Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1655 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15061 Week
» 68077 Month
» 187604 Year
» 3214457 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Arnott Young Troon
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Steam |
CR |
652 |
0-6-0 |
57633 |
03/1908 |
11/12/1961 |
53.778 |
0.762 |
|
|
09/1962 |
54.540 |
Steam |
CR |
294 |
0-6-0 |
57254 |
08/1884 |
30/07/1962 |
78.005 |
0.296 |
|
|
11/1962 |
78.301 |
Steam |
CR |
294 |
0-6-0 |
57274 |
12/1885 |
30/04/1962 |
76.422 |
0.545 |
|
|
11/1962 |
76.967 |
Steam |
CR |
294 |
0-6-0 |
57300 |
07/1887 |
11/06/1962 |
74.956 |
0.430 |
|
|
11/1962 |
75.386 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40664 |
12/1931 |
16/07/1962 |
30.605 |
0.830 |
|
|
05/1963 |
31.436 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40665 |
12/1931 |
11/06/1962 |
30.510 |
0.926 |
|
|
05/1963 |
31.436 |
Steam |
CR |
294 |
0-6-0 |
57364 |
01/1893 |
04/12/1961 |
68.929 |
1.444 |
|
|
05/1963 |
70.373 |
Steam |
CR |
294 |
0-6-0 |
57262 |
10/1884 |
02/10/1961 |
77.014 |
1.616 |
|
|
05/1963 |
78.630 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40152 |
16/09/1937 |
08/01/1962 |
24.329 |
1.433 |
|
|
06/1963 |
25.762 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40638 |
08/1931 |
21/05/1962 |
30.786 |
1.068 |
|
|
06/1963 |
31.855 |
Steam |
CR |
782 |
0-6-0T |
56312 |
05/1907 |
21/05/1962 |
55.055 |
1.068 |
|
|
06/1963 |
56.123 |
Steam |
CR |
29 |
0-6-0T |
56232 |
11/1895 |
30/04/1962 |
66.499 |
1.126 |
|
|
06/1963 |
67.625 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45157 |
07/1935 |
29/12/1962 |
27.477 |
0.542 |
|
|
07/1963 |
28.019 |
Steam |
NBR |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
65303 |
10/1898 |
29/12/1962 |
64.247 |
0.712 |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
09/1963 |
64.959 |
Steam |
CR |
19 |
0-4-4T |
55124 |
05/1895 |
09/1961 |
66.381 |
2.000 |
|
|
09/1963 |
68.381 |
Steam |
CR |
294 |
0-6-0 |
57252 |
07/1884 |
22/11/1962 |
78.405 |
0.896 |
|
|
10/1963 |
79.301 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45098 |
04/1935 |
29/12/1962 |
27.726 |
0.795 |
|
|
10/1963 |
28.521 |
Steam |
CR |
294 |
0-6-0 |
57348 |
11/1891 |
01/03/1963 |
71.337 |
0.710 |
|
|
11/1963 |
72.047 |
Steam |
CR |
72 |
4-4-0 |
54482 |
07/1920 |
12/03/1962 |
41.685 |
1.679 |
|
|
11/1963 |
43.364 |
Steam |
CR |
72 |
4-4-0 |
54486 |
09/1920 |
12/03/1962 |
41.515 |
1.679 |
|
|
11/1963 |
43.195 |
Steam |
CR |
72 |
4-4-0 |
54489 |
03/1921 |
04/12/1961 |
40.751 |
1.948 |
|
|
11/1963 |
42.699 |
Steam |
CR |
2P |
0-4-4T |
55263 |
05/1925 |
13/11/1961 |
36.523 |
2.005 |
|
|
11/1963 |
38.529 |
Steam |
CR |
2P |
0-4-4T |
55269 |
06/1925 |
26/03/1962 |
36.803 |
1.641 |
|
|
11/1963 |
38.444 |
Steam |
CR |
652 |
0-6-0 |
57643 |
06/1909 |
01/10/1962 |
53.332 |
1.375 |
|
|
02/1964 |
54.707 |
Steam |
NBR |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
65273 |
03/1893 |
07/11/1963 |
70.693 |
0.274 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
02/1964 |
70.967 |
Steam |
CR |
652 |
0-6-0 |
57644 |
06/1909 |
01/10/1962 |
53.332 |
1.375 |
|
|
02/1964 |
54.707 |
Steam |
CR |
812 |
0-6-0 |
57615 |
05/1900 |
05/11/1962 |
62.518 |
1.279 |
|
|
02/1964 |
63.797 |
Steam |
CR |
812 |
0-6-0 |
57614 |
05/1900 |
01/10/1962 |
62.422 |
1.375 |
|
|
02/1964 |
63.797 |
Steam |
CR |
812 |
0-6-0 |
57627 |
11/1899 |
07/11/1963 |
64.019 |
0.274 |
|
|
02/1964 |
64.293 |
Steam |
CR |
812 |
0-6-0 |
57611 |
05/1900 |
12/11/1962 |
62.537 |
1.260 |
|
|
02/1964 |
63.797 |
Steam |
CR |
812 |
0-6-0 |
57569 |
12/1899 |
12/11/1962 |
62.951 |
1.260 |
|
|
02/1964 |
64.211 |
Steam |
CR |
812 |
0-6-0 |
57572 |
12/1899 |
27/06/1963 |
63.573 |
0.638 |
|
|
02/1964 |
64.211 |
Steam |
CR |
812 |
0-6-0 |
57596 |
08/1900 |
01/10/1962 |
62.170 |
