Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1351 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19154 Week
» 72170 Month
» 191697 Year
» 3218550 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: MC Metals Springburn
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Diesel |
BR |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
27008 |
20/09/1961 |
18/08/1987 |
25.926 |
0.274 |
|
|
26/11/1987 |
26.200 |
Diesel |
BR |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
27003 |
28/07/1961 |
16/01/1987 |
25.488 |
0.929 |
|
|
21/12/1987 |
26.416 |
Diesel |
BR |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
27046 |
06/04/1962 |
01/07/1987 |
25.252 |
0.959 |
|
|
06/1988 |
26.211 |
Diesel |
BR |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
27054 |
03/07/1962 |
01/07/1987 |
25.011 |
0.959 |
|
|
06/1988 |
25.970 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20152 |
15/08/1966 |
14/04/1988 |
21.679 |
0.375 |
|
|
29/08/1988 |
22.055 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20222 |
30/12/1967 |
15/12/1987 |
19.973 |
0.874 |
|
|
29/10/1988 |
20.847 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45002 |
13/05/1961 |
16/09/1984 |
23.362 |
4.173 |
|
|
17/11/1988 |
27.534 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45001 |
05/11/1960 |
20/01/1986 |
25.225 |
2.847 |
|
|
24/11/1988 |
28.071 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45004 |
10/12/1960 |
08/12/1985 |
25.011 |
3.038 |
|
|
21/12/1988 |
28.049 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45048 |
12/11/1960 |
24/06/1985 |
24.630 |
3.556 |
|
|
12/01/1989 |
28.186 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45051 |
05/12/1960 |
09/04/1987 |
26.359 |
1.767 |
|
|
13/01/1989 |
28.126 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45010 |
08/08/1961 |
28/03/1985 |
23.652 |
3.836 |
|
|
26/01/1989 |
27.488 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31278 |
20/07/1961 |
29/03/1989 |
27.710 |
-0.115 |
|
|
02/1989 |
27.595 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45026 |
03/03/1961 |
07/04/1986 |
25.112 |
2.860 |
|
|
14/02/1989 |
27.973 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45044 |
29/03/1962 |
15/06/1987 |
25.230 |
1.671 |
|
|
14/02/1989 |
26.901 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20146 |
10/06/1966 |
07/12/1988 |
22.510 |
0.323 |
|
|
04/04/1989 |
22.833 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85001 |
15/08/1961 |
16/10/1985 |
24.186 |
3.468 |
|
|
04/04/1989 |
27.655 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85039 |
22/01/1964 |
05/03/1987 |
23.132 |
2.107 |
|
|
12/04/1989 |
25.238 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45049 |
25/11/1960 |
27/10/1987 |
26.937 |
1.479 |
|
|
19/04/1989 |
28.416 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45070 |
11/10/1961 |
29/01/1987 |
25.318 |
2.326 |
|
|
27/05/1989 |
27.644 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47487 |
11/01/1964 |
07/12/1988 |
24.923 |
0.515 |
|
|
13/06/1989 |
25.438 |
Diesel |
BR |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
27018 |
13/12/1961 |
12/05/1986 |
24.427 |
3.173 |
|
|
13/07/1989 |
27.600 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31121 |
09/07/1959 |
01/09/1988 |
29.170 |
1.038 |
|
|
09/1989 |
30.208 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31138 |
08/10/1959 |
02/02/1989 |
29.342 |
0.699 |
|
|
10/1989 |
30.041 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31141 |
22/10/1959 |
25/01/1989 |
29.282 |
0.721 |
|
|
10/1989 |
30.003 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31287 |
19/10/1961 |
09/09/1987 |
25.907 |
2.101 |
|
|
10/1989 |
28.008 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47122 |
20/01/1964 |
03/09/1987 |
23.636 |
2.093 |
|
|
06/10/1989 |
25.729 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47148 |
09/06/1964 |
22/07/1987 |
23.132 |
2.211 |
|
|
06/10/1989 |
25.342 |
Diesel |
BR |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25905 |
15/11/1965 |
01/09/1986 |
20.808 |
3.208 |
|
|
11/1989 |
24.016 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47469 |
16/06/1964 |
19/03/1989 |
24.773 |
0.663 |
|
|
16/11/1989 |
25.436 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47109 |
