Scrapyard: Drapers Hull
Type | Company | Class | Wheels | Number when Cut | Date Built | Date Withdrawn | Service (yrs) | Awaiting Scrap (yrs) | Depot on Withdrawal | Date Scrapped | Age (yrs) | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63571 | 10/1912 | 13/12/1964 | 52.197 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | |||
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61420 | 12/1920 | 23/09/1963 | 42.800 | 0.362 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 02/02/1964 | 43.162 |
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61463 | 29/11/1923 | 29/06/1964 | 40.611 | 0.230 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 21/09/1964 | 40.841 |
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61444 | 04/05/1923 | 29/06/1964 | 41.184 | 0.249 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 28/09/1964 | 41.433 |
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61438 | 17/01/1923 | 29/06/1964 | 41.477 | 0.268 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 05/10/1964 | 41.745 |
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61418 | 11/1920 | 29/06/1964 | 43.649 | 0.288 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 12/10/1964 | 43.937 |
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61437 | 04/01/1923 | 29/06/1964 | 41.512 | 0.288 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 12/10/1964 | 41.800 |
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61467 | 01/01/1924 | 08/06/1964 | 40.463 | 0.384 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 26/10/1964 | 40.847 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61065 | 15/08/1946 | 01/09/1964 | 18.060 | 0.205 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 11/1964 | 18.266 |
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61435 | 11/1922 | 21/07/1964 | 41.710 | 0.285 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 02/11/1964 | 41.995 |
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61472 | 12/1919 | 20/04/1964 | 44.378 | 0.556 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 09/11/1964 | 44.934 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61031 | 10/07/1947 | 09/11/1964 | 17.348 | 0.184 | 56B | Ardsley | 01/1965 | 17.532 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61165 | 28/05/1947 | 01/11/1964 | 17.444 | 0.205 | 41D | Canklow | 01/1965 | 17.649 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61212 | 08/07/1947 | 01/11/1964 | 17.332 | 0.205 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 01/1965 | 17.537 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61034 | 03/10/1947 | 21/12/1964 | 17.230 | 0.153 | 56A | Wakefield | 02/1965 | 17.384 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61179 | 27/06/1947 | 10/01/1965 | 17.553 | 0.099 | 40B | Immingham | 02/1965 | 17.652 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90602 | 12/1943 | 10/01/1965 | 21.088 | 0.175 | 03/1965 | 21.263 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61268 | 16/12/1947 | 28/12/1964 | 17.047 | 0.211 | 56B | Ardsley | 03/1965 | 17.258 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61338 | 20/08/1948 | 11/01/1965 | 16.405 | 0.173 | 56A | Wakefield | 03/1965 | 16.578 |
Steam | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63702 | 07/1918 | 19/09/1964 | 46.214 | 0.488 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 16/03/1965 | 46.701 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90426 | 10/1943 | 01/03/1965 | 21.392 | 0.123 | 04/1965 | 21.515 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90180 | 08/1943 | 14/03/1965 | 21.595 | 0.088 | 04/1965 | 21.682 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90185 | 09/1943 | 14/03/1965 | 21.510 | 0.088 | 04/1965 | 21.597 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90042 | 02/1944 | 10/01/1965 | 20.918 | 0.260 | 04/1965 | 21.178 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61215 | 19/07/1947 | 08/03/1965 | 17.649 | 0.104 | 56B | Ardsley | 04/1965 | 17.753 |
Steam | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63906 | 06/1918 | 03/01/1965 | 46.586 | 0.252 | 36C | Frodingham | 05/04/1965 | 46.838 |
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92187 | 12/02/1958 | 21/02/1965 | 7.030 | 0.227 | 05/1965 | 7.258 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92188 | 27/02/1958 | 02/1965 | 6.973 | 0.244 | 05/1965 | 7.216 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90070 | 06/1944 | 21/02/1965 | 20.701 | 0.227 | 05/1965 | 20.929 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90519 | 04/1945 | 21/09/1964 | 19.449 | 0.647 | 05/1965 | 20.096 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61198 | 02/06/1947 | 05/04/1965 | 17.855 | 0.110 | 50A | York (North) | 05/1965 | 17.964 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61310 | 19/04/1948 | 05/04/1965 | 16.973 | 0.110 | 56B | Ardsley | 05/1965 | 17.082 |