1.375 |
|
|
02/1964 |
63.545 |
Steam |
CR |
812 |
0-6-0 |
57590 |
08/1900 |
16/09/1963 |
63.129 |
0.416 |
|
|
02/1964 |
63.545 |
Steam |
CR |
812 |
0-6-0 |
57581 |
04/1900 |
07/11/1963 |
63.605 |
0.274 |
|
|
02/1964 |
63.879 |
Steam |
CR |
652 |
0-6-0 |
57630 |
03/1908 |
14/11/1963 |
55.704 |
0.501 |
|
|
05/1964 |
56.205 |
Steam |
NBR |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
65214 |
01/1890 |
14/11/1963 |
73.877 |
0.501 |
67D |
Ardrossan |
05/1964 |
74.378 |
Steam |
CR |
812 |
0-6-0 |
57600 |
08/1900 |
29/11/1963 |
63.332 |
0.460 |
|
|
05/1964 |
63.792 |
Steam |
CR |
300 |
0-6-0 |
57688 |
12/1919 |
29/11/1963 |
43.986 |
0.460 |
|
|
05/1964 |
44.447 |
Steam |
CR |
294 |
0-6-0 |
57296 |
06/1887 |
29/11/1963 |
76.507 |
0.460 |
|
|
05/1964 |
76.967 |
Steam |
CR |
294 |
0-6-0 |
57249 |
11/1883 |
16/07/1962 |
78.718 |
1.833 |
|
|
05/1964 |
80.551 |
Steam |
CR |
294 |
0-6-0 |
57355 |
11/1894 |
29/11/1963 |
69.082 |
0.545 |
|
|
06/1964 |
69.627 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61243 |
14/10/1947 |
04/05/1964 |
16.567 |
0.197 |
67C |
Ayr |
07/1964 |
16.764 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45158 |
07/1935 |
23/07/1964 |
29.044 |
0.230 |
|
|
10/1964 |
29.274 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45384 |
07/1937 |
29/06/1964 |
26.975 |
0.296 |
|
|
10/1964 |
27.271 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45356 |
05/1937 |
05/1964 |
27.019 |
0.419 |
|
|
10/1964 |
27.438 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46475 |
08/1951 |
30/07/1964 |
12.967 |
0.211 |
|
|
10/1964 |
13.178 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45007 |
04/1935 |
23/07/1964 |
29.293 |
0.315 |
|
|
11/1964 |
29.608 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46409 |
12/1946 |
13/07/1964 |
17.589 |
0.342 |
|
|
11/1964 |
17.932 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46435 |
14/01/1950 |
13/07/1964 |
14.504 |
0.342 |
|
|
11/1964 |
14.847 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46467 |
06/1951 |
23/07/1964 |
13.115 |
0.315 |
|
|
11/1964 |
13.430 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46474 |
08/1951 |
23/07/1964 |
12.948 |
0.315 |
|
|
11/1964 |
13.263 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46255 |
16/10/1946 |
12/09/1964 |
17.921 |
0.258 |
|
|
12/1964 |
18.178 |
Steam |
LMS |
7P |
4-6-0 |
46166 |
06/10/1930 |
19/09/1964 |
33.978 |
0.238 |
|
|
12/1964 |
34.216 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46237 |
09/08/1939 |
12/09/1964 |
25.112 |
0.258 |
|
|
12/1964 |
25.370 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46238 |
14/09/1939 |
12/09/1964 |
25.014 |
0.258 |
|
|
12/1964 |
25.271 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46244 |
12/07/1940 |
12/09/1964 |
24.186 |
0.258 |
|
|
12/1964 |
24.444 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46250 |
20/05/1944 |
12/09/1964 |
20.329 |
0.258 |
|
|
12/1964 |
20.586 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46225 |
11/05/1938 |
12/09/1964 |
26.359 |
0.258 |
|
|
12/1964 |
26.616 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45635 |
24/11/1934 |
12/09/1964 |
29.822 |
0.342 |
|
|
01/1965 |
30.164 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46257 |
19/05/1948 |
12/09/1964 |
16.329 |
0.342 |
|
|
01/1965 |
16.671 |
Steam |
LMS |
7P |
4-6-0 |
46155 |
14/07/1930 |
12/12/1964 |
34.438 |
0.178 |
|
|
02/1965 |
34.616 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT Tank |
2-6-4T |
80030 |
05/02/1952 |
08/06/1964 |
12.348 |
0.690 |
|
|
02/1965 |
13.038 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT Tank |
2-6-4T |
80049 |
24/10/1952 |
08/06/1964 |
11.630 |
0.690 |
|
|
02/1965 |
12.321 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46226 |
23/05/1938 |
12/09/1964 |
26.326 |
0.427 |
|
|
02/1965 |