21/12/1963 |
10/08/1987 |
23.652 |
2.271 |
|
|
16/11/1989 |
25.923 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08852 |
12/06/1961 |
03/08/1988 |
27.162 |
1.288 |
ML |
Motherwell |
16/11/1989 |
28.449 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20204 |
22/04/1967 |
10/05/1989 |
22.066 |
0.521 |
|
|
16/11/1989 |
22.586 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26029 |
12/06/1959 |
13/10/1988 |
29.359 |
1.132 |
|
|
30/11/1989 |
30.490 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31311 |
14/06/1962 |
07/02/1989 |
26.671 |
0.852 |
|
|
12/1989 |
27.523 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31118 |
18/06/1959 |
20/02/1989 |
29.699 |
0.901 |
|
|
01/1990 |
30.600 |
Diesel |
BR |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25325 |
22/04/1967 |
23/12/1985 |
18.685 |
4.126 |
|
|
06/02/1990 |
22.811 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45107 |
28/08/1961 |
27/07/1988 |
26.932 |
1.649 |
|
|
21/03/1990 |
28.581 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45113 |
17/12/1960 |
02/08/1988 |
27.644 |
1.652 |
|
|
28/03/1990 |
29.296 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45110 |
25/11/1960 |
27/07/1988 |
27.688 |
1.879 |
|
|
13/06/1990 |
29.567 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45115 |
21/12/1960 |
13/06/1988 |
27.496 |
2.008 |
|
|
16/06/1990 |
29.504 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45103 |
01/09/1961 |
02/08/1988 |
26.937 |
2.060 |
|
|
24/08/1990 |
28.997 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31292 |
30/11/1961 |
07/02/1990 |
28.208 |
0.603 |
|
|
09/1990 |
28.811 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26034 |
17/07/1959 |
08/09/1989 |
30.167 |
0.986 |
|
|
03/09/1990 |
31.153 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26031 |
26/06/1959 |
04/10/1989 |
30.296 |
0.923 |
|
|
06/09/1990 |
31.219 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20002 |
25/07/1957 |
19/02/1988 |
30.592 |
2.597 |
|
|
24/09/1990 |
33.189 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47093 |
01/05/1965 |
05/01/1988 |
22.696 |
2.797 |
|
|
22/10/1990 |
25.493 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47104 |
30/11/1963 |
10/06/1988 |
24.545 |
2.367 |
|
|
22/10/1990 |
26.912 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47124 |
01/02/1964 |
05/06/1989 |
25.359 |
1.386 |
|
|
24/10/1990 |
26.745 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47130 |
06/03/1964 |
04/03/1988 |
24.011 |
2.641 |
|
|
24/10/1990 |
26.652 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20005 |
09/09/1957 |
27/07/1989 |
31.901 |
1.359 |
|
|
05/12/1990 |
33.260 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20065 |
19/06/1961 |
08/01/1991 |
29.575 |
0.019 |
|
|
01/1991 |
29.595 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20193 |
25/02/1967 |
19/07/1989 |
22.411 |
1.493 |
|
|
01/1991 |
23.904 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26023 |
01/05/1959 |
21/09/1990 |
31.414 |
0.356 |
|
|
29/01/1991 |
31.770 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20217 |
25/11/1967 |
31/07/1989 |
21.696 |
1.534 |
|
|
11/02/1991 |
23.230 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20179 |
16/12/1966 |
28/02/1989 |
22.219 |
1.978 |
|
|
20/02/1991 |
24.197 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20086 |
18/09/1961 |
01/09/1988 |
26.973 |
2.488 |
|
|
26/02/1991 |
29.460 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20100 |
22/11/1961 |
05/05/1989 |
27.468 |
1.816 |
|
|
27/02/1991 |
29.285 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31231 |
13/10/1960 |
22/01/1990 |
29.296 |
1.142 |
|
|
03/1991 |
30.438 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20158 |
02/09/1966 |
18/05/1989 |
22.723 |
1.825 |
|
|
03/1991 |
24.548 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20224 |
07/02/1968 |
26/01/1990 |
21.984 |
1.121 |
|
|
11/03/1991 |
23.104 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08612 |
15/08/1959 |
21/09/1990 |
31.123 |
0.515 |
OC |
Old Oak Common |
28/03/1991 |
31.638 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08640 |
29/12/1958 |
14/11/1988 |
29.899 |
2.370 |
RG |
Reading (W.R.) |
29/03/1991 |
