Scrapyard: Carriage Works Dukinfield
Type | Company | Class | Wheels | Number when Cut | Date Built | Date Withdrawn | Service (yrs) | Awaiting Scrap (yrs) | Depot on Withdrawal | Date Scrapped | Age (yrs) | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61393 | 24/11/1923 | 03/08/1948 | 24.710 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61373 | 08/1921 | 19/08/1948 | 27.030 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61374 | 10/1921 | 18/09/1948 | 26.945 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61704 | 02/1922 | 13/06/1949 | 27.342 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61380 | 06/1922 | 03/08/1948 | 26.153 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61706 | 07/1922 | 26/12/1949 | 27.468 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61707 | 08/1922 | 13/06/1949 | 26.847 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61383 | 07/1922 | 14/05/1948 | 25.849 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61384 | 07/1922 | 19/08/1948 | 26.115 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61385 | 08/1922 | 12/01/1949 | 26.430 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61386 | 08/1922 | 13/06/1949 | 26.847 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61708 | 08/1922 | 13/06/1949 | 26.847 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61389 | 25/08/1923 | 04/02/1949 | 25.466 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61390 | 22/09/1923 | 02/11/1948 | 25.132 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61712 | 03/11/1923 | 13/06/1949 | 25.627 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B3 | 4-6-0 | 1496 | 07/1920 | 31/12/1947 | 27.479 | LIN | Lincoln | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61394 | 08/12/1923 | 22/04/1948 | 24.389 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61713 | 02/02/1924 | 05/09/1949 | 25.608 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61397 | 01/03/1924 | 04/06/1948 | 24.277 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
Steam | GCR | B8 | 4-6-0 | 1349 | 06/1913 | 28/11/1947 | 34.477 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
Steam | GCR | B8 | 4-6-0 | 61353 | 09/1914 | 24/03/1949 | 34.545 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
Steam | GCR | B8 | 4-6-0 | 61354 | 10/1914 | 15/03/1948 | 33.438 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
Steam | GCR | B8 | 4-6-0 | 61357 | 11/1914 | 23/04/1949 | 34.460 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
Steam | GCR | B9 | 4-6-0 | 61469 | 09/1906 | 02/04/1949 | 42.575 | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | |||
Steam | GCR | B9 | 4-6-0 | 61470 | 09/1906 | 19/11/1948 | 42.208 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
Steam | GCR | B9 | 4-6-0 | 1471 | 09/1906 | 20/11/1947 | 41.208 | STP | Heaton Mersey | |||
Steam | GCR | B9 | 4-6-0 | 1473 | 09/1906 | 31/12/1947 | 41.321 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
Steam | GCR | B9 | 4-6-0 | 61476 | 10/1906 | 19/08/1948 | 41.874 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | |||
Steam | GCR | B9 | 4-6-0 | 1478 | 10/1906 | 10/12/1947 | 41.181 | LIV | Brunswick | |||
Steam | GCR | C5 | 4-4-2 | 2897 | 12/1906 | 31/12/1947 | 41.071 | |||||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61371 | 11/1921 | 22/01/1949 | 27.205 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B3 | 4-6-0 | 1494 | 11/1917 | 06/12/1947 | 30.077 | LIN | Lincoln | |||
Steam | GCR | B3 | 4-6-0 | 61497 | 08/1920 | 14/04/1949 | 28.682 | IMM | Immingham | |||
Steam | GCR | B3 | 4-6-0 | 1498 | 09/1920 | 31/12/1947 | 27.310 | IMM | Immingham | |||
Steam | GCR | B4 | 4-6-0 | 61483 | 06/1906 | 26/09/1949 | 43.312 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
Steam | GCR | B4 | 4-6-0 | 1484 | 06/1906 | 20/11/1947 | 41.460 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
Steam | GCR | B4 | 4-6-0 | 61485 | 06/1906 | 04/06/1949 | 43.000 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
