Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 13 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 4935 Week
» 27916 Month
» 391161 Year
» 467748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bournville


Depot Details
Depot Name Bournville
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
3B189531/12/1910
3a01/01/191131/12/1922
M3B01/01/192331/01/1935
21B01/02/193514/02/1960
Date Opened 1895
Date Closed 14/02/1960
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the line south of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

Leave the station by the southern exit into Mary Vale Road. A cinder path leads to the shed from a gate on the opposite side of the road. Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 3B
1895Depot opened
01/01/1911Change of code to 3a
01/01/1923Change of code to M3B
01/01/1935Change of code to 21B
14/02/1960Depot closed