Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3807 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 21610 Week
» 74626 Month
» 194153 Year
» 3221006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Coopers Metals at Stratford MPD
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31243 |
13/10/1960 |
08/04/1991 |
30.504 |
2.860 |
|
|
02/1994 |
33.364 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31293 |
07/12/1961 |
09/11/1990 |
28.942 |
3.271 |
|
|
02/1994 |
32.214 |