Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 657 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18460 Week
» 71476 Month
» 191003 Year
» 3217856 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Bourne
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Bourne |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 10B | 16/05/1860 | 31/12/1922 | M10B | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 15c | 01/01/1923 | 1953 |
|
Date Opened |
16/05/1860 |
Date Closed |
1953 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GNR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
Information |
Replaced an earlier depot which was demolished to make way for station alterations |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 16/05/1860 | Depot opened | 16/05/1860 | Change of code to 10B | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M10B | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 15c | 1953 | Depot closed |
|
|
|