Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 753 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14159 Week
» 67175 Month
» 186702 Year
» 3213555 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Cashmore's at Reddish Depot
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
26017 |
18/05/1951 |
22/03/1970 |
18.858 |
1.551 |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
20.408 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
26035 |
16/02/1952 |
22/03/1970 |
18.107 |
1.652 |
|
|
11/1971 |
19.759 |
Electric |
BR |
76 |
Bo+Bo |
26042 |
14/05/1952 |
22/03/1970 |
17.866 |
1.652 |
|
|
11/1971 |
19.518 |