Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3592 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16998 Week
» 70014 Month
» 189541 Year
» 3216394 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Cashmore's Great Bridge
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
5151 |
22/02/1930 |
17/08/1962 |
32.504 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GWR |
4300 |
2-6-0 |
5358 |
09/1918 |
17/07/1962 |
43.866 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GWR |
4300 |
2-6-0 |
5399 |
11/1920 |
17/09/1962 |
41.866 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GWR |
6000 |
4-6-0 |
6005 |
07/1927 |
20/11/1962 |
35.375 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GWR |
4300 |
2-6-0 |
6301 |
12/1920 |
15/10/1962 |
41.860 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GWR |
4300 |
2-6-0 |
6314 |
01/1921 |
24/05/1963 |
42.381 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GWR |
4300 |
2-6-0 |
6337 |
06/1921 |
06/07/1964 |
43.088 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GWR |
4300 |
2-6-0 |
6339 |
06/1921 |
31/07/1962 |
41.153 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GWR |
4300 |
2-6-0 |
6364 |
05/1925 |
21/11/1964 |
39.548 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GWR |
4300 |
2-6-0 |
6374 |
05/1921 |
03/08/1962 |
41.247 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GWR |
4300 |
2-6-0 |
6388 |
10/1921 |
21/09/1962 |
40.962 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GWR |
4300 |
2-6-0 |
6395 |
12/1921 |
21/11/1964 |
42.964 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GWR |
4300 |
2-6-0 |
7313 |
12/1921 |
03/07/1962 |
40.575 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GWR |
4300 |
2-6-0 |
7329 |
03/1932 |
07/01/1963 |
30.836 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49010 |
08/1898 |
06/06/1959 |
60.847 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49021 |
05/1900 |
07/10/1961 |
61.438 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
48905 |
04/1902 |
06/06/1959 |
57.181 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49342 |
10/1902 |
14/10/1961 |
59.038 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49343 |
05/1903 |
14/10/1961 |
58.458 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49361 |
09/1903 |
26/12/1964 |
61.323 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
48895 |
05/1904 |
05/12/1964 |
60.600 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49357 |
05/1904 |
14/10/1961 |
57.455 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49154 |
01/1910 |
01/12/1962 |
52.912 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49108 |
05/1910 |
23/11/1957 |
47.559 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49116 |
06/1910 |
14/11/1959 |
49.449 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LNWR |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49407 |
01/1922 |
11/1964 |
42.863 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LNWR |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49409 |
02/1922 |
01/06/1959 |
37.315 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LNWR |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49411 |
01/1922 |
14/10/1961 |
39.773 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LNWR |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49425 |
07/1922 |
15/09/1962 |
40.197 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LNWR |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49430 |
07/1922 |
26/12/1964 |
42.479 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LNWR |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49431 |
07/1922 |
01/12/1962 |
40.408 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LNWR |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49432 |
07/1922 |
01/12/1962 |
40.408 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LNWR |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49434 |
08/1922 |
20/10/1962 |
40.208 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LNWR |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49446 |
10/1922 |
09/04/1964 |
41.512 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LNWR |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49452 |
10/1922 |
08/12/1962 |
40.175 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49157 |
02/1912 |
19/01/1959 |
46.959 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49173 |
04/1912 |
18/07/1964 |
52.293 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49226 |
03/1914 |
06/03/1959 |
45.005 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LNER |
J94 |
0-6-0ST |
68006 |
01/1944 |
06/05/1967 |
23.321 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LNER |
J94 |
0-6-0ST |
68013 |
06/1944 |
15/08/1964 |
20.181 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
LNER |
J94 |
0-6-0ST |
68070 |
09/1945 |
19/03/1963 |
17.518 |
|
|
|
|
|
Steam |
GCR |
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63741 |
10/1917 |
04/04/1965 |
47.501 |
|
36C |
Frodingham |
|
|
Steam |
GCR |
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63639 |
10/1918 |
19/12/1965 |
47.211 |
|
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
GCR |
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63703 |
08/1918 |
31/01/1965 |
46.496 |
|
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
|
Steam |
GCR |
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63770 |
04/1918 |
19/12/1965 |
47.712 |
|
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
GCR |
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63793 |
02/1918 |
09/05/1965 |
47.260 |
|
36C |
Frodingham |
|
|
Steam |
GCR |
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63717 |
03/1919 |
04/04/1965 |
46.088 |
|
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
|
Steam |
GCR |
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63842 |
02/1919 |
04/04/1965 |
46.164 |
|
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
|
Steam |
GCR |
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63902 |
01/1918 |
11/04/1965 |
47.268 |
|
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
|
Steam |
GCR |
O4 |
2-8-0 |
63912 |
08/1919 |
09/12/1962 |
43.348 |
|
41J |
Langwith Junction |
|
|
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43776 |
08/1903 |
23/11/1957 |
54.312 |
0.060 |
|
|
12/1957 |
54.373 |
Steam |
MR |
483 |
4-4-0 |
40553 |
1901 |
11/1958 |
|
1.167 |
|
|
01/1960 |
|
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47296 |
10/1924 |
12/12/1959 |
35.181 |
0.178 |
|
|
02/1960 |
35.359 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40587 |
08/1928 |
29/08/1959 |
31.058 |
0.466 |
|
|
02/1960 |
31.523 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40675 |
02/1932 |
22/08/1959 |
27.534 |
0.485 |
|
|
02/1960 |
28.019 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
4-4-0 |
41083 |
12/1924 |
20/12/1958 |
34.036 |
1.156 |
|
|
02/1960 |
35.192 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
4-4-0 |
41113 |
11/1925 |
13/12/1958 |
33.099 |
1.175 |
|
|
02/1960 |
34.274 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
4-4-0 |
41122 |
11/1925 |
13/12/1958 |
33.099 |
1.175 |
|
|
02/1960 |
34.274 |
Steam |
LTSR |
79 |
4-4-2T |
41946 |
06/1927 |
17/02/1959 |
31.699 |
0.995 |
|
|
02/1960 |
32.693 |
Steam |
LTSR |
79 |
4-4-2T |
41948 |
06/1927 |
17/02/1959 |
31.699 |
0.995 |
|
|
02/1960 |
32.693 |
Steam |
LTSR |
79 |
4-4-2T |
41950 |
07/1927 |
17/02/1959 |
31.616 |
0.995 |
|
|
02/1960 |
32.611 |
Steam |
LTSR |
79 |
4-4-2T |
41977 |
03/1930 |
17/02/1959 |
28.948 |
0.995 |
|
|
02/1960 |
29.942 |
Steam |
LTSR |
79 |
4-4-2T |
41978 |
03/1930 |
17/02/1959 |
28.948 |
0.995 |
|
|
02/1960 |
29.942 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43192 |
09/1888 |
22/08/1959 |
70.978 |
0.564 |
|
|
03/1960 |
71.542 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43248 |
09/1902 |
28/08/1959 |
56.989 |
0.548 |
|
|
03/1960 |
57.537 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43315 |
28/02/1892 |
22/08/1959 |
67.523 |
0.564 |
|
|
03/1960 |
68.088 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43318 |
28/02/1892 |
22/08/1959 |
67.523 |
0.564 |
|
|
03/1960 |
68.088 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2237 |
07/11/1944 |
15/06/1959 |
14.611 |
0.836 |
|
|
04/1960 |
15.447 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5915 |
07/1931 |
13/01/1960 |
28.518 |
0.255 |
|
|
04/1960 |
28.773 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47382 |
10/1926 |
19/12/1959 |
33.200 |
0.323 |
|
|
04/1960 |
33.523 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40673 |
02/1932 |
28/11/1959 |
27.803 |
0.381 |
|
|
04/1960 |
28.184 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43219 |
1890 |
28/11/1959 |
|
0.630 |
|
|
07/1960 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43379 |
1892 |
28/11/1959 |
|
0.630 |
|
|
07/1960 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43433 |
1893 |
05/12/1959 |
|
0.611 |
|
|
07/1960 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43728 |
1901 |
05/12/1959 |
|
0.611 |
|
|
07/1960 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43335 |
05/1892 |
22/08/1959 |
67.312 |
0.984 |
|
|
08/1960 |
68.296 |
Steam |
LMS |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43878 |
1918 |
05/12/1959 |
|
0.781 |
|
|
09/1960 |
|
Steam |
LMS |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43965 |
1921 |
05/12/1959 |
|
0.781 |
|
|
09/1960 |
|
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40096 |
23/05/1935 |
21/11/1959 |
24.515 |
0.819 |
|
|
09/1960 |
25.334 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40012 |
13/05/1930 |
12/11/1960 |
30.523 |
0.093 |
14E |
Bedford |
16/12/1960 |
30.616 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47363 |
08/1926 |
19/12/1959 |
33.367 |
1.238 |
|
|
03/1961 |
34.605 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43321 |
03/1892 |
18/02/1961 |
68.975 |
0.321 |
|
|
06/1961 |
69.296 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44506 |
12/1927 |
12/03/1960 |
32.263 |
1.260 |
|
|
06/1961 |
33.523 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43309 |
01/1892 |
01/04/1961 |
69.255 |
0.288 |
|
|
07/1961 |
69.542 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44064 |
10/1925 |
28/11/1959 |
34.142 |
1.630 |
|
|
07/1961 |
35.773 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44093 |
11/1925 |
12/03/1960 |
34.345 |
1.342 |
|
|
07/1961 |
35.688 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44513 |
06/1928 |
12/03/1960 |
31.762 |
1.342 |
|
|
07/1961 |
33.104 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40653 |
09/1931 |
28/11/1959 |
28.222 |
1.630 |
|
|
07/1961 |
29.852 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40655 |
10/1931 |
21/11/1959 |
28.121 |
1.649 |
|
|
07/1961 |
29.770 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40660 |
12/1931 |
28/11/1959 |
27.973 |
1.630 |
|
|
07/1961 |
29.603 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40679 |
03/1932 |
28/11/1959 |
27.723 |
1.630 |
|
|
07/1961 |
29.353 |
Steam |
MR |
2F |
0-6-0 |
58204 |
03/1880 |
16/05/1959 |
79.219 |
2.252 |
|
|
08/1961 |
81.471 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43784 |
12/1903 |
17/09/1960 |
56.797 |
0.995 |
|
|
09/1961 |
57.792 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43812 |
12/1906 |
17/06/1961 |
54.542 |
0.247 |
|
|
09/1961 |
54.789 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43214 |
1890 |
17/06/1961 |
|
0.247 |
|
|
09/1961 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43284 |
1891 |
03/06/1961 |
|
0.285 |
|
|
09/1961 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43468 |
1894 |
27/05/1961 |
|
0.304 |
|
|
09/1961 |
|
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40678 |
03/1932 |
08/07/1961 |
29.334 |
0.189 |
|
|
09/1961 |
29.523 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40692 |
11/1932 |
08/1961 |
28.767 |
0.085 |
|
|
09/1961 |
28.852 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
4-4-0 |
40936 |
08/1932 |
28/01/1961 |
28.474 |
0.630 |
|
|
09/1961 |
29.104 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42552 |
14/07/1936 |
07/10/1961 |
25.249 |
0.189 |
|
|
12/1961 |
25.438 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43507 |
1897 |
23/09/1961 |
|
0.312 |
|
|
01/1962 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43529 |
1897 |
26/08/1961 |
|
0.389 |
|
|
01/1962 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43673 |
04/1901 |
26/08/1961 |
60.405 |
0.389 |
|
|
01/1962 |
60.795 |
Steam |
MR |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58122 |
08/1875 |
08/09/1961 |
86.123 |
0.353 |
21B |
Bescot |
01/1962 |
86.477 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40108 |
03/07/1935 |
25/11/1961 |
26.416 |
0.225 |
|
|
02/1962 |
26.641 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42764 |
15/07/1927 |
20/01/1962 |
34.542 |
0.038 |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
34.581 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44409 |
08/1927 |
09/12/1961 |
34.342 |
0.263 |
|
|
03/1962 |
34.605 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
8734 |
03/1931 |
05/03/1962 |
30.995 |
0.112 |
|
|
04/1962 |
31.107 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
0-4-4T |
41902 |
12/1932 |
28/11/1959 |
26.970 |
2.381 |
|
|
04/1962 |
29.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
0-4-4T |
41909 |
01/1933 |
28/11/1959 |
26.885 |
2.381 |
|
|
04/1962 |
29.266 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42669 |
07/12/1942 |
07/10/1961 |
18.847 |
0.521 |
|
|
04/1962 |
19.367 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40565 |
04/1928 |
21/11/1959 |
31.622 |
2.400 |
|
|
04/1962 |
34.022 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40677 |
02/1932 |
28/11/1959 |
27.803 |
2.381 |
|
|
04/1962 |
30.184 |
Steam |
GWR |
6400 |
0-6-0PT |
6429 |
18/11/1935 |
15/03/1962 |
26.340 |
0.334 |
|
|
07/1962 |
26.674 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
8713 |
03/1931 |
15/03/1962 |
31.022 |
0.334 |
|
|
07/1962 |
31.356 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47504 |
04/1928 |
21/04/1962 |
34.038 |
0.233 |
|
|
07/1962 |
34.271 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
4625 |
15/09/1942 |
21/05/1962 |
19.693 |
0.321 |
|
|
09/1962 |
20.014 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
4641 |
31/12/1942 |
21/05/1962 |
19.400 |
0.321 |
|
|
09/1962 |
19.721 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
5183 |
03/1931 |
21/05/1962 |
31.205 |
0.321 |
|
|
09/1962 |
31.526 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5965 |
01/08/1936 |
13/07/1962 |
25.964 |
0.175 |
|
|
09/1962 |
26.140 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
7788 |
12/1930 |
13/07/1962 |
31.597 |
0.175 |
|
|
09/1962 |
31.773 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40646 |
09/1931 |
12/05/1962 |
30.677 |
0.345 |
|
|
09/1962 |
31.022 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40129 |
19/09/1935 |
21/10/1961 |
26.107 |
0.879 |
|
|
07/09/1962 |
26.986 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2234 |
26/10/1944 |
21/05/1962 |
17.578 |
0.403 |
|
|
10/1962 |
17.981 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5916 |
07/1931 |
13/07/1962 |
31.016 |
0.258 |
|
|
10/1962 |
31.274 |
Steam |
GWR |
9400 |
0-6-0PT |
9486 |
06/11/1952 |
13/07/1962 |
9.688 |
0.258 |
|
|
10/1962 |
9.945 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9719 |
04/07/1934 |
24/07/1962 |
28.074 |
0.227 |
|
|
10/1962 |
28.301 |
Steam |
MR |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58124 |
12/1875 |
07/07/1962 |
86.616 |
0.274 |
21B |
Bescot |
10/1962 |
86.890 |
Steam |
MR |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58185 |
12/1876 |
07/07/1962 |
85.614 |
0.274 |
21B |
Bescot |
10/1962 |
85.888 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5032 |
25/05/1934 |
21/09/1962 |
28.345 |
0.151 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
11/1962 |
28.496 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5033 |
10/05/1935 |
21/09/1962 |
27.386 |
0.151 |
81F |
Oxford |
11/1962 |
27.537 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5034 |
14/05/1935 |
21/09/1962 |
27.375 |
0.151 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
11/1962 |
27.526 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47433 |
10/1926 |
08/09/1962 |
35.923 |
0.186 |
|
|
11/1962 |
36.110 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40207 |
21/04/1938 |
10/02/1962 |
23.825 |
0.762 |
|
|
11/1962 |
24.586 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5008 |
30/06/1927 |
21/09/1962 |
35.252 |
0.233 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
12/1962 |
35.485 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5011 |
22/07/1927 |
17/09/1962 |
35.181 |
0.244 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
12/1962 |
35.425 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5066 |
06/07/1937 |
17/09/1962 |
25.216 |
0.244 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
12/1962 |
25.460 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5068 |
03/06/1938 |
21/09/1962 |
24.318 |
0.233 |
81F |
Oxford |
12/1962 |
24.551 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5082 |
08/06/1939 |
02/07/1962 |
23.082 |
0.455 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
12/1962 |
23.537 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5084 |
12/1922 |
02/07/1963 |
40.573 |
-0.545 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
12/1962 |
40.027 |
Steam |
GER |
J15 |
0-6-0 |
65453 |
06/1906 |
06/08/1962 |
56.181 |
0.359 |
|
|
12/1962 |
56.540 |
Steam |
GER |
J15 |
0-6-0 |
65460 |
02/1912 |
05/09/1962 |
50.589 |
0.277 |
|
|
12/1962 |
50.866 |
Steam |
GER |
J15 |
0-6-0 |
65476 |
08/1913 |
05/09/1962 |
49.090 |
0.277 |
|
|
12/1962 |
49.367 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42887 |
04/07/1930 |
29/09/1962 |
32.260 |
0.211 |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
32.471 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42891 |
30/07/1930 |
20/10/1962 |
32.247 |
0.173 |
|
|
22/12/1962 |
32.419 |
Steam |
GNR |
K3 |
2-6-0 |
61821 |
10/1924 |
16/09/1962 |
37.945 |
|
|
|
1963 |
|
Steam |
GNR |
K3 |
2-6-0 |
61826 |
11/1924 |
16/09/1962 |
37.860 |
|
|
|
1963 |
|
Steam |
GNR |
K3 |
2-6-0 |
61827 |
11/1924 |
16/09/1962 |
37.860 |
|
|
|
1963 |
|
Steam |
GNR |
K3 |
2-6-0 |
61831 |
12/1924 |
16/09/1962 |
37.778 |
|
|
|
1963 |
|
Steam |
GNR |
K3 |
2-6-0 |
61889 |
12/1929 |
04/11/1962 |
32.910 |
|
|
|
1963 |
|
Steam |
GNR |
K3 |
2-6-0 |
61939 |
08/1935 |
04/11/1962 |
27.241 |
|
|
|
1963 |
|
Steam |
GNR |
K3 |
2-6-0 |
61960 |
05/1936 |
16/09/1962 |
26.356 |
|
|
|
1963 |
|
Steam |
LMS |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43933 |
1920 |
17/11/1962 |
|
0.162 |
|
|
01/1963 |
|
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41236 |
09/1949 |
03/11/1962 |
13.142 |
0.200 |
|
|
01/1963 |
13.342 |
Steam |
GER |
J15 |
0-6-0 |
65465 |
03/1912 |
16/09/1962 |
50.540 |
0.332 |
|
|
01/1963 |
50.871 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42470 |
25/11/1936 |
29/09/1962 |
25.860 |
0.282 |
|
|
10/01/1963 |
26.142 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
3732 |
05/08/1937 |
21/05/1962 |
24.808 |
0.740 |
|
|
02/1963 |
25.548 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41235 |
08/1949 |
17/11/1962 |
13.266 |
0.247 |
|
|
02/1963 |
13.512 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42097 |
21/07/1950 |
08/12/1962 |
12.392 |
0.189 |
|
|
02/1963 |
12.581 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61082 |
04/10/1946 |
29/12/1962 |
16.247 |
0.132 |
40B |
Immingham |
02/1963 |
16.378 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61200 |
06/06/1947 |
29/12/1962 |
15.575 |
0.132 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
02/1963 |
15.707 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61408 |
13/06/1950 |
29/12/1962 |
12.553 |
0.132 |
40B |
Immingham |
02/1963 |
12.685 |
Steam |
GWR |
6400 |
0-6-0PT |
6418 |
07/12/1934 |
26/11/1962 |
27.989 |
0.299 |
|
|
03/1963 |
28.288 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61027 |