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92037 | 08/12/1954 | 21/02/1965 | 10.214 | 0.312 | 06/1965 | 10.526 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92184 | 10/01/1958 | 21/02/1965 | 7.121 | 0.312 | 06/1965 | 7.433 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92185 | 15/01/1958 | 21/02/1965 | 7.107 | 0.312 | 06/1965 | 7.419 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90055 | 05/1944 | 14/03/1965 | 20.844 | 0.255 | 06/1965 | 21.099 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92180 | 08/11/1957 | 11/04/1965 | 7.427 | 0.260 | 07/1965 | 7.688 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90123 | 04/1943 | 27/03/1965 | 21.964 | 0.301 | 07/1965 | 22.266 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90131 | 04/1943 | 21/03/1965 | 21.948 | 0.318 | 07/1965 | 22.266 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90005 | 05/1943 | 25/04/1965 | 21.962 | 0.222 | 07/1965 | 22.184 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90139 | 05/1943 | 02/05/1965 | 21.981 | 0.203 | 07/1965 | 22.184 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90522 | 05/1943 | 02/05/1965 | 21.981 | 0.203 | 07/1965 | 22.184 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90577 | 10/1943 | 02/05/1965 | 21.562 | 0.203 | 07/1965 | 21.764 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90290 | 01/1944 | 02/05/1965 | 21.310 | 0.203 | 07/1965 | 21.512 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90647 | 07/1944 | 07/03/1965 | 20.658 | 0.356 | 07/1965 | 21.014 | ||
Steam | LNER | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60961 | 02/12/1942 | 05/04/1965 | 22.356 | 0.268 | 50A | York (North) | 12/07/1965 | 22.625 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90175 | 09/1943 | 04/1965 | 21.597 | 0.334 | 08/1965 | 21.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90215 | 01/1943 | 04/1965 | 22.263 | 0.334 | 08/1965 | 22.597 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61098 | 19/11/1946 | 11/07/1965 | 18.655 | 0.096 | 40B | Immingham | 08/1965 | 18.751 |
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63879 | 07/1919 | 11/07/1965 | 46.022 | 0.214 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 27/09/1965 | 46.236 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90294 | 01/1944 | 11/07/1965 | 21.501 | 0.263 | 10/1965 | 21.764 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61365 | 21/04/1950 | 11/07/1965 | 15.233 | 0.263 | 40B | Immingham | 10/1965 | 15.496 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61370 | 10/10/1950 | 04/07/1965 | 14.742 | 0.282 | 36C | Frodingham | 10/1965 | 15.025 |
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63590 | 12/1912 | 11/07/1965 | 52.605 | 0.233 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 04/10/1965 | 52.838 |
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63646 | 02/1918 | 11/07/1965 | 47.433 | 0.233 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 04/10/1965 | 47.666 |
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63725 | 08/1919 | 11/07/1965 | 45.937 | 0.233 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 04/10/1965 | 46.170 |
Steam | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63734 | 04/1920 | 08/08/1965 | 45.345 | 0.175 | 36A | Doncaster | 11/10/1965 | 45.521 |
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63589 | 12/1912 | 11/07/1965 | 52.605 | 0.290 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 25/10/1965 | 52.896 |
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63630 | 02/1918 | 11/07/1965 | 47.433 | 0.290 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 25/10/1965 | 47.723 |
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92040 | 23/12/1954 | 08/08/1965 | 10.633 | 0.271 | 11/1965 | 10.904 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92193 | 23/05/1958 | 13/06/1965 | 7.063 | 0.425 | 11/1965 | 7.488 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92195 | 27/06/1958 | 09/05/1965 | 6.871 | 0.521 | 11/1965 | 7.392 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90341 | 08/1944 | 15/07/1965 | 20.929 | 0.337 | 11/1965 | 21.266 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90183 | 09/1943 | 29/08/1965 | 21.970 | 0.214 | 11/1965 | 22.184 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90029 | 01/1943 | 04/07/1965 | 22.482 | 0.367 | 11/1965 | 22.849 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90301 | 02/1944 | 26/09/1965 | 21.627 | 0.137 | 11/1965 | 21.764 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90660 | 09/1944 | 18/07/1965 | 20.852 | 0.329 | 11/1965 | 21.181 | ||
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63768 | 03/1918 | 11/07/1965 | 47.356 | 0.310 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 01/11/1965 | 47.666 |
Steam | LNER | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63868 | 08/1919 | 11/07/1965 | 45.937 | 0.310 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 01/11/1965 | 46.247 |
