Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3059 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16465 Week
» 69481 Month
» 189008 Year
» 3215861 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Cohens Ickles
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61317 |
06/05/1948 |
16/09/1962 |
14.373 |
0.332 |
40B |
Immingham |
01/1963 |
14.704 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61114 |
08/01/1947 |
16/09/1962 |
15.699 |
0.332 |
40B |
Immingham |
01/1963 |
16.030 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61312 |
23/04/1948 |
01/03/1964 |
15.866 |
0.205 |
41F |
Mexborough |
05/1964 |
16.071 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61155 |
06/05/1947 |
01/03/1964 |
16.833 |
0.205 |
41F |
Mexborough |
05/1964 |
17.038 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61249 |
31/10/1947 |
04/06/1964 |
16.605 |
0.197 |
41D |
Canklow |
08/1964 |
16.803 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47297 |
10/1924 |
06/06/1964 |
39.668 |
0.277 |
|
|
09/1964 |
39.945 |
Steam |
LMS |
0F |
0-4-0ST |
47009 |
30/01/1954 |
05/09/1964 |
10.605 |
0.362 |
|
|
01/1965 |
10.967 |
Steam |
LMS |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42639 |
02/11/1938 |
07/09/1964 |
25.866 |
0.356 |
|
|
01/1965 |
26.222 |
Steam |
LMS |
2F |
0-6-0T |
47165 |
12/1928 |
05/09/1964 |
35.748 |
0.362 |
|
|
01/1965 |
36.110 |
Steam |
LMS |
2F |
0-6-0T |
47164 |
12/1928 |
05/09/1964 |
35.748 |
0.362 |
|
|
01/1965 |
36.110 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42703 |
08/10/1926 |
03/10/1964 |
38.014 |
0.370 |
|
|
02/1965 |
38.384 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47284 |
09/1924 |
19/09/1964 |
40.038 |
0.408 |
|
|
02/1965 |
40.447 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44566 |
07/1937 |
26/09/1964 |
27.219 |
0.389 |
|
|
02/1965 |
27.608 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44565 |
07/1937 |
26/09/1964 |
27.219 |
0.389 |
|
|
02/1965 |
27.608 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44564 |
07/1937 |
19/09/1964 |
27.200 |
0.408 |
|
|
02/1965 |
27.608 |
Steam |
LMS |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42846 |
31/10/1930 |
19/09/1964 |
33.910 |
0.408 |
|
|
02/1965 |
34.318 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44463 |
05/1928 |
19/09/1964 |
36.373 |
0.408 |
|
|
02/1965 |
36.781 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44431 |
11/1927 |
26/09/1964 |
36.890 |
0.389 |
|
|
02/1965 |
37.279 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44381 |
01/1928 |
19/09/1964 |
36.704 |
0.408 |
|
|
02/1965 |
37.112 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44220 |
01/1926 |
26/09/1964 |
38.723 |
0.389 |
|
|
02/1965 |
39.112 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44096 |
11/1925 |
10/1964 |
38.942 |
0.337 |
|
|
02/1965 |
39.279 |
Steam |
LMS |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43888 |
1919 |
26/09/1964 |
|
0.466 |
|
|
03/1965 |
|
Steam |
LMS |
0F |
0-4-0ST |
47002 |
11/1932 |
05/09/1964 |
31.827 |
0.523 |
|
|
03/1965 |
32.351 |
Steam |
LMS |
0F |
0-4-0ST |
47008 |
12/1953 |
05/09/1964 |
10.732 |
0.523 |
|
|
03/1965 |
11.255 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44514 |
06/1928 |
26/09/1964 |
36.307 |
0.466 |
|
|
03/1965 |
36.773 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44379 |
12/1927 |
26/09/1964 |
36.808 |
0.466 |
|
|
03/1965 |
37.274 |
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44248 |
05/1926 |
26/09/1964 |
38.395 |
0.466 |
|
|
03/1965 |
38.860 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47344 |
08/1926 |
05/09/1964 |
38.085 |
0.608 |
|
|
04/1965 |
38.693 |
Steam |
LMS |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43856 |
1918 |
26/09/1964 |
|
0.551 |
|
|
04/1965 |
|
Steam |
MR |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44362 |
04/1927 |
09/1964 |
37.447 |
0.581 |
|
|
04/1965 |
38.027 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61299 |
12/03/1948 |
25/07/1965 |
17.381 |
0.142 |
40E |
Colwick |
09/1965 |
17.523 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61093 |
04/11/1946 |
25/07/1965 |
18.734 |
0.142 |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
09/1965 |
18.877 |
Steam |
LNER |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
61141 |
11/04/1947 |
25/07/1965 |
18.301 |
0.142 |
40E |
Colwick |
09/1965 |
18.444 |
Steam |
GNR |
K3 |
2-6-0 |
61943 |
08/1935 |
09/1962 |
27.104 |
|
|
|
1966 |
|
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47317 |
06/1926 |
16/04/1966 |
39.863 |
0.247 |
|
|
07/1966 |
40.110 |
Steam |
LMS |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42981 |
12/02/1934 |
21/05/1966 |
32.290 |
0.236 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
08/1966 |
32.526 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47611 |
10/1928 |
14/05/1966 |
37.603 |
0.255 |
|
|
08/1966 |
37.858 |
Steam |
LMS |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46500 |
03/1952 |
07/01/1967 |
14.825 |
0.436 |
|
|
06/1967 |
15.260 |
Steam |
LMS |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47534 |
04/1928 |
25/03/1967 |
38.967 |
0.477 |
|
|
09/1967 |
39.444 |