32.268 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08491 |
19/11/1958 |
29/09/1985 |
26.879 |
5.532 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
10/04/1991 |
32.411 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08354 |
05/02/1958 |
10/07/1986 |
28.444 |
4.773 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
17/04/1991 |
33.216 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08486 |
24/10/1958 |
27/11/1986 |
28.112 |
4.392 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
18/04/1991 |
32.504 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08488 |
31/10/1958 |
16/02/1986 |
27.315 |
5.178 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
21/04/1991 |
32.493 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08361 |
17/04/1958 |
23/02/1988 |
29.874 |
3.162 |
AF |
Ashford Chart Leacon |
22/04/1991 |
33.036 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33039 |
03/06/1961 |
18/05/1989 |
27.975 |
1.959 |
|
|
03/05/1991 |
29.934 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33043 |
08/07/1961 |
23/09/1987 |
26.227 |
3.630 |
EH |
Eastleigh |
10/05/1991 |
29.858 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33212 |
11/05/1962 |
11/09/1987 |
25.353 |
3.663 |
|
|
10/05/1991 |
29.016 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33107 |
03/09/1960 |
16/05/1989 |
28.718 |
2.003 |
|
|
17/05/1991 |
30.721 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33013 |
19/08/1960 |
14/03/1989 |
28.586 |
2.222 |
|
|
03/06/1991 |
30.808 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33031 |
01/04/1961 |
06/02/1989 |
27.871 |
2.340 |
|
|
10/06/1991 |
30.211 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08487 |
29/10/1958 |
23/02/1988 |
29.340 |
3.337 |
SF |
Stratford |
25/06/1991 |
32.677 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20006 |
16/09/1957 |
02/10/1990 |
33.066 |
0.732 |
|
|
26/06/1991 |
33.797 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08440 |
24/10/1958 |
03/05/1990 |
31.545 |
1.153 |
SF |
Stratford |
28/06/1991 |
32.699 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08930 |
24/04/1962 |
19/02/1990 |
27.844 |
1.353 |
SF |
Stratford |
28/06/1991 |
29.197 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20218 |
25/11/1967 |
04/10/1989 |
21.874 |
1.778 |
|
|
07/1991 |
23.652 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47544 |
06/06/1964 |
05/02/1990 |
25.685 |
1.403 |
|
|
02/07/1991 |
27.088 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33059 |
25/11/1961 |
27/09/1988 |
26.858 |
2.762 |
|
|
02/07/1991 |
29.619 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20034 |
12/03/1960 |
01/10/1990 |
30.575 |
0.759 |
|
|
05/07/1991 |
31.334 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20052 |
24/03/1961 |
17/11/1990 |
29.671 |
0.630 |
|
|
05/07/1991 |
30.301 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20114 |
08/02/1962 |
31/01/1990 |
27.997 |
1.436 |
|
|
09/07/1991 |
29.433 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08250 |
16/10/1956 |
30/11/1988 |
32.145 |
2.685 |
NC |
Norwich Thorpe |
07/08/1991 |
34.830 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33037 |
20/05/1961 |
23/09/1987 |
26.362 |
3.877 |
EH |
Eastleigh |
08/08/1991 |
30.238 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33055 |
04/11/1961 |
24/12/1989 |
28.156 |
1.622 |
|
|
08/08/1991 |
29.778 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20171 |
27/10/1966 |
08/12/1989 |
23.132 |
1.666 |
|
|
08/08/1991 |
24.797 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08461 |
20/08/1958 |
23/02/1988 |
29.532 |
3.460 |
SF |
Stratford |
09/08/1991 |
32.992 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08501 |
29/04/1958 |
15/07/1985 |
27.230 |
6.077 |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
11/08/1991 |
33.307 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08851 |
05/06/1961 |
07/02/1990 |
28.696 |
1.515 |
ML |
Motherwell |
14/08/1991 |
30.211 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20134 |
18/03/1966 |
19/07/1989 |
23.353 |
2.071 |
|
|
14/08/1991 |
25.425 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08458 |
12/07/1958 |
16/08/1988 |
30.118 |
3.000 |
SF |
Stratford |
16/08/1991 |
