Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 140 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2413 Week
» 22146 Month
» 319160 Year
» 395747 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Balloch


Depot Details
Depot Name Balloch
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
Efd15/07/185031/01/1950
65I01/02/195030/09/1961
Date Opened 15/07/1850
Date Closed 30/09/1961
Pre Grouping Company CDR
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region SCR
Information Originally closed on 7th November, 1960 but reopened a few weeks later in response to the failure of the Glasgow Suburban Electric Trains.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
15/07/1850Depot opened
15/07/1850Change of code to Efd
01/02/1950Change of code to 65I
30/09/1961Depot closed