Scrapyard: Hughes Bolckows North Blyth
Type | Company | Class | Wheels | Number when Cut | Date Built | Date Withdrawn | Service (yrs) | Awaiting Scrap (yrs) | Depot on Withdrawal | Date Scrapped | Age (yrs) | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61037 | 28/11/1947 | 18/05/1964 | 16.482 | 0.244 | 51A | Darlington | 08/1964 | 16.726 |
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61457 | 23/10/1923 | 29/06/1964 | 40.712 | 0.214 | 50A | York (North) | 09/1964 | 40.926 |
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61454 | 29/09/1923 | 29/06/1964 | 40.778 | 0.214 | 50A | York (North) | 09/1964 | 40.992 |
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61448 | 06/06/1923 | 29/06/1964 | 41.093 | 0.214 | 50A | York (North) | 09/1964 | 41.307 |
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61434 | 11/1922 | 29/06/1964 | 41.649 | 0.214 | 50A | York (North) | 09/1964 | 41.863 |
Steam | NER | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61421 | 12/1920 | 29/06/1964 | 43.567 | 0.214 | 50A | York (North) | 09/1964 | 43.781 |
Steam | BR | Std 2MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 84001 | 06/07/1953 | 31/10/1964 | 11.329 | 0.208 | 01/1965 | 11.537 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 84020 | 27/03/1957 | 31/10/1964 | 7.603 | 0.208 | 01/1965 | 7.811 | ||
Steam | LNER | A4 | 4-6-2 | 60001 | 26/04/1938 | 12/10/1964 | 26.482 | 0.260 | 52A | Gateshead | 01/1965 | 26.742 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61162 | 21/05/1947 | 08/12/1964 | 17.564 | 0.189 | 34E | New England | 02/1965 | 17.753 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61167 | 30/05/1947 | 06/12/1964 | 17.534 | 0.195 | 41D | Canklow | 02/1965 | 17.729 |
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92221 | 30/05/1958 | 10/05/1965 | 6.951 | 0.351 | 09/1965 | 7.301 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61107 | 13/12/1946 | 15/08/1965 | 18.685 | 0.085 | 36A | Doncaster | 09/1965 | 18.770 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61070 | 28/08/1946 | 22/08/1965 | 18.997 | 0.066 | 40E | Colwick | 09/1965 | 19.063 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61353 | 06/09/1949 | 16/08/1965 | 15.953 | 0.164 | 56A | Wakefield | 10/1965 | 16.118 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61320 | 18/05/1948 | 19/08/1965 | 17.266 | 0.156 | 56A | Wakefield | 10/1965 | 17.422 |
Steam | LNER | A4 | 4-6-2 | 60034 | 01/07/1938 | 24/08/1966 | 28.167 | -0.858 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 10/1965 | 27.310 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61259 | 24/11/1947 | 26/08/1965 | 17.767 | 0.137 | 56B | Ardsley | 10/1965 | 17.904 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61220 | 06/08/1947 | 04/10/1965 | 18.175 | 0.115 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 11/1965 | 18.290 |
Steam | BR | Std 2MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 84018 | 23/10/1953 | 24/04/1965 | 11.510 | 0.562 | 11/1965 | 12.071 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61257 | 19/11/1947 | 04/10/1965 | 17.888 | 0.115 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 11/1965 | 18.003 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61188 | 29/07/1947 | 14/11/1965 | 18.310 | 0.085 | 40E | Colwick | 12/1965 | 18.395 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61110 | 20/12/1946 | 31/10/1965 | 18.877 | 0.123 | 56B | Ardsley | 12/1965 | 19.000 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61248 | 27/10/1947 | 07/11/1965 | 18.044 | 0.104 | 40E | Colwick | 12/1965 | 18.148 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61023 | 01/04/1947 | 31/10/1965 | 18.597 | 0.123 | 56F | Low Moor | 12/1965 | 18.721 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61016 | 16/01/1947 | 31/10/1965 | 18.803 | 0.123 | 56F | Low Moor | 12/1965 | 18.926 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61275 | 12/01/1948 | 28/10/1965 | 17.805 | 0.132 | 50A | York (North) | 12/1965 | 17.937 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61304 | 31/03/1948 | 31/10/1965 | 17.597 | 0.123 | 56B | Ardsley | 12/1965 | 17.721 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61313 | 27/04/1948 | 14/11/1965 | 17.562 | 0.085 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 12/1965 | 17.647 |