33.118 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20004 |
09/08/1957 |
11/10/1990 |
33.195 |
0.877 |
|
|
27/08/1991 |
34.071 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20030 |
31/12/1959 |
01/10/1990 |
30.773 |
0.904 |
|
|
27/08/1991 |
31.677 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08494 |
01/03/1958 |
16/08/1988 |
30.482 |
3.033 |
SF |
Stratford |
28/08/1991 |
33.515 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31173 |
25/02/1960 |
14/04/1989 |
29.153 |
2.422 |
|
|
09/1991 |
31.575 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31198 |
09/06/1960 |
16/03/1990 |
29.786 |
1.501 |
|
|
09/1991 |
31.288 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31260 |
23/02/1961 |
12/01/1990 |
28.904 |
1.674 |
|
|
09/1991 |
30.578 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31323 |
20/09/1962 |
08/06/1989 |
26.734 |
2.271 |
|
|
09/1991 |
29.005 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20026 |
04/12/1959 |
10/10/1990 |
30.871 |
0.896 |
|
|
02/09/1991 |
31.767 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37260 |
15/01/1965 |
21/08/1989 |
24.614 |
2.038 |
|
|
04/09/1991 |
26.652 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20129 |
12/02/1966 |
10/10/1990 |
24.674 |
0.912 |
|
|
08/09/1991 |
25.586 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20053 |
06/04/1961 |
10/10/1990 |
29.532 |
0.915 |
|
|
09/09/1991 |
30.447 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08843 |
20/04/1961 |
22/02/1990 |
28.863 |
1.567 |
LO |
Longsight |
17/09/1991 |
30.430 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37096 |
30/11/1962 |
27/02/1991 |
28.263 |
0.553 |
|
|
17/09/1991 |
28.816 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33022 |
21/01/1961 |
24/12/1989 |
28.942 |
1.751 |
|
|
24/09/1991 |
30.693 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45052 |
02/12/1960 |
08/06/1988 |
27.534 |
3.299 |
|
|
25/09/1991 |
30.833 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20044 |
24/11/1959 |
11/09/1989 |
29.819 |
2.041 |
|
|
26/09/1991 |
31.860 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45029 |
20/05/1961 |
14/12/1980 |
19.584 |
10.841 |
|
|
10/1991 |
30.425 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
97412 |
22/05/1962 |
08/1988 |
26.252 |
3.167 |
|
|
10/1991 |
29.419 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
97409 |
15/02/1962 |
07/1988 |
26.430 |
3.252 |
|
|
10/1991 |
29.682 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
97413 |
19/09/1961 |
26/07/1988 |
26.868 |
3.222 |
|
|
10/1991 |
30.090 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31225 |
15/09/1960 |
07/03/1989 |
28.493 |
2.608 |
|
|
10/1991 |
31.101 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31284 |
28/09/1961 |
30/08/1989 |
27.940 |
2.126 |
|
|
10/1991 |
30.066 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31464 |
11/10/1962 |
01/01/1991 |
28.244 |
0.786 |
|
|
10/1991 |
29.030 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08779 |
02/04/1960 |
23/02/1988 |
27.912 |
3.614 |
AF |
Ashford Chart Leacon |
04/10/1991 |
31.526 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08408 |
13/06/1958 |
29/04/1988 |
29.899 |
3.438 |
SF |
Stratford |
06/10/1991 |
33.337 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08820 |
27/08/1960 |
22/02/1990 |
29.510 |
1.622 |
LO |
Longsight |
07/10/1991 |
31.132 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20064 |
12/06/1961 |
14/09/1990 |
29.277 |
1.068 |
|
|
09/10/1991 |
30.345 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20136 |
31/03/1966 |
02/10/1990 |
24.523 |
1.019 |
|
|
09/10/1991 |
25.542 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20192 |
25/02/1967 |
11/09/1989 |
22.559 |
2.077 |
|
|
09/10/1991 |
24.636 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20147 |
23/06/1966 |
18/05/1989 |
22.918 |
2.397 |
|
|
10/10/1991 |
25.315 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20045 |
04/12/1959 |
10/10/1990 |
30.871 |
1.011 |
|
|
14/10/1991 |
31.882 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20054 |
12/06/1961 |
11/09/1989 |
28.268 |
2.090 |
|
|
14/10/1991 |
30.359 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20097 |
08/11/1961 |
11/09/1989 |
27.860 |
2.090 |
|
|