11/05/1947 |
16/09/1962 |
15.362 |
0.493 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
03/1963 |
15.855 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61047 |
03/06/1946 |
16/09/1962 |
16.299 |
0.493 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
03/1963 |
16.792 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61111 |
24/12/1946 |
16/09/1962 |
15.740 |
0.493 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
03/1963 |
16.233 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61139 |
01/04/1947 |
16/09/1962 |
15.471 |
0.493 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
03/1963 |
15.964 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61150 |
29/04/1947 |
16/09/1962 |
15.395 |
0.493 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
03/1963 |
15.888 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61151 |
29/04/1947 |
16/09/1962 |
15.395 |
0.493 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
03/1963 |
15.888 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61154 |
06/05/1947 |
16/09/1962 |
15.375 |
0.493 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
03/1963 |
15.868 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61236 |
26/09/1947 |
16/09/1962 |
14.984 |
0.493 |
31B |
March |
03/1963 |
15.477 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61287 |
13/02/1948 |
16/09/1962 |
14.600 |
0.493 |
31B |
March |
03/1963 |
15.093 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42323 |
04/06/1928 |
23/06/1962 |
34.074 |
0.715 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
34.789 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42351 |
06/06/1929 |
25/08/1962 |
33.241 |
0.542 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
33.784 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42362 |
26/07/1929 |
02/06/1962 |
32.874 |
0.773 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
33.647 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42370 |
16/09/1929 |
30/06/1962 |
32.808 |
0.696 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
33.504 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42473 |
16/12/1936 |
03/11/1962 |
25.899 |
0.351 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
26.249 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42537 |
17/12/1935 |
22/09/1962 |
26.784 |
0.466 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
27.249 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42599 |
17/11/1936 |
29/09/1962 |
25.882 |
0.447 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
26.329 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42621 |
06/07/1938 |
03/11/1962 |
24.345 |
0.351 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
24.696 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42641 |
11/11/1938 |
29/09/1962 |
23.899 |
0.447 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
24.345 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42642 |
18/11/1938 |
29/09/1962 |
23.879 |
0.447 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
24.326 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42658 |
19/02/1941 |
29/09/1962 |
21.622 |
0.447 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
22.068 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42661 |
10/05/1941 |
29/09/1962 |
21.403 |
0.447 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
21.849 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42290 |
21/10/1947 |
29/09/1962 |
14.951 |
0.447 |
|
|
11/03/1963 |
15.397 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4149 |
10/1946 |
26/02/1963 |
16.378 |
0.132 |
|
|
04/1963 |
16.510 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47381 |
10/1926 |
22/09/1962 |
35.962 |
0.562 |
|
|
04/1963 |
36.523 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47479 |
01/1928 |
04/08/1962 |
34.575 |
0.696 |
|
|
04/1963 |
35.271 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47551 |
01/1928 |
23/02/1963 |
35.132 |
0.140 |
|
|
04/1963 |
35.271 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40073 |
20/02/1935 |
18/08/1962 |
27.510 |
0.658 |
|
|
04/1963 |
28.167 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40104 |
20/06/1935 |
15/09/1962 |
27.258 |
0.581 |
|
|
04/1963 |
27.838 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40146 |
04/08/1937 |
04/08/1962 |
25.016 |
0.696 |
|
|
04/1963 |
25.712 |
Steam |
GER |
J15 |
0-6-0 |
65420 |
01/1892 |
01/08/1962 |
70.589 |
0.704 |
|
|
04/1963 |
71.293 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40083 |
27/03/1935 |
01/12/1962 |
27.701 |
0.364 |
|
|
13/04/1963 |
28.066 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40185 |
18/10/1937 |
24/02/1962 |
24.370 |
1.132 |
|
|
13/04/1963 |
25.501 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43213 |
1890 |
19/05/1962 |
|
0.989 |
|
|
05/1963 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43514 |
1897 |
13/10/1962 |
|
0.586 |
|
|
05/1963 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43583 |
10/1899 |
04/08/1962 |
62.844 |
0.778 |
|
|
05/1963 |
63.622 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43680 |
05/1901 |
04/08/1962 |
61.263 |
0.778 |
|
|
05/1963 |
62.041 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43687 |
06/1901 |
04/08/1962 |
61.178 |
0.778 |
|
|
05/1963 |
61.956 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44205 |
11/1925 |
03/03/1963 |
37.321 |
0.200 |
|
|
05/1963 |
37.521 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44307 |
10/1926 |
06/10/1962 |
36.000 |
0.605 |
|
|
05/1963 |
36.605 |
Steam |
LYR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52119 |
04/1891 |
13/10/1962 |
71.542 |
0.586 |
|
|
05/1963 |
72.129 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47270 |
08/1924 |
08/09/1962 |
38.090 |
0.682 |
|
|
05/1963 |
38.773 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47497 |
04/1928 |
22/09/1962 |
34.460 |
0.644 |
|
|
05/1963 |
35.104 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47633 |
12/1928 |
08/09/1962 |
33.753 |
0.682 |
|
|
05/1963 |
34.436 |
Steam |
MR |
2441 |
0-6-0T |
47217 |
03/1900 |
09/1962 |
62.545 |
0.663 |
|
|
05/1963 |
63.208 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40085 |
08/05/1935 |
07/07/1962 |
27.184 |
0.855 |
|
|
05/1963 |
28.038 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40086 |
08/04/1935 |
24/11/1962 |
27.649 |
0.471 |
|
|
05/1963 |
28.121 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40089 |
17/04/1935 |
04/08/1962 |
27.318 |
0.778 |
|
|
05/1963 |
28.096 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40093 |
16/05/1935 |
27/01/1962 |
26.721 |
1.296 |
|
|
05/1963 |
28.016 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40115 |
07/08/1935 |
21/10/1961 |
26.225 |
1.564 |
|
|
05/1963 |
27.789 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40122 |
08/1935 |
23/06/1962 |
26.874 |
0.893 |
|
|
05/1963 |
27.767 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40138 |
17/10/1935 |
22/09/1962 |
26.951 |
0.644 |
|
|
05/1963 |
27.595 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40165 |
25/11/1937 |
28/10/1961 |
23.940 |
1.545 |
|
|
05/1963 |
25.485 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40173 |
05/01/1938 |
21/07/1962 |
24.556 |
0.816 |
|
|
05/1963 |
25.373 |
Steam |
LMS |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40202 |
14/02/1938 |
15/09/1962 |
24.600 |
0.663 |
|
|
05/1963 |
25.263 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42331 |
25/02/1929 |
01/09/1962 |
33.537 |
0.701 |
|
|
05/1963 |
34.238 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61371 |
24/10/1950 |
16/09/1962 |
11.904 |
0.660 |
31B |
March |
05/1963 |
12.564 |
Steam |
GER |
J15 |
0-6-0 |
65464 |
03/1912 |
16/09/1962 |
50.540 |
0.660 |
|
|
05/1963 |
51.200 |
Steam |
GER |
J15 |
0-6-0 |
65469 |
05/1912 |
01/08/1962 |
50.247 |
0.786 |
|
|
05/1963 |
51.033 |
Steam |
GWR |
2800 |
2-8-0 |
2888 |
17/03/1938 |
18/02/1963 |
24.942 |
0.321 |
|
|
06/1963 |
25.263 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43618 |
1899 |
24/03/1962 |
|
1.227 |
|
|
06/1963 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43721 |
1901 |
17/03/1962 |
|
1.247 |
|
|
06/1963 |
|
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47572 |
10/1928 |
14/05/1962 |
33.600 |
1.088 |
|
|
06/1963 |
34.688 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47621 |
11/1928 |
12/05/1962 |
33.510 |
1.093 |
|
|
06/1963 |
34.603 |
Steam |
LMS |
2P |
4-4-0 |
40635 |
07/1928 |
11/02/1961 |
32.600 |
2.340 |
|
|
06/1963 |
34.940 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61112 |
27/12/1946 |
29/12/1962 |
16.016 |
0.460 |
41F |
Mexborough |
06/1963 |
16.477 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61128 |
14/02/1947 |
29/12/1962 |
15.882 |
0.460 |
36A |
Doncaster |
06/1963 |
16.342 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61316 |
04/05/1948 |
29/12/1962 |
14.663 |
0.460 |
41D |
Canklow |
06/1963 |
15.123 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6645 |
09/1928 |
02/08/1962 |
33.901 |
0.951 |
|
|
07/1963 |
34.852 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43822 |
02/1908 |
11/08/1962 |
54.523 |
0.926 |
|
|
07/1963 |
55.449 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44413 |
09/1927 |
02/03/1963 |
35.485 |
0.370 |
|
|
07/1963 |
35.855 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47474 |
12/1927 |
01/09/1962 |
34.737 |
0.868 |
|
|
07/1963 |
35.605 |
Steam |
GWR |
4700 |
2-8-0 |
4708 |
04/1923 |
15/10/1962 |
39.529 |
0.833 |
|
|
08/1963 |
40.362 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42582 |
28/09/1936 |
25/05/1963 |
26.671 |
0.225 |
|
|
08/1963 |
26.896 |
Steam |
GWR |
2800 |
2-8-0 |
2845 |
11/1912 |
24/05/1963 |
50.553 |
0.312 |
|
|
09/1963 |
50.866 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
3660 |
05/02/1940 |
05/04/1963 |
23.178 |
0.447 |
|
|
09/1963 |
23.625 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5027 |
27/04/1934 |
20/11/1962 |
28.586 |
0.819 |
87F |
Llanelli |
09/1963 |
29.405 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43240 |
1890 |
29/09/1962 |
|
0.962 |
|
|
09/1963 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43599 |
02/1900 |
29/12/1962 |
62.910 |
0.712 |
|
|
09/1963 |
63.622 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47488 |
01/1928 |
01/12/1962 |
34.901 |
0.789 |
|
|
09/1963 |
35.690 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61393 |
11/01/1952 |
22/09/1963 |
11.704 |
-0.019 |
41F |
Mexborough |
09/1963 |
11.685 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
4906 |
01/1929 |
21/09/1962 |
33.704 |
1.066 |
|
|
10/1963 |
34.770 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43789 |
03/1904 |
09/06/1962 |
58.274 |
1.351 |
|
|
10/1963 |
59.625 |
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43257 |
1890 |
29/09/1962 |
|
1.044 |
|
|
10/1963 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43282 |
1891 |
13/10/1962 |
|
1.005 |
|
|
10/1963 |
|
Steam |
MR |
3F |
0-6-0 |
43615 |
1899 |
13/10/1962 |
|
1.005 |
|
|
10/1963 |
|
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44542 |
11/1928 |
07/1963 |
34.685 |
0.252 |
|
|
10/1963 |
34.937 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47392 |
11/1926 |
04/08/1962 |
35.742 |
1.197 |
|
|
10/1963 |
36.940 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47466 |
06/1927 |
08/09/1962 |
35.258 |
1.101 |
|
|
10/1963 |
36.359 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42472 |
09/12/1936 |
03/11/1962 |
25.918 |
0.948 |
|
|
10/1963 |
26.866 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4118 |
13/11/1936 |
05/09/1962 |
25.827 |
1.195 |
|
|
11/1963 |
27.022 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4129 |
27/05/1938 |
17/09/1962 |
24.326 |
1.162 |
|
|
11/1963 |
25.488 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5959 |
03/01/1936 |
21/09/1962 |
26.734 |
1.151 |
|
|
11/1963 |
27.885 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6640 |
09/1928 |
01/09/1962 |
33.984 |
1.205 |
|
|
11/1963 |
35.189 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6663 |
09/1928 |
24/06/1963 |
34.795 |
0.395 |
|
|
11/1963 |
35.189 |
Steam |
GWR |
9400 |
0-6-0PT |
8428 |
16/02/1951 |
05/10/1962 |
11.641 |
1.112 |
|
|
11/1963 |
12.753 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9741 |
24/01/1935 |
03/08/1962 |
27.542 |
1.285 |
|
|
11/1963 |
28.827 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44202 |
10/1925 |
07/09/1963 |
37.921 |
0.189 |
|
|
11/1963 |
38.110 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61159 |
14/05/1947 |
22/09/1963 |
16.370 |
0.148 |
40B |
Immingham |
11/1963 |
16.518 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61325 |
03/06/1948 |
22/09/1963 |
15.312 |
0.148 |
40B |
Immingham |
11/1963 |
15.460 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4112 |
15/10/1936 |
10/08/1962 |
25.836 |
1.348 |
|
|
12/1963 |
27.184 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
4605 |
03/01/1942 |
23/10/1962 |
20.816 |
1.145 |
|
|
12/1963 |
21.962 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
5640 |
10/1925 |
06/06/1963 |
37.666 |
0.526 |
|
|
12/1963 |
38.192 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5910 |
06/1931 |
21/09/1962 |
31.290 |
1.233 |
|
|
12/1963 |
32.523 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5926 |
01/06/1933 |
21/09/1962 |
29.326 |
1.233 |
|
|
12/1963 |
30.559 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61142 |
15/04/1947 |
22/09/1963 |
16.449 |
0.230 |
40E |
Colwick |
12/1963 |
16.679 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61177 |
25/06/1947 |
22/09/1963 |
16.255 |
0.230 |
40E |
Colwick |
12/1963 |
16.485 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61336 |
05/08/1948 |
22/09/1963 |
15.140 |
0.230 |
40E |
Colwick |
12/1963 |
15.370 |
Steam |
GWR |
1000 |
4-6-0 |
1019 |
02/04/1946 |
11/02/1963 |
16.874 |
0.926 |
|
|
01/1964 |
17.800 |
Steam |
GWR |
1000 |
4-6-0 |
1025 |
20/01/1947 |
18/02/1963 |
16.090 |
0.907 |
|
|
01/1964 |
16.997 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
4907 |
01/1929 |
01/08/1963 |
34.564 |
0.458 |
|
|
01/1964 |
35.022 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
5774 |
09/1929 |
05/10/1962 |
33.077 |
1.279 |
|
|
01/1964 |
34.356 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5930 |
14/06/1933 |
21/09/1962 |
29.290 |
1.318 |
|
|
01/1964 |
30.608 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6610 |
09/1927 |
01/02/1963 |
35.405 |
0.953 |
|
|
01/1964 |
36.359 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
7007 |
01/07/1946 |
18/02/1963 |
16.647 |
0.907 |
85A |
Worcester |
01/1964 |
17.553 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61088 |
18/10/1946 |
22/09/1963 |
16.940 |
0.315 |
40E |
Colwick |
01/1964 |
17.255 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61160 |
16/05/1947 |
22/09/1963 |
16.364 |
0.315 |
40E |
Colwick |
01/1964 |
16.679 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61227 |
21/08/1947 |
22/09/1963 |
16.099 |
0.315 |
40E |
Colwick |
01/1964 |
16.414 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61328 |
16/06/1948 |
22/09/1963 |
15.277 |
0.315 |
40B |
Immingham |
01/1964 |
15.592 |
Steam |
GWR |
1600 |
0-6-0PT |
1619 |
23/12/1949 |
02/05/1963 |
13.364 |
0.792 |
|
|
02/1964 |
14.156 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4140 |
21/08/1946 |
20/11/1963 |
17.260 |
0.238 |
|
|
02/1964 |
17.499 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6617 |
12/1927 |
01/09/1962 |
34.737 |
1.458 |
|
|
02/1964 |
36.195 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6698 |
10/1928 |
07/03/1963 |
34.414 |
0.945 |
|
|
02/1964 |
35.359 |
Steam |
GWR |
9400 |
0-6-0PT |
8449 |
30/06/1954 |
05/09/1962 |
8.189 |
1.447 |
|
|
02/1964 |
9.636 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44151 |
12/1925 |
07/12/1963 |
38.003 |
0.192 |
|
|
02/1964 |
38.195 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44219 |
01/1926 |
30/11/1963 |
37.899 |
0.211 |
|
|
02/1964 |
38.110 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4114 |
28/10/1936 |
20/11/1963 |
27.079 |
0.318 |
|
|
03/1964 |
27.397 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44184 |
03/1925 |
26/10/1963 |
38.641 |
0.386 |
|
|
03/1964 |
39.027 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44223 |
01/1926 |
09/11/1963 |
37.841 |
0.348 |
|
|
03/1964 |
38.189 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45725 |
25/09/1936 |
29/12/1962 |
26.277 |
1.211 |
|
|
03/1964 |
27.488 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61374 |
12/02/1951 |
22/09/1963 |
12.616 |
0.479 |
40B |
Immingham |
03/1964 |
13.096 |
Steam |
GWR |
1600 |
0-6-0PT |
1662 |
10/03/1955 |
28/12/1963 |
8.808 |
0.299 |
|
|
04/1964 |
9.107 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
4966 |
11/1929 |
01/11/1963 |
33.984 |
0.455 |
|
|
04/1964 |
34.438 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
5154 |
14/03/1930 |
29/08/1963 |
33.482 |
0.630 |
|
|
04/1964 |
34.112 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44047 |
03/1925 |
26/10/1963 |
38.641 |
0.471 |
|
|
04/1964 |
39.112 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44342 |
12/1926 |
26/10/1963 |
36.888 |
0.471 |
|
|
04/1964 |
37.359 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44352 |
05/1927 |
10/1963 |
36.444 |
0.501 |
|
|
04/1964 |
36.945 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44424 |
10/1927 |
26/10/1963 |
36.055 |
0.471 |
|
|
04/1964 |
36.526 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47294 |
10/1924 |
12/10/1963 |
39.016 |
0.510 |
|
|
04/1964 |
39.526 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47412 |
12/1926 |
10/1963 |
36.858 |
0.501 |
|
|
04/1964 |
37.359 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5001 |
21/08/1926 |
26/02/1963 |
36.542 |
1.216 |
65 |
|
05/1964 |
37.759 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
7021 |
08/06/1949 |
17/09/1963 |
14.285 |
0.660 |
87F |
Llanelli |
05/1964 |
14.945 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42790 |
20/10/1927 |
27/07/1963 |
35.792 |
0.803 |
|
|
05/1964 |
36.595 |
Steam |
GWR |
2800 |
2-8-0 |
3806 |
18/08/1939 |
02/12/1963 |
24.307 |
0.537 |
|
|
06/1964 |
24.844 |
Steam |
GWR |
2800 |
2-8-0 |
3857 |
08/10/1942 |
07/03/1964 |
21.427 |
0.274 |
|
|
06/1964 |
21.701 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
4098 |
29/07/1926 |
28/12/1963 |
37.441 |
0.466 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
06/1964 |
37.907 |
Steam |
GWR |
1400 |
0-4-2T |
1424 |
10/11/1933 |
02/12/1963 |
30.079 |
0.537 |
|
|
06/1964 |
30.616 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
4905 |
12/1928 |
13/11/1963 |
34.934 |
0.589 |
|
|
06/1964 |
35.523 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
4991 |
02/1931 |
28/12/1963 |
32.888 |
0.466 |
|
|
06/1964 |
33.353 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5022 |
30/08/1932 |
24/06/1963 |
30.836 |
0.978 |
84A |
Stafford Road |
06/1964 |
31.814 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5942 |
28/02/1935 |
02/12/1963 |
28.778 |
0.537 |
|
|
06/1964 |
29.315 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5998 |
12/06/1940 |
17/03/1964 |
23.778 |
0.247 |
|
|
06/1964 |
24.025 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
6948 |
11/12/1942 |
02/12/1963 |
20.989 |
0.537 |
|
|
06/1964 |
21.526 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
7000 |
25/05/1946 |
28/12/1963 |
17.605 |
0.466 |
85A |
Worcester |
06/1964 |
18.071 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
7002 |
06/06/1946 |
10/03/1964 |
17.773 |
0.266 |
85A |
Worcester |
06/1964 |
18.038 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
7018 |
24/05/1949 |
17/09/1963 |
14.326 |
0.745 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
06/1964 |
15.071 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
7033 |
07/07/1950 |
07/01/1963 |
12.512 |
1.438 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
06/1964 |
13.951 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
7036 |
17/08/1950 |
17/09/1963 |
13.093 |
0.745 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
06/1964 |
13.838 |
Steam |
GWR |
7400 |
0-6-0PT |
7428 |
11/06/1937 |
05/10/1962 |
