Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 268 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5846 Week
» 25579 Month
» 322593 Year
» 399180 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bristol Barrow Road


Depot Details
Depot Name Bristol Barrow Road
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
8187331/12/1922
M801/01/192331/01/1935
22A01/02/193531/01/1958
82E01/02/195831/10/1965
Date Opened 1873
Date Closed 20/11/1965
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is in the fork of the Mangotsfield-Temple Meads and Mangotsfield-St. Philips lines. The yard is visible from the Temple Meads (main) line.

Go straight ahead outside Bristol Temple Meads Station along the approach road, and turn right into Bath Parade. Continue into Victoria Street, and turn right into Temple Way. Turn right into Old Market Street, continue into West Street, and then Clarence Road. Fork right into Lawrence Hill, and turn right into Barrow Road. The shed entrance is on the right hand side, in the centre of a long bridge. Walking time 20 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1873Depot opened
1873Change of code to 8
01/01/1923Change of code to M8
01/01/1935Change of code to 22A
01/02/1958Change of code to 82E
20/11/1965Depot closed