Steam | GCR | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63701 | 07/1918 | 01/08/1965 | 47.079 | 0.329 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 29/11/1965 | 47.408 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90127 | 04/1943 | 26/10/1964 | 21.548 | 1.137 | 12/1965 | 22.685 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90252 | 09/1943 | 26/09/1965 | 22.047 | 0.219 | 12/1965 | 22.266 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90280 | 12/1943 | 05/09/1965 | 21.740 | 0.277 | 12/1965 | 22.016 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90629 | 03/1944 | 26/09/1965 | 21.548 | 0.219 | 12/1965 | 21.767 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90390 | 01/1944 | 19/09/1965 | 21.693 | 0.238 | 12/1965 | 21.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90096 | 02/1944 | 19/09/1965 | 21.608 | 0.238 | 12/1965 | 21.847 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90491 | 08/1944 | 26/09/1965 | 21.129 | 0.219 | 12/1965 | 21.348 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61018 | 04/02/1947 | 07/11/1965 | 18.770 | 0.104 | 50A | York (North) | 12/1965 | 18.874 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61049 | 11/06/1946 | 07/11/1965 | 19.422 | 0.104 | 50A | York (North) | 12/1965 | 19.526 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61176 | 17/06/1947 | 07/11/1965 | 18.405 | 0.104 | 50A | York (North) | 12/1965 | 18.510 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61195 | 24/05/1947 | 14/11/1965 | 18.490 | 0.085 | 36C | Frodingham | 12/1965 | 18.575 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61256 | 17/11/1947 | 07/11/1965 | 17.986 | 0.104 | 50A | York (North) | 12/1965 | 18.090 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90051 | 04/1944 | 03/10/1965 | 21.482 | 0.285 | 01/1966 | 21.767 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90528 | 06/1943 | 26/09/1965 | 22.299 | 0.304 | 01/1966 | 22.603 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90545 | 07/1943 | 03/10/1965 | 22.236 | 0.285 | 01/1966 | 22.521 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90432 | 12/1943 | 03/10/1965 | 21.816 | 0.285 | 01/1966 | 22.101 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90195 | 10/1943 | 03/10/1965 | 21.984 | 0.285 | 01/1966 | 22.268 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90235 | 06/1943 | 03/10/1965 | 22.318 | 0.285 | 01/1966 | 22.603 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90242 | 06/1943 | 19/09/1965 | 22.279 | 0.323 | 01/1966 | 22.603 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90259 | 09/1943 | 03/10/1965 | 22.066 | 0.285 | 01/1966 | 22.351 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90283 | 14/12/1943 | 03/10/1965 | 21.819 | 0.285 | 01/1966 | 22.104 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90292 | 01/1944 | 17/10/1965 | 21.770 | 0.247 | 01/1966 | 22.016 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90438 | 02/1944 | 03/10/1965 | 21.647 | 0.285 | 01/1966 | 21.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90092 | 10/1944 | 11/10/1965 | 21.003 | 0.263 | 01/1966 | 21.266 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90662 | 09/1944 | 29/08/1965 | 20.967 | 0.381 | 01/1966 | 21.348 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90730 | 05/1945 | 03/10/1965 | 20.400 | 0.285 | 01/1966 | 20.685 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92186 | 27/01/1958 | 29/08/1965 | 7.592 | 0.466 | 02/1966 | 8.058 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90045 | 03/1944 | 27/10/1965 | 21.633 | 0.304 | 02/1966 | 21.937 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90333 | 07/1944 | 25/10/1965 | 21.293 | 0.310 | 02/1966 | 21.603 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90130 | 04/1943 | 17/10/1965 | 22.523 | 0.332 | 02/1966 | 22.855 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90529 | 06/1943 | 14/11/1965 | 22.433 | 0.255 | 02/1966 | 22.688 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90346 | 06/1944 | 24/10/1965 | 21.373 | 0.312 | 02/1966 | 21.685 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90273 | 11/1943 | 25/10/1965 | 21.959 | 0.310 | 02/1966 | 22.268 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90381 | 01/1944 | 24/10/1965 | 21.789 | 0.312 | 02/1966 | 22.101 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90404 | 01/1945 | 08/06/1967 | 22.408 | -1.310 | 02/1966 | 21.099 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90492 | 08/1944 | 17/10/1965 | 21.186 | 0.332 | 02/1966 | 21.518 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61010 | 02/11/1946 | 07/11/1965 | 19.027 | 0.310 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 28/02/1966 | 19.337 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90342 | 08/1944 | 07/11/1965 | 21.244 | 0.351 | 03/1966 | 21.595 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90569 | 09/1943 | 31/10/1965 | 22.142 | 0.370 | 03/1966 | 22.512 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90189 | 09/1943 | 14/11/1965 | 22.181 | 0.332 | 03/1966 | 22.512 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90220 | 04/1943 | 14/11/1965 | 22.600 | 0.332 | 03/1966 | 22.