25.334 |
1.696 |
|
|
06/1964 |
27.030 |
Steam |
GWR |
7400 |
0-6-0PT |
7430 |
31/08/1948 |
02/12/1963 |
15.263 |
0.537 |
|
|
06/1964 |
15.800 |
Steam |
GWR |
7400 |
0-6-0PT |
7434 |
31/08/1948 |
23/10/1962 |
14.153 |
1.647 |
|
|
06/1964 |
15.800 |
Steam |
GWR |
7400 |
0-6-0PT |
7441 |
31/01/1950 |
02/12/1963 |
13.844 |
0.537 |
|
|
06/1964 |
14.381 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9704 |
11/10/1933 |
02/12/1963 |
30.162 |
0.537 |
|
|
06/1964 |
30.699 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2276 |
12/09/1934 |
17/09/1962 |
28.033 |
1.827 |
|
|
07/1964 |
29.860 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
3207 |
25/10/1946 |
05/12/1962 |
16.123 |
1.611 |
|
|
07/1964 |
17.734 |
Steam |
GWR |
1400 |
0-4-2T |
1438 |
17/08/1934 |
09/11/1962 |
28.249 |
1.682 |
|
|
07/1964 |
29.932 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5074 |
26/07/1938 |
06/05/1964 |
25.797 |
0.192 |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
07/1964 |
25.989 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
6940 |
07/08/1942 |
06/05/1964 |
21.762 |
0.192 |
|
|
07/1964 |
21.953 |
Steam |
SR |
H |
0-4-4T |
31305 |
05/1906 |
17/11/1962 |
56.548 |
1.660 |
|
|
07/1964 |
58.208 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90237 |
06/1943 |
25/01/1964 |
20.627 |
0.471 |
|
|
07/1964 |
21.099 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47478 |
01/1928 |
11/04/1964 |
36.263 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1964 |
36.523 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2289 |
28/01/1936 |
23/05/1964 |
28.337 |
0.230 |
|
|
08/1964 |
28.567 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2294 |
03/02/1938 |
21/09/1962 |
24.647 |
1.901 |
|
|
08/1964 |
26.548 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
3209 |
08/11/1946 |
13/06/1964 |
17.608 |
0.173 |
|
|
08/1964 |
17.781 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
3778 |
28/07/1938 |
07/03/1964 |
25.627 |
0.441 |
|
|
08/1964 |
26.068 |
Steam |
GWR |
2800 |
2-8-0 |
3815 |
15/03/1940 |
30/05/1964 |
24.225 |
0.211 |
|
|
08/1964 |
24.436 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4167 |
22/10/1948 |
16/05/1964 |
15.575 |
0.249 |
|
|
08/1964 |
15.825 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5951 |
05/12/1935 |
20/04/1964 |
28.395 |
0.321 |
|
|
08/1964 |
28.715 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6646 |
09/1928 |
16/05/1964 |
35.690 |
0.249 |
|
|
08/1964 |
35.940 |
Steam |
GWR |
6959 |
4-6-0 |
7905 |
29/04/1949 |
23/05/1964 |
15.077 |
0.230 |
|
|
08/1964 |
15.307 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44030 |
12/1924 |
04/1964 |
39.359 |
0.334 |
|
|
08/1964 |
39.693 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44520 |
07/1928 |
04/01/1964 |
35.496 |
0.614 |
|
|
08/1964 |
36.110 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41231 |
08/1949 |
09/05/1964 |
14.742 |
0.268 |
|
|
08/1964 |
15.011 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41240 |
09/1949 |
09/09/1963 |
13.992 |
0.934 |
|
|
08/1964 |
14.926 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42419 |
28/11/1933 |
11/1963 |
29.984 |
0.751 |
|
|
08/1964 |
30.734 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45709 |
03/06/1936 |
23/11/1963 |
27.490 |
0.729 |
|
|
08/1964 |
28.219 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4101 |
22/08/1935 |
13/06/1964 |
28.830 |
0.258 |
|
|
09/1964 |
29.088 |
Steam |
GWR |
5400 |
0-6-0PT |
5421 |
23/11/1935 |
12/09/1962 |
26.822 |
2.011 |
|
|
09/1964 |
28.833 |
Steam |
GWR |
6800 |
4-6-0 |
6834 |
23/08/1937 |
27/06/1964 |
26.863 |
0.219 |
|
|
09/1964 |
27.082 |
Steam |
LMS |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43854 |
1918 |
06/06/1964 |
|
0.277 |
|
|
09/1964 |
|
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44289 |
01/1927 |
20/06/1964 |
37.455 |
0.238 |
|
|
09/1964 |
37.693 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44436 |
12/1927 |
11/04/1964 |
36.348 |
0.430 |
|
|
09/1964 |
36.778 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42823 |
01/10/1929 |
22/02/1964 |
34.416 |
0.564 |
|
|
09/1964 |
34.981 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41203 |
21/12/1946 |
09/09/1963 |
16.729 |
1.019 |
|
|
09/1964 |
17.748 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42226 |
02/05/1946 |
27/06/1964 |
18.167 |
0.219 |
|
|
09/1964 |
18.386 |
Steam |
LMS |
7P |
4-6-0 |
46112 |
09/10/1927 |
09/05/1964 |
36.608 |
0.353 |
|
|
09/1964 |
36.962 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
4933 |
06/1929 |
15/08/1964 |
35.192 |
0.167 |
|
|
10/1964 |
35.359 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5991 |
14/12/1939 |
18/07/1964 |
24.611 |
0.244 |
|
|
10/1964 |
24.855 |
Steam |
GWR |
7800 |
4-6-0 |
7800 |
19/01/1938 |
22/08/1964 |
26.608 |
0.148 |
|
|
10/1964 |
26.756 |
Steam |
GWR |
7800 |
4-6-0 |
7823 |
31/12/1950 |
25/07/1964 |
13.575 |
0.225 |
|
|
10/1964 |
13.800 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT Tank |
2-6-2T |
84029 |
11/06/1957 |
13/06/1964 |
7.011 |
0.340 |
|
|
10/1964 |
7.351 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90570 |
10/1943 |
25/04/1964 |
20.542 |
0.474 |
|
|
10/1964 |
21.016 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90218 |
02/1943 |
25/04/1964 |
21.205 |
0.474 |
|
|
10/1964 |
21.679 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90299 |
02/1944 |
25/04/1964 |
20.205 |
0.474 |
|
|
10/1964 |
20.679 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90433 |
01/1944 |
25/04/1964 |
20.290 |
0.474 |
|
|
10/1964 |
20.764 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44259 |
08/1926 |
08/1964 |
38.027 |
0.167 |
|
|
10/1964 |
38.195 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44403 |
01/1927 |
13/06/1964 |
37.436 |
0.340 |
|
|
10/1964 |
37.775 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44583 |
06/1939 |
08/1964 |
25.186 |
0.167 |
|
|
10/1964 |
25.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47385 |
10/1926 |
04/1964 |
37.526 |
0.501 |
|
|
10/1964 |
38.027 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47622 |
11/1928 |
11/07/1964 |
35.677 |
0.263 |
|
|
10/1964 |
35.940 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2232 |
11/10/1944 |
21/09/1964 |
19.959 |
0.151 |
|
|
11/1964 |
20.110 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2291 |
31/01/1938 |
28/09/1964 |
26.677 |
0.132 |
|
|
11/1964 |
26.808 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5091 |
02/1923 |
03/10/1964 |
41.660 |
0.118 |
2A |
Tyseley |
11/1964 |
41.778 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42965 |
08/01/1934 |
08/08/1964 |
30.603 |
0.271 |
21C |
Bushbury |
11/1964 |
30.874 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42966 |
10/01/1934 |
25/07/1964 |
30.559 |
0.310 |
21C |
Bushbury |
11/1964 |
30.868 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43136 |
31/12/1951 |
20/07/1964 |
12.562 |
0.323 |
|
|
11/1964 |
12.885 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42717 |
14/05/1927 |
17/10/1964 |
37.455 |
0.079 |
|
|
11/1964 |
37.534 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41239 |
09/1949 |
06/1964 |
14.759 |
0.419 |
|
|
11/1964 |
15.178 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42411 |
28/10/1933 |
08/1964 |
30.819 |
0.252 |
|
|
11/1964 |
31.071 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45579 |
29/09/1934 |
15/08/1964 |
29.899 |
0.252 |
|
|
11/1964 |
30.151 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45599 |
26/01/1935 |
15/08/1964 |
29.573 |
0.252 |
|
|
11/1964 |
29.825 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46248 |
02/10/1943 |
05/09/1964 |
20.942 |
0.195 |
|
|
11/1964 |
21.137 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2211 |
17/05/1940 |
14/11/1964 |
24.512 |
0.085 |
|
|
12/1964 |
24.597 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2248 |
14/08/1945 |
01/09/1964 |
19.063 |
0.288 |
|
|
12/1964 |
19.351 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2249 |
24/08/1945 |
01/09/1964 |
19.036 |
0.288 |
|
|
12/1964 |
19.323 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2257 |
04/1930 |
01/09/1964 |
34.405 |
0.288 |
|
|
12/1964 |
34.693 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2261 |
04/1930 |
01/09/1964 |
34.405 |
0.288 |
|
|
12/1964 |
34.693 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
3217 |
24/12/1947 |
14/11/1964 |
16.904 |
0.085 |
|
|
12/1964 |
16.989 |
Steam |
GWR |
2800 |
2-8-0 |
3821 |
22/04/1940 |
03/10/1964 |
24.466 |
0.200 |
|
|
12/1964 |
24.666 |
Steam |
GWR |
2800 |
2-8-0 |
3828 |
06/11/1940 |
03/10/1964 |
23.923 |
0.200 |
|
|
12/1964 |
24.123 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
4954 |
08/1929 |
14/11/1964 |
35.274 |
0.085 |
|
|
12/1964 |
35.359 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5901 |
05/1931 |
25/06/1964 |
33.137 |
0.474 |
|
|
12/1964 |
33.611 |
Steam |
GWR |
6800 |
4-6-0 |
6845 |
12/10/1937 |
26/09/1964 |
26.975 |
0.219 |
|
|
12/1964 |
27.195 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
6933 |
15/12/1941 |
14/11/1964 |
22.932 |
0.085 |
|
|
12/1964 |
23.016 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44092 |
11/1925 |
05/09/1964 |
38.833 |
0.277 |
|
|
12/1964 |
39.110 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44602 |
08/1940 |
09/1964 |
24.101 |
0.249 |
|
|
12/1964 |
24.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47467 |
01/1928 |
26/09/1964 |
36.723 |
0.219 |
|
|
12/1964 |
36.942 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42845 |
21/10/1930 |
29/08/1964 |
33.879 |
0.296 |
|
|
12/1964 |
34.175 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42860 |
25/03/1930 |
05/09/1964 |
34.474 |
0.277 |
|
|
12/1964 |
34.751 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42931 |
02/06/1931 |
05/09/1964 |
33.285 |
0.277 |
|
|
12/1964 |
33.562 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45557 |
29/06/1934 |
19/09/1964 |
30.247 |
0.238 |
|
|
12/1964 |
30.485 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45561 |
13/07/1934 |
19/09/1964 |
30.208 |
0.238 |
|
|
12/1964 |
30.447 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45564 |
18/08/1934 |
18/07/1964 |
29.937 |
0.411 |
|
|
12/1964 |
30.348 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45622 |
17/10/1934 |
19/09/1964 |
29.945 |
0.238 |
|
|
12/1964 |
30.184 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45631 |
14/11/1934 |
22/08/1964 |
29.792 |
0.315 |
|
|
12/1964 |
30.107 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46228 |
17/06/1938 |
12/09/1964 |
26.258 |
0.258 |
|
|
12/1964 |
26.515 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46239 |
29/08/1939 |
12/09/1964 |
25.058 |
0.258 |
|
|
12/1964 |
25.315 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46240 |
27/03/1940 |
12/09/1964 |
24.479 |
0.258 |
|
|
12/1964 |
24.737 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46245 |
26/06/1943 |
12/09/1964 |
21.230 |
0.258 |
|
|
12/1964 |
21.488 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46251 |
30/06/1944 |
12/09/1964 |
20.216 |
0.258 |
|
|
12/1964 |
20.474 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46254 |
17/09/1946 |
12/09/1964 |
18.000 |
0.258 |
|
|
12/1964 |
18.258 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46256 |
13/12/1947 |
03/10/1964 |
16.819 |
0.200 |
|
|
12/1964 |
17.019 |
Steam |
GNR |
K3 |
2-6-0 |
61807 |
05/1921 |
04/11/1962 |
41.501 |
|
|
|
1965 |
|
Steam |
GNR |
K3 |
2-6-0 |
61912 |
05/1931 |
16/09/1962 |
31.362 |
|
|
|
1965 |
|
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4133 |
24/10/1939 |
24/10/1964 |
25.019 |
0.227 |
|
|
01/1965 |
25.247 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4171 |
14/10/1949 |
24/10/1964 |
15.038 |
0.227 |
|
|
01/1965 |
15.266 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
4648 |
10/03/1943 |
26/09/1964 |
21.564 |
0.304 |
|
|
01/1965 |
21.868 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
4687 |
21/12/1944 |
14/11/1964 |
19.912 |
0.170 |
|
|
01/1965 |
20.082 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5927 |
02/06/1933 |
24/10/1964 |
31.416 |
0.227 |
|
|
01/1965 |
31.644 |
Steam |
GWR |
6959 |
4-6-0 |
6971 |
02/10/1947 |
31/10/1964 |
17.093 |
0.208 |
|
|
01/1965 |
17.301 |
Steam |
LMS |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43958 |
1921 |
05/09/1964 |
|
0.362 |
|
|
01/1965 |
|
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44048 |
03/1925 |
08/1964 |
39.447 |
0.419 |
|
|
01/1965 |
39.866 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44080 |
11/1925 |
11/07/1964 |
38.679 |
0.515 |
|
|
01/1965 |
39.195 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44179 |
01/1925 |
05/12/1964 |
39.915 |
0.112 |
|
|
01/1965 |
40.027 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44226 |
02/1926 |
09/1964 |
38.608 |
0.334 |
|
|
01/1965 |
38.942 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44332 |
10/1926 |
19/09/1964 |
37.956 |
0.323 |
|
|
01/1965 |
38.279 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44499 |
11/1927 |
26/09/1964 |
36.890 |
0.304 |
|
|
01/1965 |
37.195 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44516 |
06/1928 |
09/1964 |
36.277 |
0.334 |
|
|
01/1965 |
36.611 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44552 |
12/1928 |
19/09/1964 |
35.786 |
0.323 |
|
|
01/1965 |
36.110 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44554 |
12/1928 |
03/1964 |
35.271 |
0.838 |
|
|
01/1965 |
36.110 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44588 |
09/1939 |
19/09/1964 |
25.030 |
0.323 |
|
|
01/1965 |
25.353 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44605 |
02/1941 |
09/1964 |
23.597 |
0.334 |
|
|
01/1965 |
23.932 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47628 |
12/1928 |
08/1964 |
35.690 |
0.419 |
|
|
01/1965 |
36.110 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45556 |
22/06/1934 |
05/09/1964 |
30.227 |
0.362 |
|
|
01/1965 |
30.589 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45611 |
27/07/1934 |
19/09/1964 |
30.170 |
0.323 |
|
|
01/1965 |
30.493 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45620 |
11/10/1934 |
12/09/1964 |
29.942 |
0.342 |
|
|
01/1965 |
30.285 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45641 |
12/1934 |
19/09/1964 |
29.784 |
0.323 |
|
|
01/1965 |
30.107 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45676 |
18/12/1935 |
26/09/1964 |
28.795 |
0.304 |
|
|
01/1965 |
29.099 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45733 |
02/11/1936 |
19/09/1964 |
27.899 |
0.323 |
|
|
01/1965 |
28.222 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45735 |
16/11/1936 |
03/10/1964 |
27.899 |
0.285 |
|
|
01/1965 |
28.184 |
Steam |
LMS |
7P |
4-6-0 |
46125 |
11/09/1927 |
03/10/1964 |
37.088 |
0.285 |
|
|
01/1965 |
37.373 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
3601 |
30/12/1938 |
24/10/1964 |
25.836 |
0.312 |
|
|
02/1965 |
26.148 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
4602 |
04/10/1941 |
14/11/1964 |
23.129 |
0.255 |
|
|
02/1965 |
23.384 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5026 |
24/04/1934 |
14/11/1964 |
30.581 |
0.255 |
2B |
Oxley |
02/1965 |
30.836 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5056 |
17/06/1936 |
21/11/1964 |
28.449 |
0.236 |
2B |
Oxley |
02/1965 |
28.685 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5089 |
01/1923 |
14/11/1964 |
41.860 |
0.255 |
2B |
Oxley |
02/1965 |
42.115 |
Steam |
GWR |
6800 |
4-6-0 |
6842 |
28/09/1937 |
07/11/1964 |
27.129 |
0.274 |
|
|
02/1965 |
27.403 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
6925 |
09/08/1941 |
21/11/1964 |
23.301 |
0.236 |
|
|
02/1965 |
23.537 |
Steam |
GWR |
6959 |
4-6-0 |
6994 |
10/12/1948 |
14/11/1964 |
15.940 |
0.255 |
|
|
02/1965 |
16.195 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
7012 |
25/06/1948 |
14/11/1964 |
16.400 |
0.255 |
2B |
Oxley |
02/1965 |
16.655 |
Steam |
GWR |
7800 |
4-6-0 |
7806 |
16/03/1938 |
07/11/1964 |
26.666 |
0.274 |
|
|
02/1965 |
26.940 |
Steam |
GWR |
7800 |
4-6-0 |
7807 |
22/03/1938 |
21/11/1964 |
26.688 |
0.236 |
|
|
02/1965 |
26.923 |
Steam |
GWR |
7800 |
4-6-0 |
7824 |
31/12/1950 |
14/11/1964 |
13.882 |
0.255 |
|
|
02/1965 |
14.137 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90584 |
11/1943 |
05/09/1964 |
20.822 |
0.447 |
|
|
02/1965 |
21.268 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90264 |
10/1943 |
29/08/1964 |
20.888 |
0.466 |
|
|
02/1965 |
21.353 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90297 |
01/1944 |
05/09/1964 |
20.655 |
0.447 |
|
|
02/1965 |
21.101 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44340 |
10/1926 |
03/12/1962 |
36.159 |
2.205 |
|
|
02/1965 |
38.364 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47653 |
03/1929 |
24/10/1964 |
35.636 |
0.312 |
|
|
02/1965 |
35.948 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42970 |
11/01/1934 |
24/10/1964 |
30.805 |
0.312 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
02/1965 |
31.118 |
Steam |
LMS |
CORO |
4-6-2 |
46241 |
03/04/1940 |
05/09/1964 |
24.441 |
0.447 |
|
|
02/1965 |
24.888 |
Steam |
GWR |
1400 |
0-4-2T |
1453 |
23/07/1935 |
06/11/1964 |
29.312 |
0.353 |
|
|
03/1965 |
29.666 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5962 |
02/07/1936 |
27/11/1964 |
28.425 |
0.296 |
|
|
03/1965 |
28.721 |
Steam |
GWR |
6100 |
2-6-2T |
6137 |
10/1932 |
21/11/1964 |
32.123 |
0.312 |
|
|
03/1965 |
32.436 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6678 |
09/1928 |
28/11/1964 |
36.227 |
0.293 |
|
|
03/1965 |
36.521 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
8739 |
05/1931 |
14/11/1964 |
33.526 |
0.332 |
|
|
03/1965 |
33.858 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9661 |
07/12/1946 |
14/11/1964 |
17.951 |
0.332 |
|
|
03/1965 |
18.282 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9768 |
05/10/1935 |
12/12/1964 |
29.208 |
0.255 |
|
|
03/1965 |
29.463 |
Steam |
LMS |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43949 |
1921 |
26/12/1964 |
|
0.216 |
|
|
03/1965 |
|
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90282 |
12/1943 |
10/01/1965 |
21.088 |
0.175 |
|
|
03/1965 |
21.263 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44580 |
05/1939 |
21/11/1964 |
25.540 |
0.312 |
|
|
03/1965 |
25.852 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47476 |
12/1927 |
09/05/1964 |
36.425 |
0.849 |
|
|
03/1965 |
37.274 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47524 |
03/1928 |
26/09/1964 |
36.559 |
0.466 |
|
|
03/1965 |
37.025 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42971 |
10/01/1934 |
19/12/1964 |
30.962 |
0.236 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
03/1965 |
31.197 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46420 |
06/11/1948 |
16/01/1965 |
16.205 |
0.159 |
|
|
03/1965 |
16.364 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4172 |
24/10/1949 |
16/01/1965 |
15.241 |
0.244 |
|
|
04/1965 |
15.485 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4173 |
28/10/1949 |
05/12/1964 |
15.115 |
0.359 |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
04/1965 |
15.474 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
4613 |
28/02/1942 |
14/12/1964 |
22.808 |
0.334 |
|
|
04/1965 |
23.142 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
7019 |
27/05/1949 |
13/02/1965 |
15.729 |
0.167 |
2B |
Oxley |
04/1965 |
15.896 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
7026 |
16/08/1949 |
17/10/1964 |
15.181 |
0.493 |
2A |
Tyseley |
04/1965 |
15.674 |
Steam |
GWR |
7800 |
4-6-0 |
7805 |
14/03/1938 |
05/12/1964 |
26.748 |
0.359 |
|
|
04/1965 |
27.107 |
Steam |
GWR |
7800 |
4-6-0 |
7818 |
31/01/1939 |
23/01/1965 |
25.997 |
0.225 |
|
|
04/1965 |
26.222 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
8793 |
02/03/1934 |
14/12/1964 |
30.808 |
0.334 |
|
|
04/1965 |
31.142 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44344 |
01/1927 |
12/12/1964 |
37.934 |
0.340 |
|
|
04/1965 |
38.274 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44421 |
10/1927 |
12/12/1964 |
37.186 |
0.340 |
|
|
04/1965 |
37.526 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42400 |
13/09/1933 |
23/01/1965 |
31.384 |
0.225 |
|
|
04/1965 |
