Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 271 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5849 Week
» 25582 Month
» 322596 Year
» 399183 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bournemouth


Depot Details
Depot Name Bournemouth
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
BM187531/01/1950
71B01/02/195028/09/1963
70F01/09/196305/05/1973
BM06/05/1973
Date Opened 06/03/1888
Date Closed 09/07/1967
Pre Grouping Company LSWR
Big 4 Company SR
British Railways Region SR
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the line west of Bournemouth Central Station. The yard is visible from the line.

Leave Bournemouth Central Station by the approach road, and turn left into Holdenhurst Road. Turn first left into Wellington Road, and left into Beech Road. The shed entrance is on the left hand side just before the railway underbridge. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to BM
06/03/1888Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 71B
01/09/1963Change of code to 70F
09/07/1967Depot closed
06/05/1973Change of code to BM