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90277 | 11/1943 | 31/10/1965 | 21.975 | 0.370 | 03/1966 | 22.345 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90619 | 02/1944 | 25/10/1965 | 21.707 | 0.386 | 03/1966 | 22.093 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90401 | 02/1944 | 14/11/1965 | 21.762 | 0.332 | 03/1966 | 22.093 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61026 | 28/04/1947 | 10/02/1966 | 18.803 | 0.090 | 40B | Immingham | 03/1966 | 18.893 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61058 | 10/07/1946 | 10/02/1966 | 19.603 | 0.090 | 40B | Immingham | 03/1966 | 19.693 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61210 | 03/07/1947 | 10/02/1966 | 18.622 | 0.090 | 36A | Doncaster | 03/1966 | 18.712 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61389 | 30/11/1951 | 14/11/1965 | 13.967 | 0.332 | 36C | Frodingham | 03/1966 | 14.299 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90316 | 03/1944 | 26/12/1965 | 21.797 | 0.301 | 04/1966 | 22.099 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90072 | 07/1944 | 27/12/1965 | 21.466 | 0.299 | 04/1966 | 21.764 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90336 | 07/1944 | 09/01/1966 | 21.501 | 0.263 | 04/1966 | 21.764 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90423 | 08/1943 | 26/12/1965 | 22.381 | 0.301 | 04/1966 | 22.682 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90428 | 10/1943 | 02/01/1966 | 22.233 | 0.282 | 04/1966 | 22.515 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90232 | 05/1943 | 02/01/1966 | 22.652 | 0.282 | 04/1966 | 22.934 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90274 | 16/11/1943 | 02/01/1966 | 22.145 | 0.282 | 04/1966 | 22.427 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90036 | 01/1944 | 19/12/1965 | 21.942 | 0.321 | 04/1966 | 22.263 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90043 | 03/1944 | 12/12/1965 | 21.759 | 0.340 | 04/1966 | 22.099 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90466 | 05/1944 | 26/12/1965 | 21.630 | 0.301 | 04/1966 | 21.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90665 | 10/1944 | 19/12/1965 | 21.192 | 0.321 | 04/1966 | 21.512 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90687 | 12/1944 | 02/01/1966 | 21.063 | 0.282 | 04/1966 | 21.345 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61322 | 25/05/1948 | 20/02/1966 | 17.753 | 0.148 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 04/1966 | 17.901 |
Steam | LNER | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60877 | 26/06/1940 | 13/02/1966 | 25.652 | 0.167 | 50A | York (North) | 04/1966 | 25.819 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90069 | 06/1944 | 30/01/1966 | 21.641 | 0.288 | 05/1966 | 21.929 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90142 | 05/1943 | 12/12/1965 | 22.595 | 0.422 | 05/1966 | 23.016 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90149 | 06/1943 | 23/01/1966 | 22.625 | 0.307 | 05/1966 | 22.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90153 | 06/1943 | 10/02/1966 | 22.674 | 0.258 | 05/1966 | 22.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90241 | 06/1943 | 09/01/1966 | 22.586 | 0.345 | 05/1966 | 22.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90295 | 01/1944 | 02/01/1966 | 21.981 | 0.364 | 05/1966 | 22.345 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90364 | 08/09/1944 | 05/12/1965 | 21.255 | 0.441 | 05/1966 | 21.696 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90418 | 03/1945 | 16/01/1966 | 20.855 | 0.326 | 05/1966 | 21.181 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90448 | 03/1944 | 05/12/1965 | 21.740 | 0.441 | 05/1966 | 22.181 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90449 | 03/1944 | 16/01/1966 | 21.855 | 0.326 | 05/1966 | 22.181 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90457 | 05/1944 | 05/01/1966 | 21.658 | 0.356 | 05/1966 | 22.014 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90506 | 10/1944 | 16/01/1966 | 21.268 | 0.326 | 05/1966 | 21.595 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90514 | 01/1945 | 23/01/1966 | 21.036 | 0.307 | 05/1966 | 21.342 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90104 | 02/1943 | 12/02/1966 | 23.008 | 0.337 | 06/1966 | 23.345 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90533 | 06/1943 | 12/02/1966 | 22.679 | 0.337 | 06/1966 | 23.016 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90572 | 10/1943 | 10/02/1966 | 22.340 | 0.342 | 06/1966 | 22.682 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90586 | 11/1943 | 13/02/1966 | 22.263 | 0.334 | 06/1966 | 22.597 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90190 | 09/1943 | 10/02/1966 | 22.422 | 0.342 | 06/1966 | 22.764 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90213 | 01/1943 | 13/02/1966 | 23.096 | 0.334 | 06/1966 | 23.430 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90024 | 10/1943 | 27/02/1966 | 22.386 | 0.296 | 06/1966 | 22.682 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90032 | 11/1943 | 27/02/1966 | 22.301 | 0.296 | 06/1966 | 22.597 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90606 | 12/1943 | 12/02/1966 | 22.178 | 0.337 | 06/1966 | 22.515 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90413 | 02/1945 | 12/02/1966 | 21.005 | 0.337 | 06/1966 | 21.342 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90377 | 10/1944 | 13/02/1966 | 21.345 | 0.334 | 06/1966 | 21.679 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90669 | 10/1944 | 12/02/1966 | 21.342 | 0.337 | 06/1966 | 21.679 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90689 | 12/1944 | 12/02/1966 | 21.175 | 0.337 | 06/1966 | 21.512 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90706 | 02/1945 | 12/02/1966 | 21.005 | 0.337 | 06/1966 | 21.342 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90719 | 03/1945 | 10/02/1966 | 20.923 | 0.342 | 06/1966 | 21.266 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90537 | 06/1943 | 27/02/1966 | 22.721 | 0.378 | 07/1966 | 23.099 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90178 | 08/1943 | 27/02/1966 | 22.553 | 0.378 | 07/1966 | 22.