31.608 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45552 |
01/12/1934 |
26/09/1964 |
29.841 |
0.551 |
|
|
04/1965 |
30.392 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45586 |
15/12/1934 |
23/01/1965 |
30.129 |
0.225 |
|
|
04/1965 |
30.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45704 |
11/05/1936 |
23/01/1965 |
28.723 |
0.225 |
|
|
04/1965 |
28.948 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5014 |
07/07/1932 |
06/02/1965 |
32.608 |
0.268 |
2A |
Tyseley |
05/1965 |
32.877 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
5063 |
22/06/1937 |
20/02/1965 |
27.685 |
0.230 |
2B |
Oxley |
05/1965 |
27.915 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
6907 |
09/11/1940 |
06/02/1965 |
24.260 |
0.268 |
|
|
05/1965 |
24.529 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
7011 |
17/06/1948 |
13/02/1965 |
16.671 |
0.249 |
2B |
Oxley |
05/1965 |
16.921 |
Steam |
GWR |
4073 |
4-6-0 |
7014 |
16/07/1948 |
06/02/1965 |
16.573 |
0.268 |
2A |
Tyseley |
05/1965 |
16.841 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48007 |
09/1935 |
09/01/1965 |
29.340 |
0.345 |
|
|
05/1965 |
29.685 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90291 |
01/1944 |
06/02/1965 |
21.077 |
0.268 |
|
|
05/1965 |
21.345 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44035 |
01/1925 |
13/02/1965 |
40.107 |
0.249 |
|
|
05/1965 |
40.356 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46524 |
11/03/1953 |
20/02/1965 |
11.956 |
0.230 |
|
|
05/1965 |
12.186 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46525 |
07/03/1953 |
12/12/1964 |
11.775 |
0.422 |
|
|
05/1965 |
12.197 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42350 |
04/06/1929 |
13/02/1965 |
35.721 |
0.249 |
|
|
05/1965 |
35.970 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42488 |
02/04/1937 |
13/02/1965 |
27.888 |
0.249 |
|
|
05/1965 |
28.137 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42609 |
22/12/1936 |
13/02/1965 |
28.164 |
0.249 |
|
|
05/1965 |
28.414 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42667 |
03/10/1942 |
13/02/1965 |
22.381 |
0.249 |
|
|
05/1965 |
22.630 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45567 |
18/08/1934 |
30/01/1965 |
30.474 |
0.288 |
|
|
05/1965 |
30.762 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45595 |
05/01/1935 |
30/01/1965 |
30.090 |
0.288 |
|
|
05/1965 |
30.378 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
6906 |
08/11/1940 |
03/04/1965 |
24.416 |
0.200 |
|
|
06/1965 |
24.616 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42430 |
04/03/1936 |
27/03/1965 |
29.082 |
0.219 |
|
|
06/1965 |
29.301 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92038 |
14/12/1954 |
11/04/1965 |
10.332 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
10.592 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92044 |
29/01/1955 |
11/04/1965 |
10.205 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
10.466 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92140 |
31/07/1957 |
11/04/1965 |
7.701 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
7.962 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90136 |
05/1943 |
11/04/1965 |
21.923 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
22.184 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90164 |
07/1943 |
11/04/1965 |
21.756 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
22.016 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90188 |
09/1943 |
11/04/1965 |
21.586 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
21.847 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90202 |
10/1943 |
11/04/1965 |
21.504 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
21.764 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90225 |
05/1943 |
11/04/1965 |
21.923 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
22.184 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90442 |
03/1944 |
04/04/1965 |
21.068 |
0.279 |
|
|
07/1965 |
21.348 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90419 |
03/1945 |
11/04/1965 |
20.088 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
20.348 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90383 |
01/1944 |
18/04/1965 |
21.271 |
0.241 |
|
|
07/1965 |
21.512 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90496 |
08/1944 |
11/04/1965 |
20.668 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
20.929 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90668 |
10/1944 |
18/04/1965 |
20.521 |
0.241 |
|
|
07/1965 |
20.762 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44051 |
04/1925 |
12/12/1964 |
39.688 |
0.589 |
|
|
07/1965 |
40.277 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44134 |
09/1925 |
28/11/1964 |
39.230 |
0.627 |
|
|
07/1965 |
39.858 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44501 |
11/1927 |
12/12/1964 |
37.101 |
0.589 |
|
|
07/1965 |
37.690 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47452 |
10/1926 |
27/03/1965 |
38.474 |
0.301 |
|
|
07/1965 |
38.775 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43037 |
15/06/1949 |
11/04/1965 |
15.833 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
16.093 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43067 |
14/12/1950 |
11/04/1965 |
14.334 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
14.595 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43090 |
09/12/1950 |
11/04/1965 |
14.348 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
14.608 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43092 |
16/12/1950 |
11/04/1965 |
14.329 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
14.589 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43144 |
05/09/1951 |
11/04/1965 |
13.608 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
13.868 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43148 |
17/10/1951 |
11/04/1965 |
13.493 |
0.260 |
|
|
07/1965 |
13.753 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42284 |
08/09/1947 |
26/12/1964 |
17.312 |
0.551 |
|
|
07/1965 |
17.863 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42291 |
28/10/1947 |
26/12/1964 |
17.175 |
0.551 |
|
|
07/1965 |
17.726 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42198 |
13/03/1948 |
08/05/1965 |
17.164 |
0.186 |
|
|
07/1965 |
17.351 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6633 |
08/1928 |
29/05/1965 |
36.811 |
0.214 |
|
|
08/1965 |
37.025 |
Steam |
GWR |
6800 |
4-6-0 |
6866 |
02/03/1939 |
29/05/1965 |
26.260 |
0.214 |
|
|
08/1965 |
26.474 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9646 |
04/05/1946 |
15/05/1965 |
19.044 |
0.252 |
|
|
08/1965 |
19.296 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92147 |
30/09/1957 |
04/04/1965 |
7.515 |
0.364 |
|
|
08/1965 |
7.879 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48733 |
10/1945 |
29/05/1965 |
19.633 |
0.214 |
|
|
08/1965 |
19.847 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90314 |
03/1944 |
24/04/1965 |
21.123 |
0.310 |
|
|
08/1965 |
21.433 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90115 |
03/1943 |
09/05/1965 |
22.167 |
0.268 |
|
|
08/1965 |
22.436 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90541 |
07/1943 |
08/05/1965 |
21.830 |
0.271 |
|
|
08/1965 |
22.101 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90166 |
07/1943 |
09/05/1965 |
21.833 |
0.268 |
|
|
08/1965 |
22.101 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90181 |
09/1943 |
08/05/1965 |
21.660 |
0.271 |
|
|
08/1965 |
21.932 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90085 |
09/1944 |
16/05/1965 |
20.679 |
0.249 |
|
|
08/1965 |
20.929 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90632 |
03/1944 |
08/05/1965 |
21.162 |
0.271 |
|
|
08/1965 |
21.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42494 |
15/05/1937 |
08/05/1965 |
28.000 |
0.271 |
|
|
08/1965 |
28.271 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42555 |
21/07/1936 |
08/05/1965 |
28.816 |
0.271 |
|
|
08/1965 |
29.088 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42147 |
23/04/1948 |
01/05/1965 |
17.033 |
0.290 |
|
|
08/1965 |
17.323 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42158 |
02/07/1948 |
24/04/1965 |
16.822 |
0.310 |
|
|
08/1965 |
17.132 |
Steam |
LNER |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
60847 |
06/03/1939 |
29/06/1965 |
26.334 |
0.129 |
50A |
York (North) |
08/1965 |
26.463 |
Steam |
LNER |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
60929 |
25/06/1941 |
21/06/1965 |
24.005 |
0.151 |
50A |
York (North) |
08/1965 |
24.156 |
Steam |
LNER |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
60963 |
12/01/1943 |
29/06/1965 |
22.477 |
0.129 |
50A |
York (North) |
08/1965 |
22.605 |
Steam |
GWR |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2210 |
09/09/1939 |
05/06/1965 |
25.756 |
0.279 |
|
|
09/1965 |
26.036 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
6926 |
11/11/1941 |
29/05/1965 |
23.562 |
0.299 |
|
|
09/1965 |
23.860 |
Steam |
LMS |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43982 |
1922 |
26/06/1965 |
|
0.222 |
|
|
09/1965 |
|
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44450 |
02/1928 |
08/05/1965 |
37.252 |
0.356 |
|
|
09/1965 |
37.608 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47647 |
02/1929 |
08/05/1965 |
36.249 |
0.356 |
|
|
09/1965 |
36.605 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46497 |
02/1952 |
24/04/1965 |
13.197 |
0.395 |
|
|
09/1965 |
13.592 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42482 |
18/02/1937 |
24/04/1965 |
28.197 |
0.395 |
|
|
09/1965 |
28.592 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42604 |
07/12/1936 |
08/05/1965 |
28.436 |
0.356 |
|
|
09/1965 |
28.792 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42050 |
07/09/1950 |
24/04/1965 |
14.638 |
0.395 |
|
|
09/1965 |
15.033 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42062 |
15/12/1950 |
22/05/1965 |
14.444 |
0.318 |
|
|
09/1965 |
14.762 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42070 |
02/11/1950 |
26/06/1965 |
14.658 |
0.222 |
|
|
09/1965 |
14.879 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42075 |
30/11/1950 |
22/05/1965 |
14.485 |
0.318 |
|
|
09/1965 |
14.803 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
5684 |
10/1926 |
17/07/1965 |
38.781 |
0.247 |
|
|
10/1965 |
39.027 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48001 |
06/1935 |
09/01/1965 |
29.592 |
0.764 |
|
|
10/1965 |
30.356 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48027 |
07/1936 |
20/03/1965 |
28.699 |
0.573 |
|
|
10/1965 |
29.271 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48259 |
10/1941 |
26/06/1965 |
23.712 |
0.304 |
|
|
10/1965 |
24.016 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48478 |
30/06/1945 |
26/06/1965 |
20.003 |
0.304 |
|
|
10/1965 |
20.307 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48601 |
02/1943 |
19/06/1965 |
22.356 |
0.323 |
|
|
10/1965 |
22.679 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48611 |
05/1943 |
05/12/1964 |
21.575 |
0.860 |
|
|
10/1965 |
22.436 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48688 |
02/1944 |
24/07/1965 |
21.452 |
0.227 |
|
|
10/1965 |
21.679 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44043 |
02/1925 |
07/1965 |
40.438 |
0.252 |
|
|
10/1965 |
40.690 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44115 |
05/1925 |
10/07/1965 |
40.181 |
0.266 |
|
|
10/1965 |
40.447 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47359 |
07/1926 |
17/07/1965 |
39.033 |
0.247 |
|
|
10/1965 |
39.279 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47665 |
04/1929 |
17/07/1965 |
36.279 |
0.247 |
|
|
10/1965 |
36.526 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47680 |
10/1931 |
17/07/1965 |
33.778 |
0.247 |
|
|
10/1965 |
34.025 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46404 |
12/1946 |
08/05/1965 |
18.408 |
0.438 |
|
|
10/1965 |
18.847 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46444 |
02/1950 |
10/07/1965 |
15.408 |
0.266 |
|
|
10/1965 |
15.674 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41218 |
18/09/1948 |
10/07/1965 |
16.819 |
0.266 |
|
|
10/1965 |
17.085 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42381 |
22/06/1932 |
08/05/1965 |
32.899 |
0.438 |
|
|
10/1965 |
33.337 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42456 |
20/08/1936 |
24/04/1965 |
28.696 |
0.477 |
|
|
10/1965 |
29.173 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42542 |
16/12/1935 |
17/07/1965 |
29.605 |
0.247 |
|
|
10/1965 |
29.852 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42564 |
18/08/1936 |
08/05/1965 |
28.740 |
0.438 |
|
|
10/1965 |
29.178 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42222 |
12/03/1946 |
08/05/1965 |
19.170 |
0.438 |
|
|
10/1965 |
19.608 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42289 |
14/10/1947 |
08/05/1965 |
17.578 |
0.438 |
|
|
10/1965 |
18.016 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42106 |
03/10/1950 |
08/05/1965 |
14.605 |
0.438 |
|
|
10/1965 |
15.044 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44741 |
12/06/1948 |
13/03/1965 |
16.762 |
0.592 |
|
|
10/1965 |
17.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45604 |
02/03/1935 |
17/07/1965 |
30.397 |
0.247 |
|
|
10/1965 |
30.644 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT |
2-6-0 |
76106 |
07/1957 |
18/09/1965 |
8.184 |
0.159 |
|
|
11/1965 |
8.342 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT |
2-6-0 |
78033 |
09/1954 |
02/10/1965 |
11.055 |
0.121 |
|
|
11/1965 |
11.175 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48097 |
12/1938 |
24/07/1965 |
26.625 |
0.312 |
|
|
11/1965 |
26.937 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48184 |
04/1942 |
17/07/1965 |
23.271 |
0.332 |
|
|
11/1965 |
23.603 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48419 |
17/11/1943 |
08/05/1965 |
21.488 |
0.523 |
|
|
11/1965 |
22.011 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48446 |
01/07/1944 |
24/07/1965 |
21.077 |
0.312 |
|
|
11/1965 |
21.389 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90125 |
04/1943 |
17/07/1965 |
22.271 |
0.332 |
|
|
11/1965 |
22.603 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90275 |
11/1943 |
04/07/1965 |
21.649 |
0.367 |
|
|
11/1965 |
22.016 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90720 |
03/1945 |
17/07/1965 |
20.353 |
0.332 |
|
|
11/1965 |
20.685 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44155 |
12/1925 |
09/10/1965 |
39.844 |
0.101 |
|
|
11/1965 |
39.945 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46456 |
05/1950 |
25/09/1965 |
15.375 |
0.140 |
|
|
11/1965 |
15.515 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42869 |
01/05/1930 |
10/07/1965 |
35.216 |
0.351 |
|
|
11/1965 |
35.567 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42936 |
20/12/1932 |
10/07/1965 |
32.575 |
0.351 |
|
|
11/1965 |
32.926 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42317 |
22/03/1928 |
23/08/1965 |
37.447 |
0.230 |
|
|
11/1965 |
37.677 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42406 |
10/10/1933 |
28/08/1965 |
31.904 |
0.216 |
|
|
11/1965 |
32.121 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42645 |
02/12/1938 |
11/09/1965 |
26.795 |
0.178 |
|
|
11/1965 |
26.973 |
Steam |
LNER |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
60828 |
28/03/1938 |
04/10/1965 |
27.540 |
0.115 |
50A |
York (North) |
11/1965 |
27.655 |
Steam |
LNER |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
60843 |
30/12/1938 |
04/10/1965 |
26.781 |
0.115 |
56B |
Ardsley |
11/1965 |
26.896 |
Steam |
LNER |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
60895 |
26/01/1940 |
04/10/1965 |
25.707 |
0.115 |
50A |
York (North) |
11/1965 |
25.822 |
Steam |
LNER |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
60923 |
15/11/1941 |
04/10/1965 |
23.901 |
0.115 |
56B |
Ardsley |
11/1965 |
24.016 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4147 |
30/09/1946 |
02/10/1965 |
19.019 |
0.203 |
|
|
12/1965 |
19.222 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
5988 |
28/11/1939 |
09/10/1965 |
25.882 |
0.184 |
|
|
12/1965 |
26.066 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6665 |
09/1928 |
09/10/1965 |
37.090 |
0.184 |
|
|
12/1965 |
37.274 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6681 |
10/1928 |
09/10/1965 |
37.008 |
0.184 |
|
|
12/1965 |
37.192 |
Steam |
GWR |
6800 |
4-6-0 |
6874 |
06/04/1939 |
10/09/1965 |
26.449 |
0.263 |
|
|
12/1965 |
26.712 |
Steam |
GWR |
6959 |
4-6-0 |
6980 |
20/11/1947 |
09/10/1965 |
17.899 |
0.184 |
|
|
12/1965 |
18.082 |
Steam |
GWR |
6959 |
4-6-0 |
7908 |
11/01/1950 |
09/10/1965 |
15.753 |
0.184 |
|
|
12/1965 |
15.937 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT |
2-6-0 |
78030 |
09/1954 |
09/10/1965 |
11.074 |
0.184 |
|
|
12/1965 |
11.258 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48039 |
09/1936 |
24/07/1965 |
28.874 |
0.395 |
|
|
12/1965 |
29.268 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48099 |
01/1939 |
24/07/1965 |
26.540 |
0.395 |
|
|
12/1965 |
26.934 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48116 |
04/1939 |
19/06/1965 |
26.197 |
0.490 |
|
|
12/1965 |
26.688 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48135 |
05/1941 |
11/09/1965 |
24.342 |
0.260 |
|
|
12/1965 |
24.603 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48297 |
01/1942 |
24/07/1965 |
23.537 |
0.395 |
|
|
12/1965 |
23.932 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48704 |
06/1944 |
11/09/1965 |
21.255 |
0.260 |
|
|
12/1965 |
21.515 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90261 |
09/1943 |
10/07/1965 |
21.833 |
0.433 |
|
|
12/1965 |
22.266 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90040 |
01/1944 |
31/07/1965 |
21.556 |
0.375 |
|
|
12/1965 |
21.932 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44057 |
08/1925 |
13/11/1965 |
40.274 |
0.088 |
|
|
12/1965 |
40.362 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44210 |
11/1925 |
09/10/1965 |
39.926 |
0.184 |
|
|
12/1965 |
40.110 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44364 |
04/1927 |
04/01/1964 |
36.748 |
1.948 |
|
|
12/1965 |
38.696 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47451 |
07/1927 |
09/1965 |
38.197 |
0.249 |
|
|
12/1965 |
38.447 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47519 |
02/1928 |
09/1965 |
37.608 |
0.249 |
|
|
12/1965 |
37.858 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47681 |
10/1931 |
07/08/1965 |
33.836 |
0.356 |
|
|
12/1965 |
34.192 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46430 |
11/12/1948 |
09/10/1965 |
16.838 |
0.184 |
|
|
12/1965 |
17.022 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46459 |
05/1950 |
09/1965 |
15.348 |
0.249 |
|
|
12/1965 |
15.597 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42322 |
19/05/1928 |
31/07/1965 |
37.225 |
0.375 |
|
|
12/1965 |
37.600 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44763 |
09/10/1947 |
02/10/1965 |
17.995 |
0.203 |
|
|
12/1965 |
18.197 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44827 |
07/1944 |
03/07/1965 |
20.981 |
0.452 |
|
|
12/1965 |
21.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45078 |
03/1935 |
30/10/1965 |
30.649 |
0.126 |
|
|
12/1965 |
30.775 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45093 |
04/1935 |
10/1965 |
30.523 |
0.167 |
|
|
12/1965 |
30.690 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45146 |
06/1935 |
19/06/1965 |
30.033 |
0.490 |
|
|
12/1965 |
30.523 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45229 |
08/1936 |
04/09/1965 |
29.074 |
0.279 |
|
|
12/1965 |
29.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45301 |
01/1937 |
10/07/1965 |
28.501 |
0.433 |
|
|
12/1965 |
28.934 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45334 |
03/1937 |
07/1965 |
28.353 |
0.419 |
|
|
12/1965 |
28.773 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45335 |
03/1937 |
10/07/1965 |
28.340 |
0.433 |
|
|
12/1965 |
28.773 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45398 |
08/1937 |
09/1965 |
28.104 |
0.249 |
|
|
12/1965 |
28.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45416 |
10/1937 |
