Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 49 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17852 Week
» 70868 Month
» 190395 Year
» 3217248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Harry Needle Railroad Company at Crewe DMD
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47188 |
10/05/1965 |
31/08/2005 |
40.337 |
0.082 |
|
|
30/09/2005 |
40.419 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47213 |
11/06/1965 |
31/08/2005 |
40.249 |
0.082 |
|
|
30/09/2005 |
40.332 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37903 |
09/12/1964 |
01/12/1998 |
34.000 |
6.877 |
|
|
10/2005 |
40.877 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08932 |
04/05/1962 |
31/08/2005 |
43.356 |
0.290 |
|
|
12/2005 |
43.647 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47801 |
03/07/1964 |
01/06/2002 |
37.937 |
3.789 |
|
|
03/2006 |
41.726 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47531 |
16/05/1964 |
01/07/2001 |
37.151 |
4.792 |
|
|
04/2006 |
41.942 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47515 |
03/05/1968 |
28/03/1991 |
22.915 |
15.142 |
|
|
05/2006 |
38.058 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37889 |
01/04/1964 |
01/06/1999 |
35.189 |
7.792 |
|
|
03/2007 |
42.981 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37713 |
06/09/1962 |
01/03/2000 |
37.510 |
7.293 |
|
|
06/2007 |
44.803 |