14/10/1991 |
29.951 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20130 |
17/02/1966 |
10/10/1990 |
24.660 |
1.011 |
|
|
14/10/1991 |
25.671 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45017 |
08/04/1961 |
01/08/1985 |
24.332 |
6.293 |
|
|
11/1991 |
30.625 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31124 |
30/07/1959 |
25/05/1990 |
30.841 |
1.477 |
|
|
11/1991 |
32.318 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45140 |
18/05/1961 |
29/03/1988 |
26.882 |
3.652 |
|
|
22/11/1991 |
30.534 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31170 |
11/02/1960 |
08/01/1990 |
29.929 |
1.934 |
|
|
12/1991 |
31.863 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31406 |
19/05/1960 |
04/01/1991 |
30.649 |
0.945 |
|
|
12/1991 |
31.595 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31208 |
14/07/1960 |
13/03/1990 |
29.682 |
1.759 |
|
|
12/1991 |
31.441 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45150 |
12/12/1960 |
04/02/1988 |
27.164 |
3.866 |
|
|
16/12/1991 |
31.030 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33016 |
01/10/1960 |
04/10/1989 |
29.027 |
2.277 |
|
|
13/01/1992 |
31.304 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47901 |
17/10/1964 |
01/02/1990 |
25.310 |
2.038 |
|
|
02/1992 |
27.348 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20040 |
30/10/1959 |
13/09/1991 |
31.893 |
0.392 |
|
|
03/02/1992 |
32.285 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45145 |
18/11/1961 |
23/02/1988 |
26.282 |
3.964 |
|
|
09/02/1992 |
30.247 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45033 |
20/07/1961 |
04/02/1988 |
26.562 |
4.019 |
|
|
10/02/1992 |
30.581 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45046 |
05/10/1960 |
02/08/1988 |
27.844 |
3.532 |
|
|
12/02/1992 |
31.375 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45124 |
04/05/1961 |
22/01/1988 |
26.737 |
4.066 |
|
|
14/02/1992 |
30.803 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45104 |
06/02/1962 |
13/04/1988 |
26.200 |
3.849 |
|
|
17/02/1992 |
30.049 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20173 |
08/12/1966 |
04/02/1991 |
24.175 |
1.041 |
|
|
19/02/1992 |
25.216 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20203 |
22/04/1967 |
07/12/1988 |
21.644 |
3.208 |
|
|
21/02/1992 |
24.852 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45141 |
31/12/1960 |
04/08/1988 |
27.611 |
3.614 |
|
|
03/1992 |
31.225 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45128 |
14/09/1961 |
22/04/1989 |
27.622 |
2.899 |
|
|
03/1992 |
30.521 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31226 |
22/09/1960 |
03/01/1989 |
28.301 |
3.197 |
|
|
03/1992 |
31.499 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31409 |
06/10/1960 |
04/01/1991 |
30.266 |
1.195 |
|
|
03/1992 |
31.460 |
Diesel |
BR |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25209 |
28/08/1965 |
17/12/1985 |
20.318 |
6.222 |
|
|
06/03/1992 |
26.540 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20021 |
20/10/1959 |
08/03/1991 |
31.403 |
1.025 |
|
|
16/03/1992 |
32.427 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47342 |
05/03/1965 |
25/11/1988 |
23.742 |
3.310 |
|
|
17/03/1992 |
27.052 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47189 |
21/04/1965 |
16/03/1989 |
23.918 |
3.014 |
|
|
20/03/1992 |
26.932 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47137 |
09/04/1964 |
03/08/1987 |
23.332 |
4.641 |
|
|
23/03/1992 |
27.973 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47645 |
06/02/1965 |
01/02/1990 |
25.003 |
2.203 |
|
|
04/1992 |
27.205 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47427 |
22/08/1963 |
05/02/1990 |
26.477 |
2.159 |
|
|
03/04/1992 |
28.636 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45136 |
02/03/1961 |
07/05/1987 |
26.197 |
4.926 |
|
|
08/04/1992 |
31.123 |
Diesel |
BR |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
33119 |
09/12/1961 |
26/10/1989 |
27.899 |
2.452 |
|
|
08/04/1992 |
30.351 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20023 |
13/11/1959 |
17/05/1991 |
31.529 |
0.899 |
|
|
09/04/1992 |
32.427 |
Diesel |
BR |
50 |
Co-Co |
50048 |
05/12/1968 |
15/07/1991 |
22.622 |
0.792 |
|
|
29/04/1992 |
23.414 |
Diesel |
BR |