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90187 | 09/1943 | 27/02/1966 | 22.468 | 0.378 | 07/1966 | 22.847 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90080 | 08/1944 | 27/02/1966 | 21.551 | 0.378 | 07/1966 | 21.929 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90035 | 12/1943 | 27/02/1966 | 22.219 | 0.378 | 07/1966 | 22.597 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90367 | 10/1944 | 27/02/1966 | 21.384 | 0.378 | 07/1966 | 21.762 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90384 | 01/1944 | 27/02/1966 | 22.134 | 0.378 | 07/1966 | 22.512 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90456 | 04/1944 | 27/02/1966 | 21.885 | 0.378 | 07/1966 | 22.263 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90493 | 08/1944 | 27/02/1966 | 21.551 | 0.378 | 07/1966 | 21.929 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90718 | 03/1945 | 27/02/1966 | 20.970 | 0.378 | 07/1966 | 21.348 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90063 | 05/1944 | 17/04/1966 | 21.937 | 0.329 | 08/1966 | 22.266 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90001 | 02/1943 | 17/04/1966 | 23.184 | 0.329 | 08/1966 | 23.512 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90002 | 03/1943 | 17/04/1966 | 23.107 | 0.329 | 08/1966 | 23.436 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90013 | 09/1943 | 17/04/1966 | 22.603 | 0.329 | 08/1966 | 22.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90018 | 09/1943 | 17/04/1966 | 22.603 | 0.329 | 08/1966 | 22.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90037 | 01/1944 | 17/04/1966 | 22.268 | 0.329 | 08/1966 | 22.597 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90380 | 01/1944 | 20/03/1966 | 22.192 | 0.405 | 08/1966 | 22.597 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90517 | 03/1945 | 15/05/1966 | 21.181 | 0.252 | 08/1966 | 21.433 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90148 | 06/1943 | 27/03/1966 | 22.797 | 0.471 | 09/1966 | 23.268 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90154 | 06/1943 | 17/04/1966 | 22.855 | 0.414 | 09/1966 | 23.268 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90156 | 06/1943 | 17/04/1966 | 22.855 | 0.414 | 09/1966 | 23.268 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90075 | 08/1944 | 17/04/1966 | 21.685 | 0.414 | 09/1966 | 22.099 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90437 | 02/1944 | 17/04/1966 | 22.184 | 0.414 | 09/1966 | 22.597 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90369 | 10/1944 | 17/04/1966 | 21.518 | 0.414 | 09/1966 | 21.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90410 | 02/1945 | 17/04/1966 | 21.181 | 0.414 | 09/1966 | 21.595 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90471 | 06/1944 | 17/04/1966 | 21.852 | 0.414 | 09/1966 | 22.266 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92098 | 31/07/1956 | 31/07/1966 | 10.005 | 0.208 | 10/1966 | 10.214 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92164 | 30/04/1958 | 30/07/1966 | 8.255 | 0.211 | 10/1966 | 8.466 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92217 | 22/12/1959 | 30/07/1966 | 6.608 | 0.211 | 10/1966 | 6.819 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90538 | 06/1943 | 17/04/1966 | 22.855 | 0.496 | 10/1966 | 23.351 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90551 | 08/1943 | 17/04/1966 | 22.688 | 0.496 | 10/1966 | 23.184 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90011 | 08/1943 | 05/06/1966 | 22.822 | 0.362 | 10/1966 | 23.184 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90636 | 04/1944 | 17/04/1966 | 22.019 | 0.496 | 10/1966 | 22.515 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90675 | 11/1944 | 17/04/1966 | 21.433 | 0.496 | 10/1966 | 21.929 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90709 | 02/1945 | 17/04/1966 | 21.181 | 0.496 | 10/1966 | 21.677 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92061 | 30/11/1955 | 04/09/1966 | 10.770 | 0.197 | 11/1966 | 10.967 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92099 | 31/07/1956 | 04/09/1966 | 10.101 | 0.197 | 11/1966 | 10.299 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92158 | 30/11/1957 | 23/07/1966 | 8.649 | 0.315 | 11/1966 | 8.964 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90373 | 09/1944 | 11/09/1966 | 22.003 | 0.178 | 11/1966 | 22.181 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90479 | 06/1944 | 11/09/1966 | 22.255 | 0.178 | 11/1966 | 22.433 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90652 | 07/1944 | 11/09/1966 | 22.173 | 0.178 | 11/1966 | 22.351 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76089 | 25/05/1957 | 24/09/1966 | 9.340 | 0.225 | 12/1966 | 9.564 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90357 | 09/1944 | 13/09/1966 | 22.008 | 0.255 | 12/1966 | 22.263 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90481 | 07/1944 | 02/10/1966 | 22.230 | 0.203 | 12/1966 | 22.433 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90651 | 07/1944 | 02/10/1966 | 22.230 | 0.203 | 12/1966 | 22.433 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92059 | 31/10/1955 | 17/09/1966 | 10.888 | 0.329 | 01/1967 | 11.216 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61017 | 28/01/1947 | 15/11/1966 | 19.811 | 0.167 | 50A | York (North) | 01/1967 | 19.978 |
