Scrapyard: Birds Long Marston
Type | Company | Class | Wheels | Number when Cut | Date Built | Date Withdrawn | Service (yrs) | Awaiting Scrap (yrs) | Depot on Withdrawal | Date Scrapped | Age (yrs) | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73049 | 30/12/1953 | 19/03/1965 | 11.225 | 0.241 | 06/1965 | 11.466 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73044 | 09/11/1953 | 19/03/1965 | 11.364 | 0.408 | 08/1965 | 11.773 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82040 | 19/05/1955 | 02/07/1965 | 10.129 | 0.288 | 10/1965 | 10.416 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82039 | 10/05/1955 | 02/07/1965 | 10.153 | 0.288 | 10/1965 | 10.441 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78024 | 05/1954 | 20/02/1965 | 10.778 | 0.649 | 10/1965 | 11.427 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92000 | 05/01/1954 | 02/07/1965 | 11.496 | 0.373 | 11/1965 | 11.868 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78025 | 06/1954 | 13/02/1965 | 10.674 | 0.753 | 11/1965 | 11.427 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61059 | 27/07/1946 | 25/11/1963 | 17.342 | 2.471 | 31B | March | 05/1966 | 19.814 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61281 | 27/01/1948 | 19/02/1966 | 18.077 | 0.233 | 16B | Colwick | 05/1966 | 18.310 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61233 | 10/09/1947 | 25/11/1963 | 16.219 | 2.471 | 31B | March | 05/1966 | 18.690 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61232 | 10/09/1947 | 19/02/1966 | 18.458 | 0.233 | 30F | Parkeston Quay | 05/1966 | 18.690 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61092 | 30/10/1946 | 19/02/1966 | 19.321 | 0.233 | 16B | Colwick | 05/1966 | 19.553 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61024 | 12/04/1947 | 15/05/1966 | 19.104 | 0.167 | 56A | Wakefield | 07/1966 | 19.271 |
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76020 | 18/12/1952 | 23/04/1966 | 13.353 | 0.227 | 07/1966 | 13.581 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61390 | 12/12/1951 | 19/02/1966 | 14.200 | 0.400 | 16B | Colwick | 07/1966 | 14.600 |
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75063 | 13/06/1957 | 28/05/1966 | 8.962 | 0.216 | 08/1966 | 9.178 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75056 | 28/02/1957 | 11/06/1966 | 9.288 | 0.178 | 08/1966 | 9.466 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75045 | 28/09/1953 | 23/04/1966 | 12.575 | 0.312 | 08/1966 | 12.888 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75036 | 14/08/1953 | 11/06/1966 | 12.833 | 0.178 | 08/1966 | 13.011 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61375 | 23/02/1951 | 25/11/1963 | 12.762 | 2.723 | 31B | March | 08/1966 | 15.485 |
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78056 | 08/1956 | 16/07/1966 | 9.923 | 0.334 | 11/1966 | 10.258 | ||
Diesel | BR | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | D2739 | 11/12/1958 | 04/03/1967 | 8.233 | 0.364 | 07/1967 | 8.597 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92138 | 31/07/1957 | 08/07/1967 | 9.942 | 0.438 | 12/1967 | 10.381 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92120 | 28/02/1957 | 08/07/1967 | 10.362 | 0.644 | 28/02/1968 | 11.005 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75002 | 24/08/1951 | 12/08/1967 | 15.978 | 0.548 | 28/02/1968 | 16.526 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75006 | 14/09/1951 | 12/08/1967 | 15.921 | 0.548 | 28/02/1968 | 16.468 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75013 | 11/1951 | 12/08/1967 | 15.751 | 0.548 | 28/02/1968 | 16.299 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75046 | 05/10/1953 | 12/08/1967 | 13.860 | 0.548 | 28/02/1968 | 14.408 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75047 | 16/10/1953 | 12/08/1967 | 13.830 | 0.548 | 28/02/1968 | 14.378 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75052 | 20/12/1956 | 12/08/1967 | 10.649 | 0.548 | 28/02/1968 | 11.197 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75071 | 26/10/1955 | 12/08/1967 | 11.803 | 0.548 | 28/02/1968 | 12.351 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75024 | 18/12/1953 | 11/11/1967 | 13.907 | 0.427 | 8C | Speke Junction | 04/1968 | 14.334 |
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2183 | 20/03/1962 | 21/09/1968 | 6.512 | 0.479 | 03/1969 | 6.992 | ||
