Scrapyard: Hayes Bridgend
Type | Company | Class | Wheels | Number when Cut | Date Built | Date Withdrawn | Service (yrs) | Awaiting Scrap (yrs) | Depot on Withdrawal | Date Scrapped | Age (yrs) | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4076 | 07/02/1924 | 08/02/1963 | 39.030 | 87F | Llanelli | |||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 5386 | 08/1920 | 20/10/1958 | 38.205 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4500 | 2-6-2T | 4553 | 03/1915 | 08/12/1958 | 43.764 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 5390 | 10/1920 | 13/08/1958 | 37.852 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5077 | 15/08/1938 | 24/07/1962 | 23.956 | 0.060 | 87F | Llanelli | 08/1962 | 24.016 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5048 | 25/04/1936 | 14/08/1962 | 26.321 | 0.003 | 87F | Llanelli | 08/1962 | 26.323 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4099 | 03/08/1926 | 21/09/1962 | 36.159 | -0.016 | 87F | Llanelli | 09/1962 | 36.142 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5030 | 18/05/1934 | 21/09/1962 | 28.364 | 0.066 | 87G | Carmarthen | 10/1962 | 28.430 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5016 | 09/07/1932 | 17/09/1962 | 30.211 | 0.244 | 87F | Llanelli | 12/1962 | 30.455 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5062 | 15/06/1937 | 14/08/1962 | 25.181 | 0.337 | 87F | Llanelli | 12/1962 | 25.518 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4078 | 24/02/1924 | 02/07/1962 | 38.378 | 0.455 | 87F | Llanelli | 12/1962 | 38.833 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4096 | 23/06/1926 | 01/01/1963 | 36.551 | 0.786 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 10/1963 | 37.337 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4081 | 03/1924 | 01/01/1963 | 38.825 | 0.786 | 87G | Carmarthen | 10/1963 | 39.611 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5081 | 27/05/1939 | 21/10/1963 | 24.419 | 0.652 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | 06/1964 | 25.071 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7010 | 09/06/1948 | 10/03/1964 | 15.762 | 0.266 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 06/1964 | 16.027 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7016 | 10/08/1948 | 26/11/1962 | 14.304 | 1.553 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 06/1964 | 15.858 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5085 | 12/1922 | 14/02/1964 | 41.195 | 0.334 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 06/1964 | 41.529 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5073 | 07/07/1938 | 26/02/1964 | 25.658 | 0.301 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | 06/1964 | 25.959 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5002 | 28/08/1926 | 01/09/1964 | 38.038 | 0.205 | 81C | Southall | 11/1964 | 38.244 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5076 | 10/08/1938 | 07/09/1964 | 26.096 | 0.271 | 81C | Southall | 12/1964 | 26.367 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7020 | 31/05/1949 | 07/09/1964 | 15.282 | 0.271 | 81C | Southall | 12/1964 | 15.553 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4089 | 08/07/1925 | 07/09/1964 | 39.195 | 0.356 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 01/1965 | 39.551 |
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76054 | 30/04/1955 | 18/10/1964 | 9.477 | 0.405 | 03/1965 | 9.882 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80042 | 15/07/1952 | 06/02/1965 | 12.573 | 0.268 | 05/1965 | 12.841 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92236 | 04/09/1958 | 21/04/1965 | 6.633 | 0.318 | 08/1965 | 6.951 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90268 | 10/1943 | 10/04/1965 | 21.501 | 0.348 | 08/1965 | 21.849 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5042 | 05/07/1935 | 25/06/1965 | 29.995 | 0.307 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 10/1965 | 30.301 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7022 | 15/06/1949 | 25/06/1965 | 16.038 | 0.307 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 10/1965 | 16.345 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7034 | 01/08/1950 | 25/06/1965 | 14.910 | 0.307 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 10/1965 | 15.216 |
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82042 | 20/06/1955 | 06/08/1965 | 10.137 | 0.529 | 02/1966 | 10.666 | ||
Diesel | BR | 47 | Co-Co | D1671 | 27/03/1965 | 18/04/1966 | 1.060 | 0.159 | 06/1966 | 1.219 | ||
Diesel | BR | 37 | Co-Co | D6983 | 13/05/1965 | 18/04/1966 | 0.932 | 0.159 | 06/1966 | 1.090 |