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75053 | 01/1957 | 10/09/1966 | 9.658 | 0.433 | 02/1967 | 10.090 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92075 | 31/03/1956 | 17/09/1966 | 10.471 | 0.414 | 02/1967 | 10.885 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90044 | 03/1944 | 01/12/1966 | 22.729 | 0.208 | 02/1967 | 22.937 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90664 | 10/1944 | 31/10/1966 | 22.058 | 0.293 | 02/1967 | 22.351 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61013 | 14/12/1946 | 06/12/1966 | 19.992 | 0.195 | 56A | Wakefield | 02/1967 | 20.186 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61032 | 07/08/1947 | 27/11/1966 | 19.321 | 0.219 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 02/1967 | 19.540 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61035 | 31/10/1947 | 12/12/1966 | 19.129 | 0.178 | 50A | York (North) | 02/1967 | 19.307 |
Steam | LNER | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60831 | 30/05/1938 | 06/12/1966 | 28.540 | 0.195 | 50A | York (North) | 02/1967 | 28.734 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61131 | 25/02/1947 | 06/12/1966 | 19.792 | 0.197 | 56A | Wakefield | 16/02/1967 | 19.989 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61319 | 14/05/1948 | 16/12/1966 | 18.603 | 0.170 | 50A | York (North) | 16/02/1967 | 18.773 |
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75049 | 10/1953 | 08/10/1966 | 12.989 | 0.433 | 03/1967 | 13.422 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90310 | 02/1944 | 19/12/1966 | 22.858 | 0.236 | 03/1967 | 23.093 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90395 | 02/1944 | 28/10/1966 | 22.715 | 0.378 | 03/1967 | 23.093 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90451 | 04/1944 | 23/12/1966 | 22.704 | 0.225 | 03/1967 | 22.929 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90470 | 06/1944 | 21/12/1966 | 22.532 | 0.230 | 03/1967 | 22.762 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61199 | 04/06/1947 | 05/01/1967 | 19.603 | 0.189 | 50A | York (North) | 03/1967 | 19.792 |
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76082 | 03/1957 | 08/10/1966 | 9.573 | 0.518 | 04/1967 | 10.090 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92060 | 30/11/1955 | 23/10/1966 | 10.904 | 0.477 | 04/1967 | 11.381 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92092 | 31/12/1956 | 22/10/1966 | 9.814 | 0.479 | 04/1967 | 10.293 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92095 | 31/03/1957 | 01/10/1966 | 9.510 | 0.537 | 04/1967 | 10.047 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92097 | 30/06/1956 | 23/10/1966 | 10.321 | 0.477 | 04/1967 | 10.797 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92155 | 30/11/1957 | 19/11/1966 | 8.975 | 0.403 | 04/1967 | 9.378 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92231 | 01/08/1958 | 17/11/1966 | 8.301 | 0.408 | 04/1967 | 8.710 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92239 | 30/09/1958 | 17/11/1966 | 8.137 | 0.408 | 04/1967 | 8.545 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92247 | 30/11/1958 | 08/10/1966 | 7.860 | 0.518 | 04/1967 | 8.378 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90723 | 04/1945 | 18/11/1966 | 21.608 | 0.405 | 04/1967 | 22.014 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90731 | 05/1945 | 13/11/1966 | 21.512 | 0.419 | 04/1967 | 21.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90649 | 07/1944 | 21/01/1967 | 22.534 | 0.312 | 05/1967 | 22.847 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90008 | 06/1943 | 10/04/1967 | 23.836 | 0.181 | 06/1967 | 24.016 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90240 | 06/1943 | 09/01/1967 | 23.586 | 0.430 | 06/1967 | 24.016 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90385 | 01/1944 | 02/1967 | 23.101 | 0.329 | 06/1967 | 23.430 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90462 | 05/1944 | 23/01/1967 | 22.707 | 0.392 | 06/1967 | 23.099 | ||
Diesel | BR | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2614 | 27/02/1961 | 12/03/1967 | 6.038 | 0.260 | 06/1967 | 6.299 | ||
Diesel | BR | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | D2701 | 19/12/1953 | 12/03/1967 | 13.236 | 0.260 | 06/1967 | 13.496 | ||
