Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 909 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14315 Week
» 67331 Month
» 186858 Year
» 3213711 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrap Merchant: Argosy Salvage
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2744 |
29/04/1959 |
03/08/1967 |
8.268 |
0.285 |
|
|
11/1967 |
8.553 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
88 |
30/01/1961 |
23/09/1967 |
6.649 |
0.227 |
|
|
12/1967 |
6.877 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2717 |
23/10/1957 |
03/08/1967 |
9.784 |
0.367 |
|
|
12/1967 |
10.151 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2718 |
30/10/1957 |
03/08/1967 |
9.764 |
0.367 |
|
|
12/1967 |
10.132 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2721 |
27/06/1958 |
03/08/1967 |
9.107 |
0.367 |
|
|
12/1967 |
9.474 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2728 |
20/08/1958 |
03/08/1967 |
8.959 |
0.367 |
|
|
12/1967 |
9.326 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2734 |
17/10/1958 |
16/09/1967 |
8.921 |
0.247 |
|
|
12/1967 |
9.167 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2747 |
15/02/1960 |
02/08/1967 |
7.466 |
0.370 |
|
|
12/1967 |
7.836 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2748 |
19/02/1960 |
03/08/1967 |
7.458 |
0.367 |
|
|
12/1967 |
7.825 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2749 |
26/02/1960 |
03/08/1967 |
7.438 |
0.367 |
|
|
12/1967 |
7.805 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2755 |
11/05/1960 |
03/08/1967 |
7.233 |
0.367 |
|
|
12/1967 |
7.600 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2759 |
06/06/1960 |
09/10/1967 |
7.345 |
0.600 |
|
|
05/1968 |
7.945 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2761 |
23/06/1960 |
09/10/1967 |
7.299 |
0.600 |
|
|
05/1968 |
7.899 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2776 |
31/10/1960 |
09/10/1967 |
6.942 |
0.600 |
|
|
05/1968 |
7.542 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2730 |
19/09/1958 |
09/10/1967 |
9.060 |
0.685 |
|
|
06/1968 |
9.745 |
Diesel |
BR |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2731 |
18/09/1958 |
09/10/1967 |
9.063 |
0.685 |
|
|
06/1968 |
9.748 |