Scrapyard: Campbells Shieldhall
Type | Company | Class | Wheels | Number when Cut | Date Built | Date Withdrawn | Service (yrs) | Awaiting Scrap (yrs) | Depot on Withdrawal | Date Scrapped | Age (yrs) | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | WD | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 90755 | 06/1945 | 29/12/1962 | 17.551 | |||||
Steam | WD | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 90757 | 06/1945 | 29/12/1962 | 17.551 | |||||
Steam | WD | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 90765 | 07/1945 | 17/12/1962 | 17.436 | |||||
Steam | WD | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 90766 | 07/1945 | 29/12/1962 | 17.468 | |||||
Steam | WD | WD/10 | 2-10-0 | 90773 | 08/1945 | 29/12/1962 | 17.384 | |||||
Steam | LNER | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60965 | 25/02/1943 | 29/12/1962 | 19.855 | 0.879 | 64A | St Margarets | 11/1963 | 20.734 |
Steam | LNER | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60971 | 02/06/1943 | 29/12/1962 | 19.589 | 0.879 | 64A | St Margarets | 11/1963 | 20.468 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90549 | 08/1943 | 17/12/1962 | 19.353 | 0.995 | 12/1963 | 20.348 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90505 | 10/1944 | 11/06/1962 | 17.666 | 1.682 | 02/1964 | 19.348 | ||
Steam | LNER | A4 | 4-6-2 | 60027 | 13/03/1937 | 03/09/1965 | 28.496 | 0.282 | 64A | St Margarets | 12/1965 | 28.778 |
Steam | LNER | A4 | 4-6-2 | 60031 | 02/10/1937 | 29/10/1965 | 28.093 | 0.129 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 12/1965 | 28.222 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90515 | 01/1945 | 22/11/1965 | 20.866 | 0.233 | 02/1966 | 21.099 |