10/07/1965 |
27.753 |
0.433 |
|
|
12/1965 |
28.186 |
Steam |
LNER |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
60876 |
30/05/1940 |
19/10/1965 |
25.405 |
0.156 |
50A |
York (North) |
12/1965 |
25.562 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4154 |
05/07/1947 |
02/10/1965 |
18.258 |
0.288 |
|
|
01/1966 |
18.545 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4165 |
08/10/1948 |
09/10/1965 |
17.014 |
0.268 |
|
|
01/1966 |
17.282 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4175 |
07/11/1949 |
02/10/1965 |
15.912 |
0.288 |
|
|
01/1966 |
16.200 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6604 |
09/1927 |
02/10/1965 |
38.074 |
0.288 |
|
|
01/1966 |
38.362 |
Steam |
GWR |
6800 |
4-6-0 |
6870 |
25/03/1939 |
11/09/1965 |
26.485 |
0.345 |
|
|
01/1966 |
26.830 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
6934 |
20/12/1941 |
09/10/1965 |
23.819 |
0.268 |
|
|
01/1966 |
24.088 |
Steam |
GWR |
6959 |
4-6-0 |
7912 |
03/03/1950 |
09/10/1965 |
15.614 |
0.268 |
|
|
01/1966 |
15.882 |
Steam |
GWR |
6959 |
4-6-0 |
7915 |
30/03/1950 |
09/10/1965 |
15.540 |
0.268 |
|
|
01/1966 |
15.808 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9613 |
01/09/1945 |
23/10/1965 |
20.156 |
0.230 |
|
|
01/1966 |
20.386 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73090 |
08/10/1955 |
09/10/1965 |
10.011 |
0.268 |
|
|
01/1966 |
10.279 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT |
2-6-0 |
76023 |
12/1952 |
09/10/1965 |
12.825 |
0.268 |
|
|
01/1966 |
13.093 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT |
2-6-0 |
78000 |
12/12/1952 |
26/06/1965 |
12.545 |
0.556 |
|
|
01/1966 |
13.101 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT |
2-6-0 |
78029 |
07/1954 |
02/10/1965 |
11.225 |
0.288 |
|
|
01/1966 |
11.512 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT |
2-6-0 |
78032 |
09/1954 |
02/10/1965 |
11.055 |
0.288 |
|
|
01/1966 |
11.342 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT |
2-6-0 |
78043 |
25/12/1954 |
02/10/1965 |
10.778 |
0.288 |
|
|
01/1966 |
11.066 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT Tank |
2-6-2T |
84009 |
03/09/1953 |
20/11/1965 |
12.222 |
0.153 |
|
|
01/1966 |
12.375 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48004 |
06/1935 |
06/11/1965 |
30.416 |
0.192 |
|
|
01/1966 |
30.608 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48096 |
12/1938 |
11/1965 |
26.937 |
0.167 |
|
|
01/1966 |
27.104 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48328 |
04/1944 |
02/10/1965 |
21.479 |
0.288 |
|
|
01/1966 |
21.767 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48366 |
09/1944 |
11/1965 |
21.181 |
0.167 |
|
|
01/1966 |
21.348 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48413 |
12/10/1943 |
11/1965 |
22.110 |
0.167 |
|
|
01/1966 |
22.277 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44075 |
11/1925 |
27/11/1965 |
40.060 |
0.134 |
|
|
01/1966 |
40.195 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44420 |
10/1927 |
09/1965 |
37.945 |
0.334 |
|
|
01/1966 |
38.279 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47338 |
08/1926 |
09/10/1965 |
39.178 |
0.268 |
|
|
01/1966 |
39.447 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47371 |
09/1926 |
09/1965 |
39.027 |
0.334 |
|
|
01/1966 |
39.362 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47428 |
10/1926 |
09/10/1965 |
39.011 |
0.268 |
|
|
01/1966 |
39.279 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47480 |
01/1928 |
09/1965 |
37.693 |
0.334 |
|
|
01/1966 |
38.027 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47539 |
04/1928 |
08/02/1963 |
34.841 |
2.937 |
|
|
01/1966 |
37.778 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47666 |
04/1929 |
09/1965 |
36.444 |
0.334 |
|
|
01/1966 |
36.778 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42964 |
08/01/1934 |
20/11/1965 |
31.888 |
0.153 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
01/1966 |
32.041 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46425 |
04/12/1948 |
11/09/1965 |
16.781 |
0.345 |
|
|
01/1966 |
17.126 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46511 |
12/12/1952 |
09/1965 |
12.767 |
0.334 |
|
|
01/1966 |
13.101 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42343 |
26/04/1929 |
30/10/1965 |
36.537 |
0.211 |
|
|
01/1966 |
36.748 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42374 |
03/10/1929 |
02/10/1965 |
36.022 |
0.288 |
|
|
01/1966 |
36.310 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42597 |
09/11/1936 |
23/10/1965 |
28.973 |
0.230 |
|
|
01/1966 |
29.203 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42295 |
19/11/1947 |
16/10/1965 |
17.921 |
0.249 |
|
|
01/1966 |
18.170 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42104 |
20/09/1950 |
02/10/1965 |
15.044 |
0.288 |
|
|
01/1966 |
15.332 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45037 |
09/1934 |
27/11/1965 |
31.222 |
0.134 |
|
|
01/1966 |
31.356 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45272 |
11/1936 |
09/10/1965 |
28.918 |
0.268 |
|
|
01/1966 |
29.186 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45439 |
11/1937 |
11/1965 |
28.019 |
0.167 |
|
|
01/1966 |
28.186 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
3754 |
17/11/1937 |
13/11/1965 |
28.008 |
0.258 |
|
|
02/1966 |
28.266 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4168 |
01/11/1948 |
02/10/1965 |
16.929 |
0.373 |
|
|
02/1966 |
17.301 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
5659 |
02/1926 |
27/11/1965 |
39.808 |
0.219 |
|
|
02/1966 |
40.027 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6651 |
08/1928 |
09/10/1965 |
37.175 |
0.353 |
|
|
02/1966 |
37.529 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6668 |
09/1928 |
04/12/1965 |
37.244 |
0.200 |
|
|
02/1966 |
37.444 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6683 |
10/1928 |
23/10/1965 |
37.047 |
0.315 |
|
|
02/1966 |
37.362 |
Steam |
GWR |
6959 |
4-6-0 |
6976 |
29/10/1947 |
09/10/1965 |
17.959 |
0.353 |
|
|
02/1966 |
18.312 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT |
2-6-0 |
78027 |
06/1954 |
18/09/1965 |
11.268 |
0.411 |
|
|
02/1966 |
11.679 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT Tank |
2-6-2T |
84003 |
10/08/1953 |
02/10/1965 |
12.153 |
0.373 |
|
|
02/1966 |
12.526 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48016 |
01/1937 |
27/11/1965 |
28.885 |
0.219 |
|
|
02/1966 |
29.104 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48262 |
06/1941 |
20/11/1965 |
24.449 |
0.238 |
|
|
02/1966 |
24.688 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48314 |
12/1943 |
04/12/1965 |
21.986 |
0.200 |
|
|
02/1966 |
22.186 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48330 |
05/1944 |
02/10/1965 |
21.397 |
0.373 |
|
|
02/1966 |
21.770 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90227 |
05/1943 |
26/09/1965 |
22.384 |
0.389 |
|
|
02/1966 |
22.773 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44188 |
04/1925 |
13/11/1965 |
40.608 |
0.258 |
|
|
02/1966 |
40.866 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42946 |
09/11/1933 |
20/11/1965 |
32.052 |
0.238 |
2B |
Oxley |
02/1966 |
32.290 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42982 |
08/02/1934 |
13/11/1965 |
31.784 |
0.258 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
02/1966 |
32.041 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42900 |
23/08/1930 |
09/10/1965 |
35.153 |
0.353 |
|
|
02/1966 |
35.507 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42673 |
28/03/1945 |
14/08/1965 |
20.395 |
0.507 |
|
|
02/1966 |
20.901 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44757 |
31/12/1948 |
13/11/1965 |
16.879 |
0.258 |
|
|
02/1966 |
17.137 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45257 |
10/1936 |
10/1965 |
29.019 |
0.337 |
|
|
02/1966 |
29.356 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45705 |
21/05/1936 |
06/11/1965 |
29.482 |
0.277 |
|
|
02/1966 |
29.759 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73165 |
03/1957 |
09/1965 |
8.510 |
0.496 |
|
|
03/1966 |
9.005 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48285 |
09/1942 |
18/09/1965 |
23.025 |
0.488 |
|
|
03/1966 |
23.512 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48391 |
04/1945 |
18/12/1965 |
20.690 |
0.238 |
|
|
03/1966 |
20.929 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48500 |
02/1944 |
18/12/1965 |
21.855 |
0.238 |
|
|
03/1966 |
22.093 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48759 |
12/1945 |
27/11/1965 |
19.964 |
0.296 |
|
|
03/1966 |
20.260 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47439 |
05/1927 |
09/1965 |
38.364 |
0.496 |
|
|
03/1966 |
38.860 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46510 |
09/12/1952 |
09/1965 |
12.775 |
0.496 |
|
|
03/1966 |
13.271 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42831 |
09/05/1930 |
18/12/1965 |
35.636 |
0.238 |
|
|
03/1966 |
35.874 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42426 |
17/02/1936 |
11/12/1965 |
29.836 |
0.258 |
|
|
03/1966 |
30.093 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42139 |
15/03/1950 |
27/12/1965 |
15.797 |
0.214 |
|
|
03/1966 |
16.011 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44687 |
31/05/1951 |
22/01/1966 |
14.658 |
0.142 |
|
|
03/1966 |
14.800 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44823 |
12/1944 |
20/11/1965 |
20.945 |
0.315 |
|
|
03/1966 |
21.260 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45020 |
08/1934 |
11/12/1965 |
31.345 |
0.258 |
|
|
03/1966 |
31.603 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45143 |
14/06/1935 |
11/12/1965 |
30.515 |
0.258 |
|
|
03/1966 |
30.773 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45300 |
01/1937 |
12/1965 |
28.934 |
0.247 |
|
|
03/1966 |
29.181 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45563 |
09/08/1934 |
27/11/1965 |
31.323 |
0.296 |
|
|
03/1966 |
31.619 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45589 |
15/12/1934 |
22/03/1965 |
30.288 |
0.981 |
|
|
03/1966 |
31.268 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45684 |
06/02/1936 |
11/12/1965 |
29.866 |
0.258 |
|
|
03/1966 |
30.123 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45721 |
26/08/1936 |
09/10/1965 |
29.140 |
0.430 |
|
|
03/1966 |
29.570 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
4683 |
28/11/1944 |
02/10/1965 |
20.858 |
0.534 |
|
|
04/1966 |
21.392 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
6951 |
08/02/1943 |
25/12/1965 |
22.893 |
0.304 |
|
|
04/1966 |
23.197 |
Steam |
GWR |
4900 |
4-6-0 |
6952 |
22/02/1943 |
25/12/1965 |
22.855 |
0.304 |
|
|
04/1966 |
23.159 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9669 |
19/04/1948 |
22/01/1966 |
17.773 |
0.227 |
|
|
04/1966 |
18.000 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9724 |
06/12/1934 |
15/01/1966 |
31.132 |
0.247 |
|
|
04/1966 |
31.378 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT |
2-6-0 |
78035 |
06/11/1954 |
12/1965 |
11.115 |
0.332 |
|
|
04/1966 |
11.447 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48037 |
09/1936 |
25/12/1965 |
29.296 |
0.304 |
|
|
04/1966 |
29.600 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48134 |
04/1941 |
08/01/1966 |
24.751 |
0.266 |
|
|
04/1966 |
25.016 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48207 |
07/1942 |
15/01/1966 |
23.521 |
0.247 |
|
|
04/1966 |
23.767 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48246 |
05/1940 |
15/01/1966 |
25.688 |
0.247 |
|
|
04/1966 |
25.934 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48248 |
07/1940 |
01/01/1966 |
25.482 |
0.285 |
|
|
04/1966 |
25.767 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48434 |
31/03/1944 |
01/01/1966 |
21.770 |
0.285 |
|
|
04/1966 |
22.055 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48452 |
09/09/1944 |
29/01/1966 |
21.403 |
0.208 |
|
|
04/1966 |
21.611 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48555 |
15/06/1945 |
29/01/1966 |
20.638 |
0.208 |
|
|
04/1966 |
20.847 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48638 |
09/1943 |
22/01/1966 |
22.370 |
0.227 |
|
|
04/1966 |
22.597 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48644 |
11/1943 |
22/01/1966 |
22.203 |
0.227 |
|
|
04/1966 |
22.430 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42334 |
12/03/1929 |
25/12/1965 |
36.814 |
0.304 |
|
|
04/1966 |
37.118 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44764 |
11/1947 |
09/1965 |
17.847 |
0.581 |
|
|
04/1966 |
18.427 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44904 |
10/1945 |
25/12/1965 |
20.208 |
0.304 |
|
|
04/1966 |
20.512 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45026 |
09/1934 |
09/10/1965 |
31.088 |
0.515 |
|
|
04/1966 |
31.603 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45068 |
01/1935 |
12/1965 |
30.937 |
0.332 |
|
|
04/1966 |
31.268 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45314 |
02/1937 |
10/1965 |
28.682 |
0.499 |
|
|
04/1966 |
29.181 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45600 |
02/02/1935 |
18/12/1965 |
30.896 |
0.323 |
|
|
04/1966 |
31.219 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
6671 |
09/1928 |
09/10/1965 |
37.090 |
0.597 |
|
|
05/1966 |
37.688 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73038 |
12/09/1953 |
09/1965 |
12.016 |
0.663 |
|
|
05/1966 |
12.679 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48065 |
11/1936 |
12/02/1966 |
29.263 |
0.252 |
|
|
05/1966 |
29.515 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48447 |
14/07/1944 |
29/01/1966 |
21.559 |
0.290 |
|
|
05/1966 |
21.849 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48479 |
21/07/1945 |
12/02/1966 |
20.578 |
0.252 |
|
|
05/1966 |
20.830 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47677 |
08/1931 |
06/11/1965 |
34.252 |
0.521 |
|
|
05/1966 |
34.773 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46527 |
01/04/1953 |
09/10/1965 |
12.532 |
0.597 |
|
|
05/1966 |
13.129 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42484 |
04/03/1937 |
29/01/1966 |
28.926 |
0.290 |
|
|
05/1966 |
29.216 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42156 |
22/06/1948 |
05/02/1966 |
17.636 |
0.271 |
|
|
05/1966 |
17.907 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44743 |
26/06/1948 |
08/01/1966 |
17.548 |
0.348 |
|
|
05/1966 |
17.896 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45181 |
09/1935 |
15/01/1966 |
30.356 |
0.329 |
|
|
05/1966 |
30.685 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45632 |
11/11/1934 |
09/10/1965 |
30.932 |
0.597 |
|
|
05/1966 |
31.529 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61089 |
22/10/1946 |
02/04/1966 |
19.458 |
0.118 |
16B |
Colwick |
05/1966 |
19.575 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61302 |
22/03/1948 |
02/04/1966 |
18.041 |
0.118 |
16B |
Colwick |
05/1966 |
18.159 |
Steam |
GWR |
1600 |
0-6-0PT |
1660 |
28/02/1955 |
26/02/1966 |
11.003 |
0.299 |
|
|
06/1966 |
11.301 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9776 |
25/03/1936 |
16/04/1966 |
30.079 |
0.164 |
|
|
06/1966 |
30.244 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48005 |
06/1935 |
19/03/1966 |
30.781 |
0.241 |
|
|
06/1966 |
31.022 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48089 |
01/1937 |
19/02/1966 |
29.115 |
0.318 |
|
|
06/1966 |
29.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48109 |
02/1939 |
22/01/1966 |
26.953 |
0.395 |
|
|
06/1966 |
27.348 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48112 |
03/1939 |
13/11/1965 |
26.685 |
0.586 |
|
|
06/1966 |
27.271 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48129 |
01/1941 |
19/03/1966 |
25.189 |
0.241 |
|
|
06/1966 |
25.430 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48175 |
08/1943 |
19/02/1966 |
22.532 |
0.318 |
|
|
06/1966 |
22.849 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48181 |
04/1942 |
19/02/1966 |
23.866 |
0.318 |
|
|
06/1966 |
24.184 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48422 |
10/12/1943 |
26/03/1966 |
22.307 |
0.222 |
|
|
06/1966 |
22.529 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48523 |
11/1944 |
19/02/1966 |
21.277 |
0.318 |
|
|
06/1966 |
21.595 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48530 |
04/1945 |
19/03/1966 |
20.940 |
0.241 |
|
|
06/1966 |
21.181 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48619 |
10/1943 |
26/03/1966 |
22.460 |
0.222 |
|
|
06/1966 |
22.682 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48667 |
04/1944 |
19/03/1966 |
21.940 |
0.241 |
|
|
06/1966 |
22.181 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48691 |
03/1944 |
19/03/1966 |
22.025 |
0.241 |
|
|
06/1966 |
22.266 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48762 |
01/1946 |
26/02/1966 |
20.129 |
0.299 |
|
|
06/1966 |
20.427 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44522 |
07/1928 |
09/10/1965 |
37.260 |
0.682 |
|
|
06/1966 |
37.942 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47627 |
11/1928 |
09/04/1966 |
37.422 |
0.184 |
|
|
06/1966 |
37.605 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42945 |
21/10/1933 |
26/03/1966 |
32.449 |
0.222 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
06/1966 |
32.671 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42958 |
11/01/1934 |
20/11/1965 |
31.879 |
0.567 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
06/1966 |
32.447 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42959 |
04/01/1934 |
25/12/1965 |
31.995 |
0.471 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
06/1966 |
32.466 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42975 |
25/01/1934 |
26/03/1966 |
32.186 |
0.222 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
06/1966 |
32.408 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46410 |
01/1947 |
19/03/1966 |
19.186 |
0.241 |
|
|
06/1966 |
19.427 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46518 |
27/01/1953 |
19/03/1966 |
13.148 |
0.241 |
|
|
06/1966 |
13.389 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42712 |
05/03/1927 |
26/02/1966 |
39.008 |
0.299 |
|
|
06/1966 |
39.307 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42715 |
14/04/1927 |
26/02/1966 |
38.899 |
0.299 |
|
|
06/1966 |
39.197 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42924 |
10/12/1930 |
26/02/1966 |
35.238 |
0.299 |
|
|
06/1966 |
35.537 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42581 |
28/09/1936 |
19/03/1966 |
29.490 |
0.241 |
|
|
06/1966 |
29.732 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45252 |
09/1936 |
26/03/1966 |
29.545 |
0.222 |
|
|
06/1966 |
29.767 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45590 |
22/12/1934 |
11/12/1965 |
30.992 |
0.510 |
|
|
06/1966 |
31.501 |
Steam |
LNER |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
60886 |
18/11/1939 |
10/04/1966 |
26.411 |
0.181 |
50A |
York (North) |
06/1966 |
26.592 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9657 |
22/11/1946 |
02/04/1966 |
19.373 |
0.285 |
|
|
07/1966 |
19.658 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48195 |
06/1942 |
16/04/1966 |
23.852 |
0.247 |
|
|
07/1966 |
24.099 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48203 |
07/1942 |
23/04/1966 |
23.789 |
0.227 |
|
|
07/1966 |
24.016 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48250 |
08/1940 |
16/04/1966 |
25.685 |
0.247 |
|
|
07/1966 |
25.932 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48277 |
07/1942 |
16/04/1966 |
23.770 |
0.247 |
|
|
07/1966 |
24.016 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48398 |
06/1945 |
02/04/1966 |
20.811 |
0.285 |
|
|
07/1966 |
21.096 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48647 |
12/1943 |
23/04/1966 |
22.370 |
0.227 |
|
|
07/1966 |
22.597 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48698 |
05/1944 |
02/04/1966 |
21.896 |
0.285 |
|
|
07/1966 |
22.181 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48713 |
07/1944 |
05/03/1966 |
21.652 |
0.362 |
|
|
07/1966 |
22.014 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44294 |
02/1927 |
06/11/1965 |
38.751 |
0.688 |
|
|
07/1966 |
39.438 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42455 |
22/08/1936 |
