Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 136 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2409 Week
» 22142 Month
» 319156 Year
» 395743 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bromsgrove


Depot Details
Depot Name Bromsgrove
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
21C187531/01/1958
85F01/02/195809/09/1960
85D10/09/196031/08/1964
Date Opened 24/06/1840
Date Closed 27/09/1964
Pre Grouping Company BGR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region WR
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the line at the south end of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

A path runs from the down platform to the shed.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 21C
01/02/1958Change of code to 85F
10/09/1960Change of code to 85D