26.753 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44789 |
05/1947 |
10/12/1964 |
17.586 |
0.260 |
|
|
03/1965 |
17.847 |
Steam |
LMS |
7P |
4-6-0 |
46132 |
11/09/1927 |
01/02/1964 |
36.416 |
1.203 |
|
|
04/1965 |
37.619 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44065 |
10/1925 |
30/01/1965 |
39.321 |
0.205 |
|
|
04/1965 |
39.526 |
Steam |
LMS |
PAT |
4-6-0 |
45527 |
27/03/1933 |
05/12/1964 |
31.715 |
0.359 |
|
|
04/1965 |
32.074 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45613 |
06/08/1934 |
12/09/1964 |
30.123 |
0.589 |
|
|
04/1965 |
30.712 |
Steam |
LMS |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43950 |
1921 |
16/01/1965 |
|
0.326 |
|
|
05/1965 |
|
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42740 |
27/03/1927 |
24/01/1966 |
38.858 |
0.304 |
|
|
05/1966 |
39.162 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42909 |
27/09/1930 |
17/01/1966 |
35.332 |
0.408 |
|
|
06/1966 |
35.740 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42913 |
11/10/1930 |
26/06/1966 |
35.732 |
0.304 |
|
|
10/1966 |
36.036 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42801 |
13/12/1928 |
26/06/1966 |
37.559 |
0.304 |
|
|
10/1966 |
37.863 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT |
2-6-0 |
76108 |
10/08/1957 |
14/07/1966 |
8.932 |
0.340 |
|
|
11/1966 |
9.271 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT |
2-6-0 |
76103 |
21/06/1957 |
17/07/1966 |
9.077 |
0.332 |
|
|
11/1966 |
9.408 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42179 |
01/12/1948 |
06/03/1965 |
16.271 |
1.696 |
|
|
11/1966 |
17.967 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44999 |
03/1947 |
02/09/1966 |
19.482 |
0.203 |
|
|
11/1966 |
19.685 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45016 |
05/1935 |
14/07/1966 |
31.186 |
0.340 |
|
|
11/1966 |
31.526 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45182 |
09/1935 |
12/03/1966 |
30.510 |
0.679 |
|
|
11/1966 |
31.189 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45177 |
09/1935 |
14/07/1966 |
30.849 |
0.422 |
|
|
12/1966 |
31.271 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42917 |
25/10/1930 |
22/08/1966 |
35.849 |
0.315 |
|
|
12/1966 |
36.164 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42863 |
05/04/1930 |
17/08/1966 |
36.392 |
0.414 |
|
|
01/1967 |
36.805 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42702 |
03/09/1926 |
24/01/1966 |
39.419 |
0.975 |
|
|
01/1967 |
40.395 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42861 |
28/03/1930 |
26/06/1966 |
36.271 |
0.641 |
|
|
02/1967 |
36.912 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45186 |
09/1935 |
09/09/1967 |
32.005 |
-0.488 |
|
|
03/1967 |
31.518 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44974 |
05/1946 |
26/06/1966 |
20.129 |
0.803 |
|
|
04/1967 |
20.932 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42919 |
05/11/1930 |
27/10/1966 |
36.000 |
0.466 |
|
|
04/1967 |
36.466 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45160 |
07/1935 |
02/09/1966 |
31.156 |
0.784 |
|
|
06/1967 |
31.940 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45474 |
05/1943 |
02/09/1966 |
23.318 |
0.784 |
|
|
06/1967 |
24.101 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45486 |
10/1943 |
06/12/1965 |
22.159 |
2.274 |
|
|
03/1968 |
24.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46450 |
04/1950 |
17/01/1966 |
15.770 |
2.244 |
|
|
04/1968 |
18.014 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42148 |
03/05/1948 |
19/12/1964 |
16.641 |
3.323 |
|
|
04/1968 |
19.964 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42439 |
24/04/1936 |
14/08/1965 |
29.326 |
2.838 |
|
|
06/1968 |
32.164 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45460 |
10/1938 |
26/06/1965 |
26.715 |
2.973 |
|
|
06/1968 |
29.688 |