railway. Leave the down side
of the G.W.R. Station or the L.N.E. Station by the joint approach,
and turn right into Mold Road. Turn first right along a road running
parallel to the railway. A broad path leads up a short bank to the
shed, opposite the end of this road. Walking time 10 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 01/01/1866 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to WRX | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 6E | 01/02/1958 | Change of code to 84K | 04/01/1960 | Depot closed |
|
|
|