Scrapyard: Marples and Gillot Sheffield
Type | Company | Class | Wheels | Number when Cut | Date Built | Date Withdrawn | Service (yrs) | Awaiting Scrap (yrs) | Depot on Withdrawal | Date Scrapped | Age (yrs) | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61083 | 07/10/1946 | 22/09/1963 | 16.970 | 0.230 | 41D | Canklow | 12/1963 | 17.200 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61399 | 22/04/1952 | 22/09/1963 | 11.425 | 0.230 | 41D | Canklow | 12/1963 | 11.655 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61120 | 22/01/1947 | 31/01/1965 | 18.038 | 0.118 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 03/1965 | 18.156 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61153 | 02/05/1947 | 17/01/1965 | 17.726 | 0.156 | 41D | Canklow | 03/1965 | 17.882 |
Steam | LNER | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61327 | 11/06/1948 | 14/02/1965 | 16.690 | 0.164 | 41D | Canklow | 04/1965 | 16.855 |
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2116 | 21/08/1959 | 09/10/1971 | 12.142 | 1.767 | 07/1973 | 13.910 | ||
Diesel | BR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12109 | 04/06/1952 | 19/11/1972 | 20.474 | 0.737 | 30A | Stratford | 08/1973 | 21.211 |
Diesel | BR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12110 | 04/06/1952 | 19/11/1972 | 20.474 | 0.737 | 30A | Stratford | 08/1973 | 21.211 |
Diesel | BR | 35 | B-B | D7011 | 04/12/1961 | 02/03/1975 | 13.249 | 1.877 | 01/1977 | 15.126 | ||
Diesel | BR | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | D2519 | 30/11/1961 | 29/07/1967 | 5.663 | 17.641 | 03/1985 | 23.304 | ||
Diesel | BR | 15 | Bo-Bo | D8237 | 17/11/1960 | 20/03/1969 | 8.342 | 16.082 | 04/1985 | 24.425 | ||
Diesel | BR | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3011 | 19/12/1952 | 01/10/1972 | 19.797 | 13.214 | 12/1985 | 33.011 | ||
Diesel | BR | 35 | B-B | D7096 | 16/12/1963 | 30/12/1972 | 9.047 | 13.137 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 02/1986 | 22.184 |
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2181 | 21/02/1962 | 11/05/1968 | 6.222 | 18.693 | 01/1987 | 24.915 |