02/04/1966 |
29.630 |
0.285 |
|
|
07/1966 |
29.915 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42626 |
05/08/1938 |
23/10/1965 |
27.236 |
0.726 |
|
|
07/1966 |
27.962 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42240 |
07/09/1946 |
16/04/1966 |
19.619 |
0.247 |
|
|
07/1966 |
19.866 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45248 |
09/1936 |
26/02/1966 |
29.468 |
0.381 |
|
|
07/1966 |
29.849 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
3776 |
07/07/1938 |
16/04/1966 |
27.795 |
0.332 |
|
|
08/1966 |
28.126 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73013 |
31/08/1951 |
07/05/1966 |
14.693 |
0.274 |
|
|
08/1966 |
14.967 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT |
2-6-0 |
76035 |
28/05/1954 |
07/05/1966 |
11.951 |
0.274 |
|
|
08/1966 |
12.225 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48188 |
04/1942 |
14/05/1966 |
24.096 |
0.255 |
|
|
08/1966 |
24.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48472 |
07/05/1945 |
21/05/1966 |
21.052 |
0.236 |
|
|
08/1966 |
21.288 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48521 |
10/1944 |
07/05/1966 |
21.573 |
0.274 |
|
|
08/1966 |
21.847 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48625 |
04/1943 |
18/06/1966 |
23.192 |
0.159 |
|
|
08/1966 |
23.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48748 |
06/1946 |
30/04/1966 |
19.888 |
0.293 |
|
|
08/1966 |
20.181 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42431 |
10/03/1936 |
07/05/1966 |
30.178 |
0.274 |
|
|
08/1966 |
30.452 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42462 |
01/10/1936 |
14/05/1966 |
29.636 |
0.255 |
|
|
08/1966 |
29.890 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42625 |
01/08/1938 |
07/05/1966 |
27.784 |
0.274 |
|
|
08/1966 |
28.058 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42676 |
27/04/1945 |
25/08/1966 |
21.342 |
-0.027 |
|
|
08/1966 |
21.315 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42095 |
09/06/1951 |
04/06/1966 |
14.997 |
0.197 |
|
|
08/1966 |
15.195 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48118 |
04/1939 |
11/06/1966 |
27.175 |
0.263 |
|
|
09/1966 |
27.438 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48120 |
05/1939 |
15/01/1966 |
26.690 |
0.666 |
|
|
09/1966 |
27.356 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48331 |
09/1943 |
26/02/1966 |
22.466 |
0.551 |
|
|
09/1966 |
23.016 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48426 |
31/12/1943 |
11/06/1966 |
22.460 |
0.263 |
|
|
09/1966 |
22.723 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48541 |
12/1944 |
18/06/1966 |
21.521 |
0.244 |
|
|
09/1966 |
21.764 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42132 |
28/12/1949 |
18/06/1966 |
16.482 |
0.244 |
|
|
09/1966 |
16.726 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42078 |
21/12/1950 |
18/06/1966 |
15.501 |
0.244 |
|
|
09/1966 |
15.745 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45233 |
08/1936 |
07/05/1966 |
29.745 |
0.359 |
|
|
09/1966 |
30.104 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48101 |
01/1939 |
09/1966 |
27.685 |
0.082 |
|
|
10/1966 |
27.767 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48284 |
08/1942 |
30/07/1966 |
23.973 |
0.211 |
|
|
10/1966 |
24.184 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48303 |
10/1943 |
30/07/1966 |
22.805 |
0.211 |
|
|
10/1966 |
23.016 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48405 |
08/08/1943 |
23/07/1966 |
22.973 |
0.230 |
|
|
10/1966 |
23.203 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48621 |
11/1943 |
30/07/1966 |
22.721 |
0.211 |
|
|
10/1966 |
22.932 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48659 |
11/1943 |
21/05/1966 |
22.529 |
0.403 |
|
|
10/1966 |
22.932 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44731 |
28/02/1949 |
05/1966 |
17.219 |
0.419 |
|
|
10/1966 |
17.638 |
Steam |
LNER |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
60806 |
06/08/1937 |
04/09/1966 |
29.099 |
0.112 |
50A |
York (North) |
10/1966 |
29.211 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
3619 |
28/04/1939 |
10/09/1966 |
27.389 |
0.181 |
|
|
11/1966 |
27.570 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT |
2-6-0 |
76085 |
10/04/1957 |
06/1966 |
9.186 |
0.419 |
|
|
11/1966 |
9.605 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT |
2-6-0 |
76099 |
27/11/1957 |
06/08/1966 |
8.696 |
0.277 |
|
|
11/1966 |
8.973 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48147 |
07/1942 |
30/07/1966 |
24.058 |
0.296 |
|
|
11/1966 |
24.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48254 |
07/1941 |
09/1966 |
25.186 |
0.167 |
|
|
11/1966 |
25.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48367 |
09/1944 |
09/1966 |
22.014 |
0.167 |
|
|
11/1966 |
22.181 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48554 |
06/1945 |
06/08/1966 |
21.156 |
0.277 |
|
|
11/1966 |
21.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48605 |
07/1943 |
06/08/1966 |
23.077 |
0.277 |
|
|
11/1966 |
23.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48606 |
09/1943 |
09/1966 |
23.016 |
0.167 |
|
|
11/1966 |
23.184 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48736 |
11/1945 |
13/08/1966 |
20.756 |
0.258 |
|
|
11/1966 |
21.014 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90113 |
03/1943 |
04/09/1966 |
23.490 |
0.197 |
|
|
11/1966 |
23.688 |
Steam |
LMS |
0F |
0-4-0ST |
47006 |
06/11/1953 |
06/08/1966 |
12.756 |
0.277 |
|
|
11/1966 |
13.033 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46412 |
01/1947 |
06/08/1966 |
19.570 |
0.277 |
|
|
11/1966 |
19.847 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44810 |
10/1944 |
13/08/1966 |
21.841 |
0.258 |
|
|
11/1966 |
22.099 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45348 |
04/1937 |
13/08/1966 |
29.348 |
0.258 |
|
|
11/1966 |
29.605 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45370 |
06/1937 |
13/08/1966 |
29.181 |
0.258 |
|
|
11/1966 |
29.438 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
3709 |
27/10/1936 |
20/08/1966 |
29.833 |
0.321 |
|
|
12/1966 |
30.153 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
3744 |
02/10/1937 |
27/08/1966 |
28.921 |
0.301 |
|
|
12/1966 |
29.222 |
Steam |
GWR |
5600 |
0-6-2T |
5605 |
01/1925 |
21/05/1966 |
41.373 |
0.570 |
|
|
12/1966 |
41.942 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9630 |
15/12/1945 |
24/09/1966 |
20.789 |
0.225 |
|
|
12/1966 |
21.014 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT |
2-6-0 |
76022 |
12/1952 |
27/08/1966 |
13.707 |
0.301 |
|
|
12/1966 |
14.008 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT |
2-6-0 |
78038 |
20/11/1954 |
20/08/1966 |
11.756 |
0.321 |
|
|
12/1966 |
12.077 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48092 |
02/1937 |
30/04/1966 |
29.222 |
0.627 |
|
|
12/1966 |
29.849 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48342 |
02/1944 |
09/1966 |
22.597 |
0.249 |
|
|
12/1966 |
22.847 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48357 |
06/1944 |
04/09/1966 |
22.236 |
0.279 |
|
|
12/1966 |
22.515 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48358 |
07/1944 |
04/09/1966 |
22.153 |
0.279 |
|
|
12/1966 |
22.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48415 |
22/10/1943 |
13/08/1966 |
22.825 |
0.340 |
|
|
12/1966 |
23.164 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48526 |
12/1944 |
09/1966 |
21.764 |
0.249 |
|
|
12/1966 |
22.014 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48629 |
06/1943 |
09/1966 |
23.268 |
0.249 |
|
|
12/1966 |
23.518 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90679 |
11/1944 |
04/09/1966 |
21.816 |
0.279 |
|
|
12/1966 |
22.096 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47507 |
04/1928 |
09/1966 |
38.444 |
0.249 |
|
|
12/1966 |
38.693 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46419 |
03/1947 |
09/1966 |
19.518 |
0.249 |
|
|
12/1966 |
19.767 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42410 |
25/10/1933 |
04/09/1966 |
32.882 |
0.279 |
|
|
12/1966 |
33.162 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42074 |
24/11/1950 |
04/09/1966 |
15.789 |
0.279 |
|
|
12/1966 |
16.068 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44813 |
10/1944 |
03/09/1966 |
21.899 |
0.282 |
|
|
12/1966 |
22.181 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45325 |
03/1937 |
20/08/1966 |
29.452 |
0.321 |
|
|
12/1966 |
29.773 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45422 |
10/1937 |
10/09/1966 |
28.923 |
0.263 |
|
|
12/1966 |
29.186 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45434 |
11/1937 |
08/1966 |
28.767 |
0.334 |
|
|
12/1966 |
29.101 |
Steam |
GWR |
1600 |
0-6-0PT |
1628 |
24/08/1950 |
18/09/1966 |
16.079 |
0.326 |
|
|
01/1967 |
16.405 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT |
4-6-0 |
75054 |
17/01/1957 |
27/08/1966 |
9.614 |
0.386 |
|
|
01/1967 |
10.000 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT |
2-6-0 |
78008 |
03/1953 |
22/10/1966 |
13.614 |
0.233 |
|
|
01/1967 |
13.847 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92028 |
09/07/1955 |
22/10/1966 |
11.296 |
0.233 |
|
|
01/1967 |
11.529 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48353 |
06/1944 |
10/09/1966 |
22.252 |
0.348 |
|
|
01/1967 |
22.600 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48477 |
23/06/1945 |
10/09/1966 |
21.230 |
0.348 |
|
|
01/1967 |
21.578 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48615 |
09/1943 |
05/02/1966 |
22.408 |
0.942 |
|
|
01/1967 |
23.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48726 |
09/1944 |
17/09/1966 |
22.019 |
0.329 |
|
|
01/1967 |
22.348 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48747 |
05/1946 |
03/09/1966 |
20.318 |
0.367 |
|
|
01/1967 |
20.685 |
Steam |
WD |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90622 |
02/1944 |
04/09/1966 |
22.567 |
0.364 |
|
|
01/1967 |
22.932 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43026 |
10/02/1949 |
24/09/1966 |
17.630 |
0.310 |
|
|
01/1967 |
17.940 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42087 |
17/03/1951 |
08/10/1966 |
15.573 |
0.271 |
|
|
01/1967 |
15.844 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44760 |
09/1947 |
22/10/1966 |
19.115 |
0.233 |
|
|
01/1967 |
19.348 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44966 |
08/1946 |
17/09/1966 |
20.104 |
0.329 |
|
|
01/1967 |
20.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45129 |
05/1935 |
17/09/1966 |
31.364 |
0.329 |
|
|
01/1967 |
31.693 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45403 |
08/1937 |
10/09/1966 |
29.090 |
0.348 |
|
|
01/1967 |
29.438 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45419 |
10/1937 |
10/09/1966 |
28.923 |
0.348 |
|
|
01/1967 |
29.271 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73130 |
12/09/1956 |
21/01/1967 |
10.364 |
0.068 |
|
|
02/1967 |
10.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48002 |
07/1935 |
24/09/1966 |
31.216 |
0.395 |
|
|
02/1967 |
31.611 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48155 |
10/1942 |
17/09/1966 |
23.940 |
0.414 |
|
|
02/1967 |
24.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48213 |
08/1942 |
10/09/1966 |
24.088 |
0.433 |
|
|
02/1967 |
24.521 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48251 |
09/1940 |
10/1966 |
26.099 |
0.337 |
|
|
02/1967 |
26.436 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48263 |
10/1941 |
09/1966 |
24.934 |
0.419 |
|
|
02/1967 |
25.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48289 |
10/1940 |
29/10/1966 |
26.055 |
0.299 |
|
|
02/1967 |
26.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48311 |
12/1943 |
04/09/1966 |
22.737 |
0.449 |
|
|
02/1967 |
23.186 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48318 |
01/1944 |
10/1966 |
22.764 |
0.337 |
|
|
02/1967 |
23.101 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48404 |
23/07/1943 |
09/1966 |
23.164 |
0.419 |
|
|
02/1967 |
23.584 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48418 |
10/11/1943 |
09/1966 |
22.863 |
0.419 |
|
|
02/1967 |
23.282 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48512 |
04/1944 |
24/09/1966 |
22.458 |
0.395 |
|
|
02/1967 |
22.852 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48628 |
05/1943 |
24/09/1966 |
23.378 |
0.395 |
|
|
02/1967 |
23.773 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48680 |
12/1943 |
24/09/1966 |
22.792 |
0.395 |
|
|
02/1967 |
23.186 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48718 |
08/1944 |
23/04/1966 |
21.701 |
0.816 |
|
|
02/1967 |
22.518 |
Steam |
LMS |
0F |
0-4-0ST |
47000 |
11/1932 |
08/10/1966 |
33.918 |
0.356 |
|
|
02/1967 |
34.274 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46504 |
19/11/1952 |
15/10/1966 |
13.912 |
0.337 |
|
|
02/1967 |
14.249 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41211 |
21/08/1948 |
10/09/1966 |
18.066 |
0.433 |
|
|
02/1967 |
18.499 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42583 |
08/10/1936 |
29/10/1966 |
30.077 |
0.299 |
|
|
02/1967 |
30.375 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42183 |
11/01/1949 |
01/10/1966 |
17.732 |
0.375 |
|
|
02/1967 |
18.107 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44841 |
10/1944 |
22/10/1966 |
22.033 |
0.318 |
|
|
02/1967 |
22.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44987 |
11/1946 |
22/10/1966 |
19.948 |
0.318 |
|
|
02/1967 |
20.266 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45045 |
10/1935 |
29/10/1966 |
31.060 |
0.299 |
|
|
02/1967 |
31.359 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45140 |
06/1935 |
09/1966 |
31.274 |
0.419 |
|
|
02/1967 |
31.693 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45329 |
03/1937 |
12/11/1966 |
29.682 |
0.260 |
|
|
02/1967 |
29.942 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45332 |
03/1937 |
19/11/1966 |
29.701 |
0.241 |
|
|
02/1967 |
29.942 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45338 |
04/1937 |
15/10/1966 |
29.521 |
0.337 |
|
|
02/1967 |
29.858 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45393 |
08/1937 |
17/09/1966 |
29.110 |
0.414 |
|
|
02/1967 |
29.523 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45410 |
09/1937 |
10/09/1966 |
29.005 |
0.433 |
|
|
02/1967 |
29.438 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45427 |
10/1937 |
20/08/1966 |
28.866 |
0.490 |
|
|
02/1967 |
29.356 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45627 |
13/11/1934 |
17/09/1966 |
31.866 |
0.414 |
|
|
02/1967 |
32.279 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT |
2-6-0 |
76083 |
20/03/1957 |
22/10/1966 |
9.597 |
0.395 |
|
|
03/1967 |
9.992 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 3MT Tank |
2-6-2T |
82009 |
13/06/1952 |
05/11/1966 |
14.405 |
0.356 |
|
|
03/1967 |
14.762 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48274 |
06/1942 |
04/09/1966 |
24.238 |
0.526 |
|
|
03/1967 |
24.764 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48428 |
17/01/1944 |
09/1966 |
22.677 |
0.496 |
|
|
03/1967 |
23.173 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47377 |
09/1926 |
15/10/1966 |
40.110 |
0.414 |
|
|
03/1967 |
40.523 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47566 |
05/1928 |
10/1966 |
38.444 |
0.414 |
|
|
03/1967 |
38.858 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41244 |
10/1949 |
19/11/1966 |
17.107 |
0.318 |
|
|
03/1967 |
17.425 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41304 |
03/1952 |
19/11/1966 |
14.690 |
0.318 |
|
|
03/1967 |
15.008 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42664 |
08/07/1942 |
12/1966 |
24.455 |
0.247 |
|
|
03/1967 |
24.701 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44945 |
01/1946 |
29/10/1966 |
20.800 |
0.375 |
|
|
03/1967 |
21.175 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44984 |
09/1946 |
12/11/1966 |
20.173 |
0.337 |
|
|
03/1967 |
20.510 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45091 |
04/1935 |
10/09/1966 |
31.427 |
0.510 |
|
|
03/1967 |
31.937 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45128 |
05/1935 |
10/09/1966 |
31.345 |
0.510 |
|
|
03/1967 |
31.855 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45205 |
11/1935 |
29/10/1966 |
30.975 |
0.375 |
|
|
03/1967 |
31.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45344 |
04/1937 |
20/08/1966 |
29.367 |
0.567 |
|
|
03/1967 |
29.934 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45438 |
11/1937 |
08/1966 |
28.767 |
0.581 |
|
|
03/1967 |
29.348 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
3782 |
19/08/1938 |
15/10/1966 |
28.175 |
0.499 |
|
|
04/1967 |
28.674 |
Steam |
GWR |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4176 |
14/11/1949 |
09/10/1965 |
15.912 |
1.515 |
|
|
04/1967 |
17.427 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
4696 |
08/02/1945 |
12/11/1966 |
21.773 |
0.422 |
|
|
04/1967 |
22.195 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9658 |
25/11/1946 |
15/10/1966 |
19.901 |
0.499 |
|
|
04/1967 |
20.400 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9774 |
13/03/1936 |
12/11/1966 |
30.688 |
0.422 |
|
|
04/1967 |
31.110 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48139 |
12/1941 |
19/11/1966 |
24.945 |
0.403 |
|
|
04/1967 |
25.348 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48296 |
12/1941 |
17/09/1966 |
24.773 |
0.575 |
|
|
04/1967 |
25.348 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48462 |
22/12/1944 |
19/11/1966 |
21.923 |
0.403 |
|
|
04/1967 |
22.326 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48475 |
08/06/1945 |
29/10/1966 |
21.405 |
0.460 |
|
|
04/1967 |
21.866 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47668 |
05/1931 |
08/10/1966 |
35.425 |
0.518 |
|
|
04/1967 |
35.942 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46405 |
12/1946 |
12/1966 |
20.014 |
0.332 |
|
|
04/1967 |
20.345 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41234 |
08/1949 |
19/11/1966 |
17.274 |
0.403 |
|
|
04/1967 |
17.677 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41286 |
11/1950 |
19/11/1966 |
16.022 |
0.403 |
|
|
04/1967 |
16.425 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42606 |
16/12/1936 |
15/10/1966 |
29.849 |
0.499 |
|
|
04/1967 |
30.348 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44935 |
10/1945 |
15/10/1966 |
21.014 |
0.499 |
|
|
04/1967 |
21.512 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45322 |
02/1937 |
10/09/1966 |
29.586 |
0.595 |
|
|
04/1967 |
30.181 |
Steam |
GWR |
5700 |
0-6-0PT |
9641 |
12/03/1946 |
29/10/1966 |
20.647 |
0.542 |
|
|
05/1967 |
21.189 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48286 |
07/1940 |
03/09/1966 |
26.153 |
0.696 |
|
|
05/1967 |
26.849 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48343 |
02/1944 |
18/02/1967 |
23.025 |
0.236 |
|
|
05/1967 |
23.260 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48354 |
06/1944 |
19/11/1966 |
22.444 |
0.485 |
|
|
05/1967 |
22.929 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48766 |
03/1946 |
25/02/1967 |
20.964 |
0.216 |
|
|
05/1967 |
21.181 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47391 |
11/1926 |
10/1966 |
39.942 |
0.581 |
|
|
05/1967 |
40.523 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42548 |
01/07/1936 |
04/02/1967 |
30.616 |
0.274 |
|
|
05/1967 |
30.890 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42697 |
16/10/1945 |
14/01/1967 |
21.260 |
0.332 |
|
|
05/1967 |
21.592 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42096 |
15/07/1950 |
24/12/1966 |
16.455 |
0.389 |
|
|
05/1967 |
16.844 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42080 |
12/01/1951 |
14/01/1967 |
16.016 |
0.332 |
|
|
05/1967 |
16.348 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44714 |
13/11/1948 |
19/11/1966 |
18.027 |
0.485 |
|
|
05/1967 |
18.512 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44847 |
11/1944 |
12/11/1966 |
22.005 |
0.504 |
|
|
05/1967 |
22.510 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44941 |
12/1945 |
12/11/1966 |
20.923 |
0.504 |
|
|
05/1967 |
21.427 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45051 |
11/1935 |
19/11/1966 |
31.033 |
0.485 |
|
|
05/1967 |
