Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1075 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18878 Week
» 71894 Month
» 191421 Year
» 3218274 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Duport Steels Llanelli
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2561 |
19/02/1957 |
26/08/1967 |
10.521 |
5.142 |
|
|
10/1972 |
15.663 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2304 |
04/11/1960 |
03/02/1968 |
7.252 |
9.285 |
|
|
05/1977 |
16.537 |
Diesel |
BR |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2601 |
20/07/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
7.449 |
11.718 |
|
|
09/1979 |
19.167 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2307 |
28/11/1960 |
03/02/1968 |
7.186 |
11.704 |
|
|
10/1979 |
18.890 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2308 |
06/12/1960 |
03/02/1968 |
7.164 |
12.288 |
|
|
05/1980 |
19.452 |
Diesel |
BR |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2195 |
05/06/1961 |
01/09/1968 |
7.247 |
13.047 |
|
|
09/1981 |
20.293 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2305 |
10/11/1960 |
03/02/1968 |
7.236 |
13.625 |
|
|
09/1981 |
20.860 |
Diesel |
BR |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2306 |
17/11/1960 |
03/02/1968 |
7.216 |
13.625 |
|
|
09/1981 |
20.841 |