Steam | BR | Std 2MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 84011 | 18/09/1953 | 24/04/1965 | 11.605 | 0.644 | 12/1965 | 12.249 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61367 | 28/04/1950 | 22/08/1965 | 15.329 | 0.351 | 36A | Doncaster | 28/12/1965 | 15.679 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61127 | 12/02/1947 | 15/08/1965 | 18.518 | 0.370 | 36C | Frodingham | 28/12/1965 | 18.888 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61385 | 25/10/1951 | 31/10/1965 | 14.027 | 0.293 | 56B | Ardsley | 02/1966 | 14.321 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61387 | 02/11/1951 | 31/10/1965 | 14.005 | 0.370 | 56A | Wakefield | 03/1966 | 14.375 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61394 | 23/01/1952 | 14/11/1965 | 13.819 | 0.332 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 03/1966 | 14.151 |
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92179 | 07/10/1957 | 14/11/1965 | 8.110 | 0.332 | 03/1966 | 8.441 | ||
Steam | NBR | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64595 | 11/1919 | 03/03/1966 | 46.329 | 0.367 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 07/1966 | 46.696 |
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92062 | 30/11/1955 | 26/06/1966 | 10.578 | 0.304 | 10/1966 | 10.882 | ||
Steam | LNER | A4 | 4-6-2 | 60024 | 26/12/1936 | 05/09/1966 | 29.712 | 0.110 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 10/1966 | 29.822 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61014 | 23/12/1946 | 31/12/1966 | 20.036 | 0.203 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 03/1967 | 20.238 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61238 | 26/09/1947 | 17/02/1967 | 19.408 | 0.181 | 50A | York (North) | 24/04/1967 | 19.589 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61021 | 12/03/1947 | 06/06/1967 | 20.249 | 0.192 | 50A | York (North) | 08/1967 | 20.441 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61012 | 30/11/1946 | 12/06/1967 | 20.545 | 0.175 | 50A | York (North) | 08/1967 | 20.721 |
Steam | LNER | A4 | 4-6-2 | 60026 | 20/02/1937 | 21/12/1965 | 28.852 | 1.734 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 09/1967 | 30.586 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90695 | 12/1944 | 09/09/1967 | 22.748 | 0.016 | 09/1967 | 22.764 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90677 | 11/1944 | 09/09/1967 | 22.830 | 0.016 | 09/1967 | 22.847 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90478 | 06/1944 | 09/09/1967 | 23.249 | 0.016 | 09/1967 | 23.266 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90627 | 03/1944 | 08/1967 | 23.433 | 0.085 | 09/1967 | 23.518 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90417 | 03/1945 | 09/09/1967 | 22.501 | 0.099 | 10/1967 | 22.600 | ||
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61388 | 09/11/1951 | 24/06/1967 | 15.633 | 0.310 | 56A | Wakefield | 10/1967 | 15.942 |
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90135 | 09/05/1943 | 09/09/1967 | 24.353 | 0.099 | 10/1967 | 24.452 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75060 | 02/05/1957 | 22/04/1967 | 9.978 | 0.482 | 10/1967 | 10.460 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90348 | 07/1944 | 09/09/1967 | 23.167 | 0.099 | 10/1967 | 23.266 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90382 | 01/1944 | 09/09/1967 | 23.666 | 0.099 | 10/1967 | 23.764 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90378 | 10/1944 | 09/09/1967 | 22.915 | 0.099 | 10/1967 | 23.014 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90009 | 07/1943 | 01/09/1967 | 24.148 | 0.205 | 11/1967 | 24.353 | ||
Diesel | BR | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3151 | 08/08/1955 | 04/12/1967 | 12.332 | 0.364 | 04/1968 | 12.696 | ||
Diesel | BR | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2318 | 01/03/1961 | 10/02/1968 | 6.951 | 0.260 | 05/1968 | 7.211 | ||
Diesel | BR | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2339 | 27/10/1961 | 16/10/1967 | 5.973 | 0.581 | 05/1968 | 6.553 | ||
Diesel | BR | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3146 | 07/07/1955 | 12/02/1968 | 12.611 | 0.255 | 05/1968 | 12.866 | ||
Diesel | BR | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2315 | 06/02/1961 | 10/02/1968 | 7.014 | 0.512 | 08/1968 | 7.526 | ||
Diesel | BR | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3144 | 21/06/1955 | 07/1969 | 14.077 | 0.252 | 10/1969 | 14.329 | ||
Diesel | BR | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2206 | 18/04/1953 | 07/1969 | 16.252 | 0.419 | 12/1969 | 16.671 | ||
Diesel | BR | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2237 | 24/04/1956 | 31/10/1969 | 13.529 | 0.370 | 03/1970 | 13.899 |