Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1846 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15252 Week
» 68268 Month
» 187795 Year
» 3214648 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Southwell
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Southwell |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 18S | 1875 | 31/12/1910 | 18d | 01/01/1911 | 31/12/1922 | M18S | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 16a | 01/01/1923 | 08/01/1955 |
|
Date Opened |
07/1847 |
Date Closed |
10/01/1955 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 07/1847 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 18S | 01/01/1911 | Change of code to 18d | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M18S | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 16a | 10/01/1955 | Depot closed |
|
|
|