Steam | GCR | B4 | 4-6-0 | 1486 | 06/1906 | 07/10/1947 | 41.340 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
Steam | GCR | B4 | 4-6-0 | 1487 | 06/1906 | 10/12/1947 | 41.515 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
Steam | GCR | B4 | 4-6-0 | 61488 | 07/1906 | 07/10/1948 | 42.260 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
Steam | GCR | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1678 | 11/1902 | 20/11/1947 | 45.044 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
Steam | GCR | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1679 | 11/1902 | 23/12/1947 | 45.134 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
Steam | GCR | B5 | 4-6-0 | 1683 | 01/1904 | 23/12/1947 | 43.967 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
Steam | GCR | B5 | 4-6-0 | 61685 | 01/1904 | 06/03/1948 | 44.170 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
Steam | GCR | B5 | 4-6-0 | 61688 | 02/1904 | 31/10/1949 | 45.740 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
Steam | GCR | B6 | 4-6-0 | 1346 | 07/1918 | 28/11/1947 | 29.392 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
Steam | GCR | B6 | 4-6-0 | 1347 | 03/1921 | 31/12/1947 | 26.814 | ARD | Ardsley | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61362 | 07/1921 | 20/04/1949 | 27.784 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 1370 | 11/1921 | 19/11/1948 | 27.030 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61369 | 11/1921 | 21/08/1948 | 26.784 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61702 | 10/1921 | 13/06/1949 | 27.679 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61368 | 10/1921 | 06/10/1948 | 26.995 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61703 | 10/1921 | 05/09/1949 | 27.910 | GOR | Gorton | |||
Steam | GCR | B19 | 4-6-0 | 1492 | 03/1913 | 14/11/1947 | 34.690 | 0.085 | IMM | Immingham | 12/1947 | 34.775 |
Steam | GCR | B18 | 4-6-0 | 1480 | 01/1904 | 31/12/1947 | 43.989 | 0.205 | ANN | Annesley | 03/1948 | 44.195 |
Steam | GCR | B18 | 4-6-0 | 1479 | 12/1903 | 31/12/1947 | 44.074 | 0.205 | ANN | Annesley | 03/1948 | 44.279 |
Steam | GCR | B5 | 4-6-0 | 61690 | 03/1904 | 20/04/1948 | 44.129 | 0.236 | MEX | Mexborough | 07/1948 | 44.364 |
Steam | GCR | B5 | 4-6-0 | 61681 | 11/1902 | 23/06/1948 | 45.636 | 0.060 | MEX | Mexborough | 07/1948 | 45.696 |
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61372 | 11/1921 | 10/09/1948 | 26.838 | 0.014 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 09/1948 | 26.852 |
Steam | GCR | B8 | 4-6-0 | 61355 | 10/1914 | 02/09/1948 | 33.907 | 0.036 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 09/1948 | 33.942 |
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61363 | 09/1921 | 12/06/1948 | 26.759 | 0.260 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 09/1948 | 27.019 |
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61379 | 06/1922 | 12/02/1949 | 26.682 | -0.077 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 01/1949 | 26.605 |
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61376 | 03/1922 | 31/12/1948 | 26.816 | 0.041 | GOR | Gorton | 01/1949 | 26.858 |
Steam | GCR | B5 | 4-6-0 | 61680 | 11/1902 | 13/11/1948 | 46.027 | 0.173 | MEX | Mexborough | 01/1949 | 46.200 |
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61395 | 22/12/1923 | 30/11/1948 | 24.959 | 0.126 | GOR | Gorton | 01/1949 | 25.085 |
Steam | GCR | B9 | 4-6-0 | 61475 | 10/1906 | 16/05/1949 | 42.614 | 0.164 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | 07/1949 | 42.778 |
Steam | GCR | B8 | 4-6-0 | 61358 | 12/1914 | 13/08/1948 | 33.685 | 1.090 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 09/1949 | 34.775 |
Steam | GCR | B7 | 4-6-0 | 61361 | 06/1921 | 04/03/1949 | 27.737 | 0.701 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 11/1949 | 28.438 |
Steam | GCR | B5 | 4-6-0 | 61689 | 02/1904 | 19/10/1949 | 45.707 | 0.156 | MEX | Mexborough | 12/1949 | 45.863 |