Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Birkenhead Mollington Street


Depot Details
Depot Name Birkenhead Mollington Street
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
24187531/01/1946
BHD187531/01/1950
1801/01/187531/12/1922
W1801/01/192331/01/1935
6C01/02/193531/08/1963
8H01/09/196305/05/1973
BC06/05/197324/11/1985
Date Opened 1878
Date Closed 24/11/1985
Pre Grouping Company LNWR/GWR
Big 4 Company LMS/GWR
British Railways Region LMR
GWR Division WOLVERHAMPTON
Information Joint LMS/GWR depot
1947 Directions The shed is at the end of a spur off the Chester line. The top of the yard is visible from the line.

Turn right outside Birkenhead Woodside Station, along Chester Street. Turn right into Grange Road, and left into Argyle Street. Continue along Argyle Street South (past Birkenhead Central Station, Mersey Railway) and turn left into Mollington Street. The shed entrance is the left-hand door at the end of this cul-de-sac. Walking time: Woodside, 15 minutes; Central, 5 minutes. This shed is next door to the L.M.S. shed.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to BHD
1875Change of code to 24
1878Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 6C
01/09/1963Change of code to 8H
06/11/1967Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to BC
24/11/1985Depot closed