50 |
Co-Co |
50003 |
12/01/1968 |
15/07/1991 |
23.521 |
0.795 |
|
|
30/04/1992 |
24.315 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
97411 |
19/08/1961 |
07/1988 |
26.923 |
3.836 |
|
|
05/1992 |
30.759 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45146 |
17/04/1962 |
07/04/1987 |
24.989 |
5.082 |
|
|
05/05/1992 |
30.071 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20093 |
17/10/1961 |
20/05/1991 |
29.608 |
0.964 |
|
|
06/05/1992 |
30.573 |
Electric |
BR |
81 |
Bo-Bo |
81004 |
04/05/1960 |
30/04/1990 |
30.008 |
2.060 |
|
|
21/05/1992 |
32.068 |
Electric |
BR |
81 |
Bo-Bo |
81015 |
05/05/1961 |
17/12/1984 |
23.636 |
7.452 |
|
|
29/05/1992 |
31.088 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20126 |
15/05/1962 |
18/09/1989 |
27.364 |
2.721 |
|
|
07/06/1992 |
30.085 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20226 |
07/02/1968 |
26/09/1988 |
20.649 |
3.704 |
|
|
09/06/1992 |
24.353 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20103 |
01/12/1961 |
08/03/1991 |
29.285 |
1.266 |
|
|
12/06/1992 |
30.551 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45126 |
12/06/1961 |
27/04/1987 |
25.890 |
5.148 |
|
|
18/06/1992 |
31.038 |
Diesel |
BR |
50 |
Co-Co |
50046 |
25/11/1968 |
25/03/1992 |
23.345 |
0.236 |
|
|
19/06/1992 |
23.581 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45148 |
04/12/1961 |
11/02/1987 |
25.205 |
5.367 |
|
|
23/06/1992 |
30.573 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20178 |
16/12/1966 |
18/12/1989 |
23.022 |
2.521 |
|
|
25/06/1992 |
25.542 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20157 |
02/09/1966 |
10/10/1990 |
24.121 |
1.712 |
|
|
26/06/1992 |
25.833 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45111 |
13/04/1962 |
07/05/1987 |
25.082 |
5.175 |
|
|
08/07/1992 |
30.258 |
Diesel |
BR |
50 |
Co-Co |
50018 |
11/04/1968 |
22/07/1991 |
23.293 |
0.981 |
|
|
14/07/1992 |
24.274 |
Electric |
BR |
81 |
Bo-Bo |
81018 |
13/06/1961 |
20/01/1986 |
24.622 |
6.488 |
|
|
15/07/1992 |
31.110 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85111 |
17/07/1961 |
01/03/1990 |
28.641 |
2.507 |
|
|
01/09/1992 |
31.148 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85102 |
26/11/1961 |
01/05/1991 |
29.447 |
1.340 |
|
|
01/09/1992 |
30.786 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85103 |
26/11/1961 |
01/05/1991 |
29.447 |
1.340 |
|
|
01/09/1992 |
30.786 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85105 |
27/10/1962 |
01/07/1991 |
28.696 |
1.173 |
|
|
01/09/1992 |
29.868 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85106 |
20/04/1963 |
01/10/1990 |
27.468 |
1.921 |
|
|
01/09/1992 |
29.389 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85108 |
26/10/1962 |
01/07/1991 |
28.699 |
1.173 |
|
|
01/09/1992 |
29.871 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85031 |
24/03/1962 |
21/05/1990 |
28.178 |
2.326 |
|
|
16/09/1992 |
30.504 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85038 |
01/11/1963 |
02/01/1990 |
26.189 |
2.729 |
|
|
24/09/1992 |
28.918 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85014 |
19/05/1962 |
16/10/1989 |
27.430 |
2.956 |
|
|
29/09/1992 |
30.386 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85104 |
17/01/1962 |
01/07/1991 |
29.471 |
1.255 |
|
|
01/10/1992 |
30.726 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85109 |
29/10/1963 |
01/07/1991 |
27.690 |
1.255 |
|
|
01/10/1992 |
28.945 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85110 |
29/09/1963 |
01/10/1991 |
28.025 |
1.003 |
|
|
01/10/1992 |
29.027 |
Electric |
BR |
81 |
Bo-Bo |
81021 |
04/10/1963 |
28/04/1987 |
23.581 |
5.444 |
|
|
05/10/1992 |
29.025 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85030 |
11/07/1964 |
11/09/1990 |
26.186 |
2.079 |
|
|
09/10/1992 |
28.266 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85037 |
05/02/1964 |
03/09/1990 |
26.595 |
2.107 |
|
|
11/10/1992 |
28.701 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85015 |
21/07/1962 |
08/09/1990 |
28.153 |
2.107 |
|
|
16/10/1992 |
30.260 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85002 |
03/06/1961 |
17/05/1989 |
27.973 |
3.427 |
|
|
19/10/1992 |
31.400 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20213 |
