Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1265 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19068 Week
» 72084 Month
» 191611 Year
» 3218464 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrap Merchant: J T Lanscapes
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20135 |
26/03/1966 |
23/07/1993 |
27.345 |
10.986 |
|
|
07/2004 |
38.332 |
Electric |
BR |
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87016 |
12/03/1974 |
14/09/2004 |
30.532 |
0.214 |
|
|
01/12/2004 |
30.745 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86102 |
10/04/1966 |
04/2002 |
36.038 |
2.964 |
|
|
01/04/2005 |
39.003 |
Electric |
BR |
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87005 |
14/08/1973 |
30/04/2005 |
31.732 |
0.422 |
|
|
01/10/2005 |
32.153 |
Electric |
BR |
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87015 |
19/02/1974 |
30/04/2005 |
31.214 |
0.422 |
|
|
01/10/2005 |
31.636 |
Electric |
BR |
86 |
Bo-Bo |
86249 |
27/09/1965 |
10/2003 |
38.074 |
2.047 |
|
|
31/10/2005 |
40.121 |
Electric |
BR |
87 |
Bo-Bo |
87024 |
25/04/1974 |
31/05/2005 |
31.121 |
0.422 |
|
|
01/11/2005 |
31.542 |