Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 13 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 4935 Week
» 27916 Month
» 391161 Year
» 467748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bescot


Depot Details
Depot Name Bescot
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
601/01/189231/12/1922
W601/01/192331/01/1935
3A01/02/193531/03/1960
21B01/04/196031/08/1963
2F01/09/196305/05/1973
BS06/05/1973
Date Opened 1892
Pre Grouping Company LNWR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is at the north end of the station on the west side of the line. The yard is visible from the line.

A cinder path leads over two footbridges, from the station entrance to the shed. Walking time less than 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1892Depot opened
01/01/1935Change of code to 3A
01/04/1960Change of code to 21B
01/09/1963Change of code to 2F
28/03/1966Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to BS