31.518 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45224 |
12/1935 |
12/11/1966 |
30.932 |
0.504 |
|
|
05/1967 |
31.436 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45277 |
11/1936 |
25/02/1967 |
30.299 |
0.216 |
|
|
05/1967 |
30.515 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45283 |
11/1936 |
21/01/1967 |
30.203 |
0.312 |
|
|
05/1967 |
30.515 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45289 |
12/1936 |
12/11/1966 |
29.929 |
0.504 |
|
|
05/1967 |
30.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45311 |
02/1937 |
29/10/1966 |
29.721 |
0.542 |
|
|
05/1967 |
30.263 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45385 |
07/1937 |
10/1966 |
29.271 |
0.581 |
|
|
05/1967 |
29.852 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45464 |
11/1938 |
22/10/1966 |
27.953 |
0.562 |
|
|
05/1967 |
28.515 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45466 |
11/1938 |
25/02/1967 |
28.299 |
0.216 |
|
|
05/1967 |
28.515 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT |
2-6-0 |
78028 |
07/1954 |
11/02/1967 |
12.586 |
0.340 |
|
|
06/1967 |
12.926 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 2MT |
2-6-0 |
78055 |
08/1956 |
11/02/1967 |
10.499 |
0.340 |
|
|
06/1967 |
10.838 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48178 |
03/1942 |
12/11/1966 |
24.679 |
0.589 |
|
|
06/1967 |
25.268 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48223 |
09/1942 |
12/11/1966 |
24.175 |
0.589 |
|
|
06/1967 |
24.764 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48686 |
02/1944 |
19/11/1966 |
22.775 |
0.570 |
|
|
06/1967 |
23.345 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47643 |
01/1929 |
10/1966 |
37.773 |
0.666 |
|
|
06/1967 |
38.438 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41220 |
02/10/1948 |
12/11/1966 |
18.123 |
0.589 |
|
|
06/1967 |
18.712 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42069 |
26/10/1950 |
19/11/1966 |
16.077 |
0.570 |
|
|
06/1967 |
16.647 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44688 |
31/08/1950 |
20/08/1966 |
15.981 |
0.819 |
|
|
06/1967 |
16.800 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44712 |
30/10/1948 |
12/11/1966 |
18.047 |
0.589 |
|
|
06/1967 |
18.636 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44856 |
12/1944 |
18/02/1967 |
22.192 |
0.321 |
|
|
06/1967 |
22.512 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
D3123 |
03/09/1955 |
12/11/1966 |
11.200 |
0.589 |
|
|
06/1967 |
11.789 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
D3124 |
03/09/1955 |
12/11/1966 |
11.200 |
0.589 |
|
|
06/1967 |
11.789 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
D3126 |
29/06/1957 |
12/11/1966 |
9.378 |
0.589 |
|
|
06/1967 |
9.967 |
Diesel |
BR |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
D5383 |
26/04/1962 |
15/01/1966 |
3.726 |
1.414 |
|
|
06/1967 |
5.140 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48105 |
02/1939 |
11/03/1967 |
28.085 |
0.345 |
|
|
07/1967 |
28.430 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48136 |
08/1941 |
11/03/1967 |
25.586 |
0.345 |
|
|
07/1967 |
25.932 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48177 |
03/1942 |
11/03/1967 |
25.005 |
0.345 |
|
|
07/1967 |
25.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48180 |
03/1942 |
11/03/1967 |
25.005 |
0.345 |
|
|
07/1967 |
25.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
41233 |
08/1949 |
12/11/1966 |
17.255 |
0.671 |
|
|
07/1967 |
17.926 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44918 |
12/1945 |
21/01/1967 |
21.115 |
0.479 |
|
|
07/1967 |
21.595 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
D3118 |
10/06/1955 |
08/07/1967 |
12.085 |
0.019 |
|
|
07/1967 |
12.104 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
D3119 |
16/06/1955 |
08/07/1967 |
12.068 |
0.019 |
|
|
07/1967 |
12.088 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73066 |
15/10/1954 |
15/04/1967 |
12.507 |
0.334 |
|
|
08/1967 |
12.841 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48538 |
03/08/1945 |
11/03/1967 |
21.616 |
0.430 |
|
|
08/1967 |
22.047 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48690 |
03/1944 |
11/03/1967 |
23.003 |
0.430 |
|
|
08/1967 |
23.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48705 |
06/1944 |
04/03/1967 |
22.732 |
0.449 |
|
|
08/1967 |
23.181 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48728 |
09/1944 |
11/03/1967 |
22.499 |
0.430 |
|
|
08/1967 |
22.929 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48753 |
10/1945 |
11/03/1967 |
21.416 |
0.430 |
|
|
08/1967 |
21.847 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43151 |
09/11/1951 |
18/12/1967 |
16.118 |
-0.342 |
|
|
08/1967 |
15.775 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44958 |
05/1946 |
04/03/1967 |
20.816 |
0.449 |
|
|
08/1967 |
21.266 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45044 |
10/1935 |
10/1966 |
31.022 |
0.833 |
|
|
08/1967 |
31.855 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45352 |
05/1937 |
08/04/1967 |
29.918 |
0.353 |
|
|
08/1967 |
30.271 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12022 |
07/1940 |
12/11/1966 |
26.345 |
0.756 |
|
|
08/1967 |
27.101 |
Diesel |
BR |
DES1 |
0-6-0 |
15001 |
12/08/1944 |
15/04/1967 |
22.688 |
0.334 |
5B |
Crewe South |
08/1967 |
23.022 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73006 |
28/06/1951 |
11/03/1967 |
15.712 |
0.515 |
|
|
09/1967 |
16.227 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48000 |
06/1935 |
18/03/1967 |
31.778 |
0.496 |
|
|
09/1967 |
32.274 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48035 |
08/1936 |
11/03/1967 |
30.589 |
0.515 |
|
|
09/1967 |
31.104 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48073 |
12/1936 |
08/04/1967 |
30.332 |
0.438 |
|
|
09/1967 |
30.770 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48098 |
01/1939 |
11/03/1967 |
28.170 |
0.515 |
|
|
09/1967 |
28.685 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48114 |
03/1939 |
01/04/1967 |
28.066 |
0.458 |
|
|
09/1967 |
28.523 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48141 |
01/1942 |
06/05/1967 |
25.321 |
0.362 |
|
|
09/1967 |
25.682 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48152 |
09/1942 |
25/03/1967 |
24.540 |
0.477 |
|
|
09/1967 |
25.016 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48165 |
03/1943 |
18/03/1967 |
24.025 |
0.496 |
|
|
09/1967 |
24.521 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48301 |
09/1943 |
11/03/1967 |
23.501 |
0.515 |
|
|
09/1967 |
24.016 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48379 |
12/1944 |
18/03/1967 |
22.268 |
0.496 |
|
|
09/1967 |
22.764 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48435 |
17/04/1944 |
06/05/1967 |
23.066 |
0.362 |
|
|
09/1967 |
23.427 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48449 |
01/08/1944 |
20/05/1967 |
22.814 |
0.323 |
|
|
09/1967 |
23.137 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48494 |
08/1945 |
01/04/1967 |
21.641 |
0.458 |
|
|
09/1967 |
22.099 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48513 |
04/1944 |
18/03/1967 |
22.937 |
0.496 |
|
|
09/1967 |
23.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48547 |
03/1945 |
18/03/1967 |
22.022 |
0.496 |
|
|
09/1967 |
22.518 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48701 |
05/1944 |
04/03/1967 |
22.816 |
0.534 |
|
|
09/1967 |
23.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48717 |
07/1944 |
01/04/1967 |
22.726 |
0.458 |
|
|
09/1967 |
23.184 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48743 |
03/1946 |
25/03/1967 |
21.041 |
0.477 |
|
|
09/1967 |
21.518 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48754 |
10/1945 |
27/05/1967 |
21.627 |
0.304 |
|
|
09/1967 |
21.932 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46439 |
01/1950 |
18/03/1967 |
17.181 |
0.496 |
|
|
09/1967 |
17.677 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46440 |
02/1950 |
25/03/1967 |
17.115 |
0.477 |
|
|
09/1967 |
17.592 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42611 |
01/01/1937 |
15/03/1967 |
30.219 |
0.504 |
|
|
09/1967 |
30.723 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42297 |
01/12/1947 |
06/05/1967 |
19.441 |
0.362 |
|
|
09/1967 |
19.803 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42187 |
17/12/1947 |
15/03/1967 |
19.255 |
0.504 |
|
|
09/1967 |
19.759 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42071 |
06/11/1950 |
18/03/1967 |
16.373 |
0.496 |
|
|
09/1967 |
16.868 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45062 |
12/1935 |
15/04/1967 |
31.353 |
0.419 |
|
|
09/1967 |
31.773 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45647 |
04/01/1935 |
26/04/1967 |
32.329 |
0.389 |
|
|
09/1967 |
32.718 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73097 |
06/12/1955 |
06/05/1967 |
11.422 |
0.444 |
|
|
10/1967 |
11.866 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 9F |
2-10-0 |
92032 |
17/11/1954 |
15/04/1967 |
12.416 |
0.501 |
|
|
10/1967 |
12.918 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48110 |
02/1939 |
01/07/1967 |
28.392 |
0.290 |
|
|
10/1967 |
28.682 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48128 |
01/1941 |
27/05/1967 |
26.378 |
0.386 |
|
|
10/1967 |
26.764 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48131 |
03/1941 |
27/05/1967 |
26.216 |
0.386 |
|
|
10/1967 |
26.603 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48320 |
02/1944 |
18/03/1967 |
23.101 |
0.578 |
|
|
10/1967 |
23.679 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48458 |
04/11/1944 |
08/04/1967 |
22.438 |
0.521 |
|
|
10/1967 |
22.959 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48459 |
18/11/1944 |
01/04/1967 |
22.381 |
0.540 |
|
|
10/1967 |
22.921 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48645 |
11/1943 |
27/05/1967 |
23.545 |
0.386 |
|
|
10/1967 |
23.932 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48770 |
05/1946 |
08/04/1967 |
20.912 |
0.521 |
|
|
10/1967 |
21.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43024 |
21/01/1949 |
27/05/1967 |
18.356 |
0.386 |
|
|
10/1967 |
18.742 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43115 |
19/05/1951 |
27/05/1967 |
16.033 |
0.386 |
|
|
10/1967 |
16.419 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42942 |
30/12/1932 |
21/01/1967 |
34.082 |
0.732 |
|
|
10/1967 |
34.814 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42613 |
08/01/1937 |
22/04/1967 |
30.304 |
0.482 |
|
|
10/1967 |
30.786 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42644 |
11/1938 |
11/03/1967 |
28.337 |
0.597 |
|
|
10/1967 |
28.934 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42663 |
20/06/1942 |
18/03/1967 |
24.759 |
0.578 |
|
|
10/1967 |
25.337 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42079 |
04/01/1951 |
06/05/1967 |
16.345 |
0.444 |
|
|
10/1967 |
16.789 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45402 |
08/1937 |
22/04/1967 |
29.704 |
0.482 |
|
|
10/1967 |
30.186 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/3 |
0-6-0 |
D3117 |
03/06/1955 |
24/06/1967 |
12.066 |
0.310 |
16A |
Toton |
10/1967 |
12.375 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73070 |
13/11/1954 |
29/04/1967 |
12.466 |
0.548 |
|
|
11/1967 |
13.014 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48011 |
10/1935 |
27/05/1967 |
31.636 |
0.471 |
|
|
11/1967 |
32.107 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48106 |
02/1939 |
24/06/1967 |
28.373 |
0.395 |
|
|
11/1967 |
28.767 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48174 |
07/1943 |
29/04/1967 |
23.805 |
0.548 |
|
|
11/1967 |
24.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48176 |
03/1942 |
05/08/1967 |
25.408 |
0.279 |
|
|
11/1967 |
25.688 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48265 |
05/1942 |
08/06/1967 |
25.082 |
0.438 |
|
|
11/1967 |
25.521 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48316 |
12/1943 |
08/04/1967 |
23.329 |
0.605 |
|
|
11/1967 |
23.934 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48324 |
02/1944 |
17/06/1967 |
23.351 |
0.414 |
|
|
11/1967 |
23.764 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48411 |
28/09/1943 |
08/07/1967 |
23.792 |
0.356 |
|
|
11/1967 |
24.148 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48417 |
06/11/1943 |
29/04/1967 |
23.493 |
0.548 |
|
|
11/1967 |
24.041 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48501 |
06/1944 |
15/07/1967 |
23.096 |
0.337 |
|
|
11/1967 |
23.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48552 |
05/1945 |
29/04/1967 |
21.970 |
0.548 |
|
|
11/1967 |
22.518 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47313 |
01/1929 |
10/06/1967 |
38.425 |
0.433 |
|
|
11/1967 |
38.858 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43034 |
18/05/1949 |
03/06/1967 |
18.055 |
0.452 |
|
|
11/1967 |
18.507 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46487 |
11/1951 |
06/05/1967 |
15.482 |
0.529 |
|
|
11/1967 |
16.011 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46503 |
05/11/1952 |
06/05/1967 |
14.507 |
0.529 |
|
|
11/1967 |
15.036 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46520 |
09/02/1953 |
06/05/1967 |
14.244 |
0.529 |
|
|
11/1967 |
14.773 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42656 |
03/02/1941 |
06/05/1967 |
26.268 |
0.529 |
|
|
11/1967 |
26.797 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42149 |
07/05/1948 |
24/06/1967 |
19.142 |
0.395 |
55E |
Normanton |
11/1967 |
19.537 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42055 |
25/10/1950 |
27/06/1967 |
16.682 |
0.386 |
56F |
Low Moor |
11/1967 |
17.068 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42076 |
07/12/1950 |
18/03/1967 |
16.288 |
0.663 |
|
|
11/1967 |
16.951 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42081 |
24/01/1951 |
06/05/1967 |
16.290 |
0.529 |
|
|
11/1967 |
16.819 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45031 |
09/1934 |
06/1967 |
32.770 |
0.419 |
|
|
11/1967 |
33.189 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45328 |
03/1937 |
23/09/1967 |
30.545 |
0.145 |
|
|
11/1967 |
30.690 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45346 |
04/1937 |
06/1967 |
30.186 |
0.419 |
|
|
11/1967 |
30.605 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45404 |
08/1937 |
06/05/1967 |
29.742 |
0.529 |
|
|
11/1967 |
30.271 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45675 |
17/12/1935 |
24/06/1967 |
31.540 |
0.395 |
|
|
11/1967 |
31.934 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT |
2-6-0 |
76051 |
31/08/1956 |
29/04/1967 |
10.666 |
0.630 |
|
|
12/1967 |
11.296 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48269 |
05/1942 |
08/07/1967 |
25.164 |
0.438 |
|
|
12/1967 |
25.603 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48275 |
06/1942 |
24/06/1967 |
25.041 |
0.477 |
|
|
12/1967 |
25.518 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48315 |
12/1943 |
05/08/1967 |
23.655 |
0.362 |
|
|
12/1967 |
24.016 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48535 |
11/06/1945 |
12/08/1967 |
22.184 |
0.342 |
|
|
12/1967 |
22.526 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48602 |
04/1943 |
08/07/1967 |
24.247 |
0.438 |
|
|
12/1967 |
24.685 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48643 |
11/1943 |
10/06/1967 |
23.584 |
0.515 |
|
|
12/1967 |
24.099 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48655 |
11/1943 |
12/08/1967 |
23.756 |
0.342 |
|
|
12/1967 |
24.099 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48671 |
12/1943 |
05/08/1967 |
23.655 |
0.362 |
|
|
12/1967 |
24.016 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48695 |
04/1944 |
12/08/1967 |
23.340 |
0.342 |
|
|
12/1967 |
23.682 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44689 |
30/09/1950 |
04/03/1967 |
16.436 |
0.784 |
|
|
12/1967 |
17.219 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44865 |
02/1945 |
16/09/1967 |
22.597 |
0.247 |
|
|
12/1967 |
22.844 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44867 |
02/1945 |
17/06/1967 |
22.348 |
0.496 |
|
|
12/1967 |
22.844 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45021 |
08/1934 |
16/09/1967 |
33.110 |
0.247 |
|
|
12/1967 |
33.356 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45042 |
10/1935 |
16/09/1967 |
31.942 |
0.247 |
|
|
12/1967 |
32.189 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45324 |
02/1937 |
12/08/1967 |
30.507 |
0.342 |
|
|
12/1967 |
30.849 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45406 |
09/1937 |
08/07/1967 |
29.830 |
0.438 |
|
|
12/1967 |
30.268 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45409 |
09/1937 |
12/08/1967 |
29.926 |
0.342 |
|
|
12/1967 |
30.268 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73137 |
09/11/1956 |
17/06/1967 |
10.608 |
0.581 |
|
|
01/1968 |
11.189 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48208 |
08/1942 |
02/09/1967 |
25.066 |
0.370 |
|
|
01/1968 |
25.436 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48364 |
08/1944 |
16/09/1967 |
23.101 |
0.332 |
|
|
01/1968 |
23.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48474 |
30/05/1945 |
16/09/1967 |
22.312 |
0.332 |
|
|
01/1968 |
22.644 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48531 |
04/1945 |
16/09/1967 |
22.436 |
0.332 |
|
|
01/1968 |
22.767 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48709 |
06/1944 |
15/07/1967 |
23.096 |
0.504 |
|
|
01/1968 |
23.600 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48742 |
03/1946 |
02/09/1967 |
21.482 |
0.370 |
|
|
01/1968 |
21.852 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48767 |
03/1946 |
16/09/1967 |
21.521 |
0.332 |
|
|
01/1968 |
21.852 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44732 |
28/02/1949 |
15/07/1967 |
18.386 |
0.504 |
|
|
01/1968 |
18.890 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44805 |
06/1944 |
16/09/1967 |
23.268 |
0.332 |
|
|
01/1968 |
23.600 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44863 |
01/1945 |
06/05/1967 |
22.318 |
0.696 |
|
|
01/1968 |
23.014 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45059 |
12/1935 |
08/07/1967 |
31.584 |
0.523 |
|
|
01/1968 |
32.107 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45215 |
11/1935 |
07/10/1967 |
31.915 |
0.274 |
|
|
01/1968 |
32.189 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45234 |
08/1936 |
09/09/1967 |
31.088 |
0.351 |
|
|
01/1968 |
31.438 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45264 |
10/1936 |
16/09/1967 |
30.940 |
0.332 |
|
|
01/1968 |
31.271 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45270 |
11/1936 |
16/09/1967 |
30.855 |
0.332 |
|
|
01/1968 |
31.186 |
Diesel |
BR |
D16/1 |
Co-Co |
10000 |
30/11/1947 |
12/1963 |
16.052 |
4.088 |
|
|
01/1968 |
20.140 |
Diesel |
BR |
D16/2 |
1Co-Co1 |
10201 |
30/12/1950 |
07/12/1963 |
12.945 |
4.110 |
|
|
01/1968 |
17.055 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48218 |
09/1942 |
30/09/1967 |
25.058 |
0.378 |
|
|
02/1968 |
25.436 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48460 |
13/12/1944 |
16/09/1967 |
22.773 |
0.416 |
|
|
02/1968 |
23.189 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48506 |
10/1944 |
30/09/1967 |
22.973 |
0.378 |
|
|
02/1968 |
23.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48550 |
04/1945 |
30/09/1967 |
22.474 |
0.378 |
|
|
02/1968 |
22.852 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44840 |
10/1944 |
11/11/1967 |
23.088 |
0.263 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
02/1968 |
23.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44909 |
11/1945 |
30/09/1967 |
21.888 |
0.378 |
|
|
02/1968 |
22.266 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44948 |
02/1946 |
16/09/1967 |
21.597 |
0.416 |
|
|
02/1968 |
22.014 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44985 |
10/1946 |
10/1967 |
21.014 |
0.337 |
|
|
02/1968 |
21.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45145 |
14/06/1935 |
11/11/1967 |
32.433 |
0.263 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
02/1968 |
32.696 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45275 |
11/1936 |
21/10/1967 |
30.951 |
0.321 |
|
|
02/1968 |
31.271 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45297 |