20/05/1967 |
12/04/1991 |
23.912 |
1.529 |
|
|
21/10/1992 |
25.441 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85018 |
02/02/1963 |
15/10/1991 |
28.718 |
1.041 |
|
|
29/10/1992 |
29.759 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85023 |
23/03/1963 |
02/04/1990 |
27.047 |
2.586 |
|
|
01/11/1992 |
29.633 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26028 |
10/04/1959 |
02/10/1991 |
32.501 |
1.096 |
|
|
05/11/1992 |
33.597 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45007 |
23/09/1961 |
27/07/1988 |
26.860 |
4.282 |
|
|
06/11/1992 |
31.142 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47343 |
10/03/1965 |
29/06/1992 |
27.323 |
0.367 |
|
|
10/11/1992 |
27.690 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45037 |
02/10/1961 |
27/07/1988 |
26.836 |
4.301 |
|
|
13/11/1992 |
31.137 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45012 |
28/07/1961 |
27/07/1988 |
27.016 |
4.310 |
|
|
16/11/1992 |
31.326 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85113 |
03/06/1961 |
01/11/1991 |
30.433 |
1.085 |
|
|
01/12/1992 |
31.518 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85112 |
07/12/1961 |
01/07/1991 |
29.584 |
1.422 |
|
|
01/12/1992 |
31.005 |
Diesel |
BR |
50 |
Co-Co |
50037 |
20/09/1968 |
09/09/1991 |
22.984 |
1.241 |
|
|
05/12/1992 |
24.225 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20070 |
30/06/1961 |
11/04/1991 |
29.800 |
1.660 |
|
|
07/12/1992 |
31.460 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85034 |
14/06/1963 |
17/10/1990 |
27.362 |
2.241 |
|
|
12/01/1993 |
29.603 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85026 |
27/09/1963 |
04/05/1990 |
26.619 |
2.701 |
|
|
14/01/1993 |
29.321 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85040 |
21/12/1964 |
28/10/1991 |
26.868 |
1.219 |
|
|
15/01/1993 |
28.088 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85008 |
23/10/1961 |
10/09/1990 |
28.901 |
2.359 |
|
|
18/01/1993 |
31.260 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85005 |
28/07/1961 |
25/05/1990 |
28.844 |
2.682 |
|
|
28/01/1993 |
31.526 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85114 |
17/04/1962 |
01/07/1991 |
29.225 |
1.592 |
|
|
01/02/1993 |
30.816 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08637 |
11/12/1958 |
09/08/1991 |
32.682 |
1.655 |
AF |
Ashford Chart Leacon |
04/04/1993 |
34.337 |
Electric |
BR |
83 |
Bo-Bo |
83015 |
20/06/1962 |
25/02/1988 |
25.701 |
5.153 |
|
|
20/04/1993 |
30.855 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08796 |
21/05/1960 |
04/05/1990 |
29.973 |
2.984 |
IM |
Immingham |
27/04/1993 |
32.956 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08399 |
16/05/1958 |
13/11/1992 |
34.521 |
0.460 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
30/04/1993 |
34.981 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85022 |
02/03/1963 |
19/02/1989 |
25.989 |
4.205 |
|
|
04/05/1993 |
30.195 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45120 |
20/07/1961 |
24/03/1987 |
25.693 |
6.159 |
|
|
19/05/1993 |
31.852 |
Diesel |
BR |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25080 |
19/10/1963 |
02/09/1985 |
21.888 |
7.740 |
|
|
28/05/1993 |
29.627 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85017 |
06/07/1962 |
04/08/1987 |
25.096 |
5.827 |
|
|
31/05/1993 |
30.923 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85107 |
10/09/1963 |
01/05/1990 |
26.658 |
3.088 |
|
|
01/06/1993 |
29.745 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45130 |
09/09/1961 |
10/05/1987 |
25.682 |
6.071 |
|
|
03/06/1993 |
31.753 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85013 |
01/05/1962 |
17/10/1990 |
28.482 |
2.647 |
|
|
09/06/1993 |
31.129 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85029 |
07/05/1964 |
17/05/1988 |
24.044 |
5.129 |
|
|
02/07/1993 |
29.173 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20202 |
22/04/1967 |
08/12/1989 |
22.647 |
3.616 |
|
|
20/07/1993 |
26.263 |
Electric |
BR |
83 |
Bo-Bo |
83009 |
25/11/1960 |
19/03/1989 |
28.332 |
4.384 |
|
|
05/08/1993 |
32.715 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47436 |
25/01/1964 |
09/12/1991 |
27.890 |
1.677 |
|
|
12/08/1993 |
29.567 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85020 |
