Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 264 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 15876 Week
» 114521 Month
» 317185 Year
» 3344038 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Birds at Toton MPD
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56042 |
14/05/1979 |
27/09/1991 |
12.381 |
2.551 |
|
|
04/1994 |
14.932 |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56017 |
13/05/1977 |
08/05/1992 |
14.997 |
2.019 |
|
|
05/1994 |
17.016 |