Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bradford Hammerton Street


Depot Details
Depot Name Bradford Hammerton Street
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
BFD187531/01/1950
37C01/02/195030/06/1956
56G01/07/195630/11/1967
55F01/12/196705/05/1973
HS01/03/1975
Date Opened 03/1883
Date Closed 1994
Pre Grouping Company GNR
Big 4 Company LNER
British Railways Region ER
1947 Directions The shed is on the south side of the line between St. Dunstans and Laisterdyke. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside Bradford Exchange Station into Leeds Road, and right again into Vicar Lane. Turn left into Bridge Street, and continue into Wakefield Road. Fork left into Bowling Back Lane, and the shed entrance is on the left hand side.
Walking time 15 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to BFD
03/1883Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 37C
01/07/1956Change of code to 56G
1958Closed to steam locomotives
01/12/1967Change of code to 55F
01/03/1975Change of code to HS
1994Depot closed