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8577 | 18/02/1964 | 02/1969 | 4.997 | 0.244 | 05/1969 | 5.241 | ||
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8576 | 12/02/1964 | 28/02/1969 | 5.049 | 0.208 | 05/1969 | 5.258 | ||
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8570 | 10/01/1964 | 24/11/1968 | 4.877 | 0.471 | 05/1969 | 5.348 | ||
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8564 | 20/12/1963 | 16/02/1969 | 5.164 | 0.241 | 05/1969 | 5.405 | ||
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8560 | 12/11/1963 | 02/1969 | 5.266 | 0.244 | 05/1969 | 5.510 | ||
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2190 | 14/04/1961 | 28/12/1968 | 7.712 | 0.378 | 05/1969 | 8.090 | ||
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8556 | 29/10/1963 | 02/1969 | 5.304 | 0.244 | 05/1969 | 5.548 | ||
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8547 | 27/09/1963 | 02/1969 | 5.392 | 0.244 | 05/1969 | 5.636 | ||
Diesel | BR | 16 | Bo-Bo | D8406 | 16/09/1958 | 30/09/1968 | 10.047 | 0.789 | 07/1969 | 10.836 | ||
Diesel | BR | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2215 | 04/07/1955 | 15/03/1969 | 13.707 | 1.000 | 03/1970 | 14.707 | ||
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2177 | 27/12/1961 | 21/09/1968 | 6.740 | 1.732 | 06/1970 | 8.471 | ||
Diesel | BR | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2859 | 30/12/1960 | 15/03/1970 | 9.211 | 1.085 | 04/1971 | 10.296 | ||
Diesel | BR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12053 | 13/05/1949 | 18/04/1971 | 21.945 | 0.578 | 11/1971 | 22.523 | ||
Diesel | BR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12069 | 04/07/1950 | 14/03/1971 | 20.707 | 1.005 | 03/1972 | 21.712 | ||
Diesel | BR | 35 | B-B | D7075 | 29/03/1963 | 06/05/1973 | 10.112 | 0.696 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 01/1974 | 10.808 |
Diesel | BR | 35 | B-B | D7030 | 19/04/1962 | 06/05/1973 | 11.055 | 0.781 | OC | Old Oak Common | 02/1974 | 11.836 |
Diesel | BR | 35 | B-B | D7044 | 18/08/1962 | 06/05/1973 | 10.723 | 0.781 | OC | Old Oak Common | 02/1974 | 11.504 |
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2114 | 02/07/1959 | 11/05/1968 | 8.866 | 6.685 | 01/1975 | 15.551 | ||
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2188 | 20/03/1961 | 11/05/1968 | 7.148 | 9.773 | 02/1978 | 16.921 | ||
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2194 | 23/05/1961 | 21/09/1968 | 7.337 | 9.737 | 06/1978 | 17.074 | ||
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2187 | 08/03/1961 | 11/05/1968 | 7.181 | 10.101 | 06/1978 | 17.282 | ||
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2185 | 03/05/1962 | 28/12/1968 | 6.660 | 9.468 | 06/1978 | 16.129 | ||
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2146 | 14/02/1961 | 21/09/1968 | 7.605 | 9.819 | 07/1978 | 17.425 | ||
Electric | BR | 84 | Bo-Bo | 84005 | 11/08/1960 | 20/04/1977 | 16.701 | 7.868 | CE | Crewe Electric | 01/03/1985 | 24.570 |
Electric | BR | 84 | Bo-Bo | 84004 | 08/07/1960 | 12/11/1977 | 17.359 | 7.304 | 01/03/1985 | 24.663 | ||
Diesel | BR | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08289 | 28/06/1957 | 22/12/1985 | 28.504 | 1.899 | DY | Derby | 11/1987 | 30.403 |
Diesel | BR | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08243 | 25/06/1956 | 18/02/1986 | 29.671 | 1.907 | WN | Willesden | 01/1988 | 31.578 |
Diesel | BR | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08450 | 05/12/1958 | 02/05/1986 | 27.425 | 1.707 | CD | Crewe Diesel | 01/1988 | 29.132 |
Diesel | BR | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08422 | 08/08/1958 | 09/12/1985 | 27.356 | 2.600 | BY | Bletchley | 07/1988 | 29.956 |
Diesel | BR | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08132 | 13/12/1955 | 29/01/1986 | 30.151 | 2.460 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 07/1988 | 32.611 |
Diesel | BR | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2857 | 04/12/1960 | 18/04/1971 | 10.375 | 21.175 | 06/1992 | 31.551 | ||
Diesel | BR | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08603 | 30/05/1959 | 31/01/1994 | 34.699 | 0.537 | BS | Bescot | 08/1994 | 35.236 |
Diesel | BR | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08496 | 12/03/1958 | 14/06/1990 | 32.279 | 4.425 | CA | Cambridge | 11/1994 | 36.704 |