Diesel | BR | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | D2702 | 21/08/1954 | 12/03/1967 | 12.564 | 0.260 | 06/1967 | 12.825 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92083 | 31/05/1956 | 18/02/1967 | 10.726 | 0.403 | 07/1967 | 11.129 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92089 | 30/09/1956 | 18/02/1967 | 10.392 | 0.403 | 07/1967 | 10.795 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92104 | 31/08/1956 | 25/02/1967 | 10.493 | 0.384 | 07/1967 | 10.877 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92107 | 30/09/1956 | 25/02/1967 | 10.411 | 0.384 | 07/1967 | 10.795 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92116 | 31/12/1956 | 12/11/1966 | 9.871 | 0.671 | 07/1967 | 10.542 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92150 | 31/10/1957 | 17/04/1967 | 9.466 | 0.244 | 07/1967 | 9.710 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61019 | 24/02/1947 | 12/03/1967 | 20.058 | 0.342 | 50A | York (North) | 07/1967 | 20.400 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61189 | 08/08/1947 | 11/05/1967 | 19.770 | 0.178 | 50A | York (North) | 07/1967 | 19.948 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61123 | 30/01/1947 | 11/05/1967 | 20.290 | 0.195 | 50A | York (North) | 21/07/1967 | 20.485 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90056 | 05/1944 | 03/05/1967 | 22.981 | 0.285 | 08/1967 | 23.266 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90132 | 04/1943 | 10/04/1967 | 24.003 | 0.348 | 08/1967 | 24.351 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90429 | 11/1943 | 24/04/1967 | 23.455 | 0.310 | 08/1967 | 23.764 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90030 | 01/1943 | 17/04/1967 | 24.268 | 0.329 | 08/1967 | 24.597 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90361 | 09/1944 | 24/04/1967 | 22.619 | 0.310 | 08/1967 | 22.929 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90347 | 07/1944 | 24/05/1967 | 22.871 | 0.312 | 09/1967 | 23.184 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90254 | 09/1943 | 31/01/1967 | 23.395 | 0.622 | 09/1967 | 24.016 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90370 | 09/1944 | 15/05/1967 | 22.677 | 0.337 | 09/1967 | 23.014 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90655 | 08/1944 | 24/04/1967 | 22.704 | 0.395 | 09/1967 | 23.099 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78012 | 01/1954 | 06/05/1967 | 13.312 | 0.444 | 10/1967 | 13.756 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78013 | 01/1954 | 06/05/1967 | 13.312 | 0.444 | 10/1967 | 13.756 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78023 | 05/1954 | 06/05/1967 | 12.984 | 0.444 | 10/1967 | 13.427 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78044 | 12/1954 | 06/05/1967 | 12.397 | 0.444 | 10/1967 | 12.841 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78062 | 20/10/1956 | 06/05/1967 | 10.548 | 0.444 | 10/1967 | 10.992 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90061 | 05/1944 | 27/06/1967 | 23.132 | 0.301 | 10/1967 | 23.433 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90339 | 08/1944 | 01/07/1967 | 22.890 | 0.290 | 10/1967 | 23.181 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90116 | 03/1943 | 27/06/1967 | 24.301 | 0.301 | 10/1967 | 24.603 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90588 | 11/1943 | 12/02/1967 | 23.260 | 0.671 | 10/1967 | 23.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90200 | 10/1943 | 01/07/1967 | 23.726 | 0.290 | 10/1967 | 24.016 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90230 | 05/1943 | 24/05/1967 | 24.041 | 0.395 | 10/1967 | 24.436 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90309 | 02/1944 | 01/07/1967 | 23.389 | 0.290 | 10/1967 | 23.679 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90434 | 01/1944 | 27/06/1967 | 23.463 | 0.301 | 10/1967 | 23.764 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90459 | 05/1944 | 19/06/1967 | 23.110 | 0.323 | 10/1967 | 23.433 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90698 | 01/1945 | 05/07/1967 | 22.482 | 0.279 | 10/1967 | 22.762 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92006 | 10/02/1954 | 10/04/1967 | 13.170 | 0.600 | 11/1967 | 13.770 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90016 | 09/1943 | 24/06/1967 | 23.789 | 0.395 | 11/1967 | 24.184 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90396 | 02/1944 | 24/06/1967 | 23.370 | 0.395 | 11/1967 | 23.764 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78007 | 13/03/1953 | 06/05/1967 | 14.156 | 0.611 | 12/1967 | 14.767 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92211 | 08/09/1959 | 22/05/1967 | 7.707 | 0.567 | 12/1967 | 8.274 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90321 | 05/1944 | 01/07/1967 | 23.142 | 0.458 | 12/1967 | 23.600 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90172 | 09/1943 | 24/06/1967 | 23.789 | 0.477 | 12/1967 | 24.266 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90210 | 01/1943 | 01/07/1967 | 24.474 | 0.458 | 12/1967 | 24.