Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 269 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5847 Week
» 25580 Month
» 322594 Year
» 399181 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bletchley


Depot Details
Depot Name Bletchley
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
301/01/187531/12/1922
W301/01/192331/01/1935
2B01/02/193530/06/1950
4A01/07/195029/02/1952
1E01/03/195205/05/1973
BY06/05/1973
Pre Grouping Company LNWR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the main line just north of the station. The yard is visible from the main line.

The shed entrance is a gate in the station yard.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 2B
01/07/1950Change of code to 4A
01/03/1952Change of code to 1E
05/07/1965Closed to steam locomotives
06/05/1973Change of code to BY