Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1367 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19170 Week
» 72186 Month
» 191713 Year
» 3218566 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: EMR Hartlepool
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56088 |
25/01/1981 |
02/2004 |
23.071 |
|
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56102 |
20/12/1981 |
09/2003 |
21.751 |
|
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56111 |
24/10/1982 |
04/2003 |
20.488 |
|
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
BR |
56 |
Co-Co |
56127 |
13/12/1983 |
02/2002 |
18.189 |
|
|
|
|
|