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90352 | 08/1944 | 24/06/1967 | 22.871 | 0.477 | 12/1967 | 23.348 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90081 | 08/1944 | 24/06/1967 | 22.871 | 0.477 | 12/1967 | 23.348 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90233 | 06/1943 | 24/05/1967 | 23.956 | 0.562 | 12/1967 | 24.518 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90265 | 10/1943 | 24/06/1967 | 23.707 | 0.477 | 12/1967 | 24.184 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90272 | 11/1943 | 24/06/1967 | 23.622 | 0.477 | 12/1967 | 24.099 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90625 | 02/1944 | 05/1967 | 23.260 | 0.586 | 12/1967 | 23.847 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90091 | 10/1944 | 24/06/1967 | 22.704 | 0.477 | 12/1967 | 23.181 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90406 | 01/1945 | 24/06/1967 | 22.452 | 0.477 | 12/1967 | 22.929 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90458 | 05/1944 | 24/06/1967 | 23.123 | 0.477 | 12/1967 | 23.600 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90704 | 02/1945 | 24/06/1967 | 22.367 | 0.477 | 12/1967 | 22.844 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90057 | 05/1944 | 24/06/1967 | 23.123 | 0.562 | 01/1968 | 23.685 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90427 | 10/1943 | 24/06/1967 | 23.707 | 0.562 | 01/1968 | 24.268 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90262 | 10/1943 | 24/06/1967 | 23.707 | 0.562 | 01/1968 | 24.268 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90099 | 02/1945 | 24/06/1967 | 22.367 | 0.562 | 01/1968 | 22.929 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90094 | 01/1944 | 24/06/1967 | 23.455 | 0.562 | 01/1968 | 24.016 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90450 | 03/1944 | 24/06/1967 | 23.290 | 0.562 | 01/1968 | 23.852 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90633 | 04/1944 | 12/07/1967 | 23.255 | 0.512 | 01/1968 | 23.767 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90670 | 10/1944 | 24/06/1967 | 22.704 | 0.562 | 01/1968 | 23.266 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90688 | 12/1944 | 24/06/1967 | 22.537 | 0.562 | 01/1968 | 23.099 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92205 | 01/05/1959 | 08/06/1967 | 8.110 | 0.726 | 28/02/1968 | 8.836 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90047 | 03/1944 | 08/06/1967 | 23.247 | 0.726 | 28/02/1968 | 23.973 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90318 | 03/1944 | 09/09/1967 | 23.501 | 0.471 | 28/02/1968 | 23.973 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90160 | 07/1943 | 08/06/1967 | 23.915 | 0.726 | 28/02/1968 | 24.641 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90236 | 06/1943 | 09/09/1967 | 24.252 | 0.471 | 28/02/1968 | 24.723 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92135 | 30/06/1957 | 08/06/1967 | 9.945 | 0.770 | 03/1968 | 10.715 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92156 | 30/11/1957 | 22/07/1967 | 9.647 | 0.649 | 03/1968 | 10.296 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92215 | 17/11/1959 | 08/06/1967 | 7.562 | 0.770 | 03/1968 | 8.332 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90620 | 02/1944 | 08/06/1967 | 23.326 | 0.770 | 03/1968 | 24.096 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92055 | 24/09/1955 | 23/12/1967 | 12.255 | 0.312 | 04/1968 | 12.567 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92151 | 31/10/1957 | 22/04/1967 | 9.479 | 0.984 | 04/1968 | 10.463 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90430 | 11/1943 | 09/09/1967 | 23.833 | 0.600 | 04/1968 | 24.433 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90605 | 12/1943 | 09/09/1967 | 23.751 | 0.600 | 04/1968 | 24.351 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90699 | 01/1945 | 09/09/1967 | 22.663 | 0.600 | 04/1968 | 23.263 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90721 | 03/1945 | 09/09/1967 | 22.501 | 0.600 | 04/1968 | 23.101 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90642 | 06/1944 | 09/09/1967 | 23.249 | 0.682 | 05/1968 | 23.932 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90611 | 01/1944 | 17/08/1967 | 23.603 | 0.830 | 06/1968 | 24.433 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73126 | 13/07/1956 | 20/04/1968 | 11.778 | 0.236 | 9H | Patricroft | 07/1968 | 12.014 |
Diesel | BR | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2224 | 30/09/1955 | 13/04/1968 | 12.545 | 0.340 | 08/1968 | 12.885 | ||
Diesel | BR | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2226 | 30/10/1955 | 13/04/1968 | 12.463 | 0.340 | 08/1968 | 12.803 | ||
Diesel | BR | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2227 | 20/11/1955 | 13/04/1968 | 12.405 | 0.340 | 08/1968 | 12.745 | ||
Diesel | BR | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2234 | 17/02/1956 | 13/04/1968 | 12.162 | 0.340 | 08/1968 | 12.501 | ||
Diesel | BR | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8605 | 01/10/1964 | 28/10/1968 | 4.077 | 0.545 | 05/1969 | 4.622 | ||
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2052 | 04/02/1959 | 07/05/1972 | 13.263 | 1.441 | 52A | Gateshead | 10/1973 | 14.704 |
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2053 | 11/04/1959 | 07/05/1972 | 13.082 | 1.441 | 52A | Gateshead | 10/1973 | 14.523 |
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2071 | 13/10/1959 | 07/05/1972 | 12.575 | 1.441 | 52A | Gateshead | 10/1973 | 14.016 |
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2074 | 11/11/1959 | 07/05/1972 | 12.496 | 1.441 | 52A | Gateshead | 10/1973 | 13.937 |