12/1937 |
16/09/1967 |
29.773 |
0.416 |
|
|
02/1968 |
30.189 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45347 |
04/1937 |
11/11/1967 |
30.595 |
0.263 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
02/1968 |
30.858 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45450 |
12/1937 |
18/11/1967 |
29.945 |
0.244 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
02/1968 |
30.189 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45494 |
01/1944 |
16/09/1967 |
23.685 |
0.416 |
|
|
02/1968 |
24.101 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47427 |
10/1926 |
10/09/1966 |
39.932 |
1.468 |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
41.400 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43076 |
04/10/1950 |
09/09/1967 |
16.942 |
0.471 |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
17.414 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43084 |
15/11/1950 |
09/09/1967 |
16.827 |
0.471 |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
17.299 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42283 |
01/09/1947 |
09/09/1967 |
20.036 |
0.471 |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
20.507 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42145 |
06/1950 |
09/1967 |
17.263 |
0.455 |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
17.718 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42066 |
10/10/1950 |
09/1967 |
16.942 |
0.455 |
|
|
28/02/1968 |
17.397 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73160 |
23/01/1957 |
11/11/1967 |
10.805 |
0.342 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
03/1968 |
11.148 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48053 |
10/1936 |
18/03/1967 |
30.441 |
0.995 |
|
|
03/1968 |
31.436 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48161 |
02/1943 |
09/09/1967 |
24.581 |
0.515 |
|
|
03/1968 |
25.096 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48279 |
08/1942 |
14/10/1967 |
25.181 |
0.419 |
|
|
03/1968 |
25.600 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48636 |
08/1943 |
02/09/1967 |
24.066 |
0.534 |
|
|
03/1968 |
24.600 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44658 |
31/05/1949 |
18/11/1967 |
18.479 |
0.323 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
03/1968 |
18.803 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44725 |
30/04/1949 |
14/10/1967 |
18.468 |
0.419 |
|
|
03/1968 |
18.888 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44730 |
28/02/1949 |
11/11/1967 |
18.712 |
0.342 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
03/1968 |
19.055 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44765 |
12/1947 |
16/09/1967 |
19.767 |
0.496 |
|
|
03/1968 |
20.263 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44833 |
08/1944 |
16/09/1967 |
23.101 |
0.496 |
|
|
03/1968 |
23.597 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44843 |
10/1944 |
16/09/1967 |
22.934 |
0.496 |
|
|
03/1968 |
23.430 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44844 |
10/1944 |
11/11/1967 |
23.088 |
0.342 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
03/1968 |
23.430 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44859 |
12/1944 |
11/11/1967 |
22.921 |
0.342 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
03/1968 |
23.263 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44876 |
04/1945 |
11/11/1967 |
22.589 |
0.342 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
03/1968 |
22.932 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44917 |
12/1945 |
11/11/1967 |
21.921 |
0.342 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
03/1968 |
22.263 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44934 |
10/1945 |
30/09/1967 |
21.973 |
0.458 |
|
|
03/1968 |
22.430 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44938 |
11/1945 |
14/10/1967 |
21.926 |
0.419 |
|
|
03/1968 |
22.345 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44964 |
07/1946 |
14/10/1967 |
21.263 |
0.419 |
|
|
03/1968 |
21.682 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45052 |
11/1935 |
30/09/1967 |
31.896 |
0.458 |
|
|
03/1968 |
32.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45130 |
05/1935 |
11/11/1967 |
32.515 |
0.342 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
03/1968 |
32.858 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45193 |
10/1935 |
08/1967 |
31.855 |
0.584 |
|
|
03/1968 |
32.438 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45232 |
08/1936 |
11/11/1967 |
31.260 |
0.342 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
03/1968 |
31.603 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45267 |
10/1936 |
14/10/1967 |
31.016 |
0.419 |
|
|
03/1968 |
31.436 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45280 |
11/1936 |
11/11/1967 |
31.008 |
0.342 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
03/1968 |
31.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45292 |
12/1936 |
11/11/1967 |
30.926 |
0.342 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
03/1968 |
31.268 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45307 |
01/1937 |
07/10/1967 |
30.745 |
0.438 |
|
|
03/1968 |
31.184 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45323 |
02/1937 |
30/09/1967 |
30.641 |
0.458 |
|
|
03/1968 |
31.099 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45349 |
05/1937 |
11/11/1967 |
30.512 |
0.342 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
03/1968 |
30.855 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45454 |
09/1938 |
08/1967 |
28.934 |
0.584 |
|
|
03/1968 |
29.518 |
Diesel |
BR |
D16/2 |
1Co-Co1 |
10203 |
07/1954 |
07/12/1963 |
9.403 |
4.274 |
|
|
03/1968 |
13.677 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12024 |
31/01/1942 |
16/12/1967 |
25.890 |
0.247 |
|
|
03/1968 |
26.137 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73011 |
17/08/1951 |
11/11/1967 |
16.247 |
0.384 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
30/03/1968 |
16.630 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48055 |
10/1936 |
04/11/1967 |
31.074 |
0.447 |
|
|
04/1968 |
31.521 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48070 |
11/1936 |
04/11/1967 |
30.989 |
0.447 |
|
|
04/1968 |
31.436 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48076 |
12/1936 |
04/11/1967 |
30.907 |
0.447 |
|
|
04/1968 |
31.353 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48084 |
01/1937 |
04/11/1967 |
30.822 |
0.447 |
|
|
04/1968 |
31.268 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48093 |
02/1937 |
04/11/1967 |
30.737 |
0.447 |
|
|
04/1968 |
31.184 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48222 |
09/1942 |
04/11/1967 |
25.153 |
0.447 |
|
|
04/1968 |
25.600 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48276 |
07/1942 |
04/11/1967 |
25.323 |
0.447 |
|
|
04/1968 |
25.770 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48352 |
05/1944 |
04/11/1967 |
23.488 |
0.447 |
|
|
04/1968 |
23.934 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48383 |
01/1945 |
15/01/1966 |
21.014 |
2.249 |
|
|
04/1968 |
23.263 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48439 |
17/05/1944 |
04/11/1967 |
23.482 |
0.447 |
|
|
04/1968 |
23.929 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48622 |
11/1943 |
04/11/1967 |
23.986 |
0.447 |
|
|
04/1968 |
24.433 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43044 |
29/09/1949 |
30/09/1967 |
18.014 |
0.542 |
|
|
04/1968 |
18.556 |
Steam |
LMS |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
43125 |
30/09/1951 |
09/09/1967 |
15.953 |
0.600 |
|
|
04/1968 |
16.553 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44697 |
30/11/1950 |
18/11/1967 |
16.978 |
0.408 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
04/1968 |
17.386 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44776 |
06/1947 |
21/10/1967 |
20.364 |
0.485 |
|
|
04/1968 |
20.849 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45075 |
02/1935 |
09/09/1967 |
32.586 |
0.600 |
|
|
04/1968 |
33.186 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45299 |
01/1937 |
11/11/1967 |
30.841 |
0.427 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
04/1968 |
31.268 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48169 |
04/1943 |
04/11/1967 |
24.573 |
0.529 |
|
|
05/1968 |
25.101 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48287 |
07/1940 |
01/07/1967 |
26.978 |
0.874 |
|
|
05/1968 |
27.852 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48473 |
18/05/1945 |
04/11/1967 |
22.479 |
0.529 |
|
|
05/1968 |
23.008 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48537 |
07/1945 |
30/10/1967 |
22.307 |
0.542 |
|
|
05/1968 |
22.849 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48540 |
12/1944 |
04/11/1967 |
22.901 |
0.529 |
|
|
05/1968 |
23.430 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48664 |
02/1944 |
04/11/1967 |
23.734 |
0.529 |
|
|
05/1968 |
24.263 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42574 |
17/09/1936 |
10/1967 |
31.096 |
0.584 |
|
|
05/1968 |
31.679 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42189 |
24/12/1947 |
09/09/1967 |
19.723 |
0.682 |
|
|
05/1968 |
20.405 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42138 |
09/03/1950 |
09/09/1967 |
17.515 |
0.682 |
|
|
05/1968 |
18.197 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44828 |
07/1944 |
09/09/1967 |
23.167 |
0.682 |
|
|
05/1968 |
23.849 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44852 |
11/1944 |
09/09/1967 |
22.830 |
0.682 |
|
|
05/1968 |
23.512 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44896 |
09/1945 |
09/09/1967 |
21.997 |
0.682 |
|
|
05/1968 |
22.679 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44933 |
10/1945 |
14/10/1967 |
22.011 |
0.586 |
|
|
05/1968 |
22.597 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45368 |
06/1937 |
11/11/1967 |
30.427 |
0.510 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
05/1968 |
30.937 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45562 |
08/08/1934 |
04/11/1967 |
33.263 |
0.529 |
|
|
05/1968 |
33.792 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P |
4-6-0 |
45697 |
07/04/1936 |
05/09/1967 |
31.433 |
0.693 |
|
|
05/1968 |
32.126 |
Diesel |
BR |
D16/2 |
1Co-Co1 |
10202 |
15/09/1951 |
07/12/1963 |
12.236 |
4.441 |
|
|
05/1968 |
16.677 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12004 |
26/05/1939 |
09/12/1967 |
28.559 |
0.433 |
|
|
05/1968 |
28.992 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73000 |
12/04/1951 |
30/03/1968 |
16.978 |
0.211 |
|
|
06/1968 |
17.189 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73067 |
10/1954 |
30/03/1968 |
13.466 |
0.211 |
|
|
06/1968 |
13.677 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73040 |
05/10/1953 |
11/05/1968 |
14.608 |
0.178 |
9H |
Patricroft |
07/1968 |
14.786 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73132 |
04/10/1956 |
30/03/1968 |
11.493 |
0.293 |
|
|
07/1968 |
11.786 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48090 |
01/1937 |
06/04/1968 |
31.244 |
0.274 |
|
|
07/1968 |
31.518 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48335 |
11/1943 |
30/03/1968 |
24.389 |
0.293 |
|
|
07/1968 |
24.682 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48344 |
03/1944 |
30/03/1968 |
24.058 |
0.293 |
|
|
07/1968 |
24.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48441 |
06/06/1944 |
06/04/1968 |
23.849 |
0.274 |
|
|
07/1968 |
24.123 |
Steam |
LMS |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48749 |
08/1946 |
30/03/1968 |
21.638 |
0.293 |
|
|
07/1968 |
21.932 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45198 |
10/1935 |
30/09/1967 |
31.981 |
0.792 |
|
|
07/1968 |
32.773 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3500 |
01/01/1958 |
20/01/1968 |
10.058 |
0.485 |
|
|
07/1968 |
10.542 |
Diesel |
BR |
10 |
0-6-0 |
D3502 |
15/01/1958 |
03/02/1968 |
10.058 |
0.447 |
|
|
07/1968 |
10.504 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12031 |
29/04/1942 |
30/12/1967 |
25.688 |
0.542 |
|
|
07/1968 |
26.230 |
Diesel |
BR |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12032 |
09/06/1942 |
16/12/1967 |
25.537 |
0.581 |
|
|
07/1968 |
26.118 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73128 |
28/08/1956 |
11/05/1968 |
11.710 |
0.263 |
9H |
Patricroft |
08/1968 |
11.973 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73157 |
28/12/1956 |
11/05/1968 |
11.375 |
0.263 |
9H |
Patricroft |
08/1968 |
11.638 |
Diesel |
BR |
15 |
Bo-Bo |
D8241 |
01/02/1961 |
14/04/1968 |
7.203 |
0.337 |
30A |
Stratford |
08/1968 |
7.540 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73010 |
14/08/1951 |
22/06/1968 |
16.868 |
0.233 |
|
|
09/1968 |
17.101 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73135 |
27/10/1956 |
30/03/1968 |
11.430 |
0.463 |
|
|
09/1968 |
11.893 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73138 |
15/11/1956 |
27/04/1968 |
11.455 |
0.386 |
9H |
Patricroft |
09/1968 |
11.841 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73142 |
13/12/1956 |
27/04/1968 |
11.378 |
0.386 |
9H |
Patricroft |
09/1968 |
11.764 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44912 |
11/1945 |
09/09/1967 |
21.830 |
1.019 |
|
|
09/1968 |
22.849 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45279 |
11/1936 |
23/03/1968 |
31.373 |
0.482 |
|
|
09/1968 |
31.855 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73125 |
06/07/1956 |
29/06/1968 |
11.989 |
0.296 |
|
|
10/1968 |
12.285 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73133 |
11/10/1956 |
29/06/1968 |
11.723 |
0.296 |
|
|
10/1968 |
12.019 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73134 |
18/10/1956 |
22/06/1968 |
11.685 |
0.315 |
|
|
10/1968 |
12.000 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73143 |
20/12/1956 |
29/06/1968 |
11.532 |
0.381 |
|
|
11/1968 |
11.912 |
Steam |
LMS |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44888 |
08/1945 |
03/08/1968 |
22.984 |
0.781 |
|
|
05/1969 |
23.764 |
Diesel |
BR |
28 |
Co-Bo |
D5714 |
14/03/1959 |
07/09/1968 |
9.493 |
1.022 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
09/1969 |
10.515 |
Diesel |
BR |
28 |
Co-Bo |
D5719 |
17/10/1959 |
07/09/1968 |
8.899 |
1.022 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
09/1969 |
9.921 |
Diesel |
BR |
28 |
Co-Bo |
D5701 |
01/09/1958 |
07/09/1968 |
10.025 |
1.104 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
10/1969 |
11.129 |
Diesel |
BR |
28 |
Co-Bo |
D5702 |
29/09/1958 |
07/09/1968 |
9.948 |
1.104 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
10/1969 |
11.052 |
Diesel |
BR |
28 |
Co-Bo |
D5706 |
05/12/1958 |
07/09/1968 |
9.764 |
1.104 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
10/1969 |
10.868 |
Diesel |
BR |
28 |
Co-Bo |
D5707 |
19/12/1958 |
07/09/1968 |
9.726 |
1.104 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
10/1969 |
10.830 |
Diesel |
BR |
28 |
Co-Bo |
D5708 |
10/01/1959 |
07/09/1968 |
9.666 |
1.104 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
10/1969 |
10.770 |
Diesel |
BR |
28 |
Co-Bo |
D5711 |
14/02/1959 |
07/09/1968 |
9.570 |
1.104 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
10/1969 |
10.674 |
Diesel |
BR |
28 |
Co-Bo |
D5717 |
19/06/1959 |
07/09/1968 |
9.227 |
1.104 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
10/1969 |
10.332 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12043 |
04/02/1948 |
19/10/1968 |
20.721 |
1.074 |
|
|
11/1969 |
21.795 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12044 |
11/03/1948 |
19/10/1968 |
20.622 |
1.074 |
|
|
11/1969 |
21.696 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12045 |
28/04/1948 |
25/01/1969 |
20.759 |
0.805 |
|
|
11/1969 |
21.564 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12059 |
04/11/1949 |
25/01/1969 |
19.238 |
0.805 |
|
|
11/1969 |
20.044 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12064 |
20/12/1949 |
19/04/1969 |
19.342 |
0.575 |
|
|
11/1969 |
19.918 |
Diesel |
BR |
28 |
Co-Bo |
D5712 |
07/03/1959 |
07/09/1968 |
9.512 |
1.271 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
12/1969 |
10.784 |
Diesel |
BR |
28 |
Co-Bo |
D5716 |
16/05/1959 |
07/09/1968 |
9.321 |
1.271 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
12/1969 |
10.592 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12092 |
11/08/1951 |
16/04/1969 |
17.693 |
0.666 |
|
|
12/1969 |
18.359 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12100 |
19/04/1952 |
31/03/1969 |
16.959 |
0.710 |
|
|
12/1969 |
17.668 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12039 |
15/08/1947 |
19/10/1968 |
21.195 |
1.241 |
|
|
01/1970 |
22.436 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12040 |
12/09/1947 |
19/10/1968 |
21.118 |
1.241 |
|
|
01/1970 |
22.359 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12047 |
18/08/1948 |
25/01/1969 |
20.452 |
0.973 |
|
|
01/1970 |
21.425 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12057 |
16/09/1949 |
25/01/1969 |
19.373 |
0.973 |
|
|
01/1970 |
20.345 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12066 |
30/12/1949 |
19/04/1969 |
19.315 |
0.742 |
|
|
01/1970 |
20.058 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12086 |
31/12/1950 |
31/07/1969 |
18.595 |
0.460 |
|
|
01/1970 |
19.055 |
Diesel |
BR |
23 |
Bo-Bo |
D5908 |
29/05/1959 |
09/03/1969 |
9.786 |
0.940 |
|
|
02/1970 |
10.726 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12036 |
09/08/1945 |
19/10/1968 |
23.211 |
1.403 |
|
|
03/1970 |
24.614 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12048 |
14/12/1948 |
25/01/1969 |
20.129 |
1.134 |
|
|
03/1970 |
21.263 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12033 |
14/05/1945 |
25/01/1969 |
23.718 |
1.301 |
|
|
05/1970 |
25.019 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12037 |
30/10/1945 |
19/10/1968 |
22.986 |
1.570 |
|
|
05/1970 |
24.556 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12095 |
29/12/1951 |
16/04/1969 |
17.310 |
1.079 |
|
|
05/1970 |
18.389 |
Diesel |
BR |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5043 |
16/10/1959 |
10/08/1969 |
9.825 |
0.847 |
|
|
06/1970 |
10.671 |
Diesel |
BR |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5138 |
27/10/1960 |
10/08/1969 |
8.792 |
0.847 |
|
|
06/1970 |
9.638 |
Diesel |
BR |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5139 |
29/10/1960 |
10/08/1969 |
8.786 |
0.847 |
|
|
06/1970 |
9.633 |
Diesel |
BR |
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8572 |
20/01/1964 |
28/06/1969 |
5.441 |
0.964 |
|
|
06/1970 |
6.405 |
Diesel |
BR |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5093 |
28/07/1960 |
14/08/1969 |
9.052 |
0.918 |
|
|
07/1970 |
9.970 |
Steam |
GWR |
1500 |
0-6-0PT |
1502 |
29/07/1949 |
17/01/1961 |
11.479 |
9.748 |
|
|
10/1970 |
21.227 |
Steam |
GWR |
1500 |
0-6-0PT |
1509 |
22/09/1949 |
24/08/1959 |
9.926 |
11.151 |
|
|
10/1970 |
21.077 |
Diesel |
BR |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12051 |
10/03/1949 |
09/10/1971 |
22.597 |
1.356 |
|
|
02/1973 |
23.953 |
Diesel |
BR |
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8504 |
17/10/1962 |
07/11/1971 |
9.063 |
3.858 |
66A |
Polmadie |
09/1975 |
12.921 |
Diesel |
BR |
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8542 |
06/09/1963 |
06/10/1971 |
8.088 |
3.945 |
|
|
09/1975 |
12.033 |
Diesel |
BR |
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8546 |
17/09/1963 |
06/10/1971 |
8.058 |
3.945 |
|
|
09/1975 |
12.003 |
Diesel |
BR |
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8548 |
27/09/1963 |
31/12/1971 |
8.266 |
3.710 |
66A |
Polmadie |
09/1975 |
11.975 |
Diesel |
BR |
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8550 |
08/11/1963 |
05/10/1971 |
7.912 |
3.948 |
|
|
09/1975 |
11.860 |
Diesel |
BR |
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8551 |
08/10/1963 |
05/10/1971 |
7.997 |
3.948 |
|
|
09/1975 |
11.945 |
Diesel |
BR |
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8563 |
20/12/1963 |
31/12/1971 |
8.036 |
3.710 |
66A |
Polmadie |
09/1975 |
11.745 |
Diesel |
BR |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
24074 |
14/03/1960 |
04/10/1975 |
15.567 |
0.614 |
|
|
05/1976 |
16.181 |