Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 84 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 84 Week
» 23065 Month
» 386310 Year
» 462897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Brecon


Depot Details
Depot Name Brecon
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
5187531/12/1922
M501/01/192301/01/1935
4c01/02/193531/01/1950
89B01/02/195009/09/1960
88K10/09/196030/11/1962
Date Opened 01/05/1863
Date Closed 31/12/1962
Pre Grouping Company BMR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region WR
GWR Division CENTRAL WALES
1947 Directions The shed is on the south side of the line east of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn left outside the station along the approach road. Continue into Camden Road, and turn left into Free Street. Turn left into Watton and left into the goods yard approach road. This leads to the shed. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
01/05/1863Depot opened
1875Change of code to 5
01/01/1923Change of code to M5
01/01/1935Change of code to 4c
01/02/1950Change of code to 89B
10/09/1960Change of code to 88K
31/12/1962Depot closed