Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1693 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15099 Week
» 68115 Month
» 187642 Year
» 3214495 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Loch Tay
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Loch Tay |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | Stg | 13/03/1886 | 31/01/1950 | 31b | 13/03/1886 | 01/02/1950 | 63b | 01/02/1950 | 31/05/1960 | 65j | 01/06/1960 | 27/09/1965 |
|
Date Opened |
13/03/1886 |
Date Closed |
27/09/1965 |
Pre Grouping Company |
CR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
ScR |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 13/03/1886 | Depot opened | 13/03/1886 | Change of code to Stg | 13/03/1886 | Change of code to 31b | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 63b | 01/06/1960 | Change of code to 65j | 27/09/1965 | Depot closed |
|
|
|