19/01/1963 |
17/10/1990 |
27.762 |
2.822 |
|
|
12/08/1993 |
30.584 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20099 |
15/11/1961 |
04/02/1991 |
29.241 |
2.537 |
|
|
18/08/1993 |
31.778 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20143 |
06/07/1966 |
10/01/1992 |
25.532 |
1.619 |
|
|
23/08/1993 |
27.151 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20144 |
28/06/1966 |
08/01/1990 |
23.548 |
3.625 |
|
|
23/08/1993 |
27.173 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20046 |
12/12/1959 |
09/06/1993 |
33.515 |
0.233 |
|
|
02/09/1993 |
33.748 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20029 |
28/12/1959 |
05/07/1991 |
31.540 |
2.167 |
|
|
03/09/1993 |
33.707 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20112 |
26/01/1962 |
21/01/1991 |
29.005 |
2.627 |
|
|
06/09/1993 |
31.633 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20080 |
28/08/1961 |
10/07/1990 |
28.885 |
3.173 |
|
|
10/09/1993 |
32.058 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20182 |
16/12/1966 |
08/03/1991 |
24.241 |
2.512 |
|
|
10/09/1993 |
26.753 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20170 |
25/10/1966 |
15/11/1991 |
25.074 |
1.827 |
|
|
12/09/1993 |
26.901 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20013 |
26/11/1957 |
13/12/1991 |
34.068 |
1.797 |
|
|
29/09/1993 |
35.866 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20196 |
25/02/1967 |
28/04/1993 |
26.189 |
0.425 |
|
|
30/09/1993 |
26.614 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26046 |
30/10/1959 |
19/04/1991 |
31.490 |
2.493 |
|
|
10/1993 |
33.984 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20212 |
20/05/1967 |
05/07/1991 |
24.142 |
2.282 |
|
|
10/1993 |
26.425 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08761 |
01/03/1961 |
20/03/1992 |
31.074 |
1.540 |
ED |
Eastfield |
03/10/1993 |
32.614 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08744 |
18/11/1960 |
31/03/1992 |
31.386 |
1.512 |
LO |
Longsight |
04/10/1993 |
32.899 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08539 |
03/06/1959 |
31/03/1992 |
32.849 |
1.515 |
IP |
Ipswich |
05/10/1993 |
34.364 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20156 |
26/08/1966 |
05/07/1991 |
24.874 |
2.271 |
|
|
11/10/1993 |
27.145 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20198 |
22/04/1967 |
05/07/1991 |
24.219 |
2.271 |
|
|
11/10/1993 |
26.490 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20199 |
22/04/1967 |
18/06/1990 |
23.173 |
3.318 |
|
|
11/10/1993 |
26.490 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20078 |
28/07/1961 |
10/01/1992 |
30.474 |
1.756 |
|
|
12/10/1993 |
32.230 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20211 |
20/05/1967 |
05/07/1991 |
24.142 |
2.277 |
|
|
13/10/1993 |
26.419 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20122 |
22/03/1962 |
05/07/1991 |
29.307 |
2.282 |
|
|
15/10/1993 |
31.589 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20124 |
13/04/1962 |
07/06/1991 |
29.170 |
2.359 |
|
|
15/10/1993 |
31.529 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26039 |
04/09/1959 |
18/10/1990 |
31.142 |
3.008 |
|
|
20/10/1993 |
34.151 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08584 |
18/08/1959 |
23/08/1991 |
32.036 |
2.186 |
LA |
Laira |
29/10/1993 |
34.222 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08841 |
23/12/1960 |
14/06/1990 |
29.493 |
3.378 |
BS |
Bescot |
29/10/1993 |
32.871 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20174 |
04/11/1966 |
06/04/1988 |
21.436 |
5.614 |
|
|
11/1993 |
27.049 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08591 |
21/10/1959 |
26/02/1993 |
33.375 |
0.682 |
AY |
Ayr |
02/11/1993 |
34.058 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08857 |
10/07/1961 |
21/10/1991 |
30.301 |
2.036 |
BS |
Bescot |
02/11/1993 |
32.337 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20141 |
21/05/1966 |
15/11/1991 |
25.504 |
1.967 |
|
|
02/11/1993 |
27.471 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20210 |
20/05/1967 |
28/04/1993 |
25.959 |
0.518 |
|
|
03/11/1993 |
26.477 |
Diesel |
BR |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08791 |
07/05/1960 |
01/10/1994 |
34.425 |
-0.877 |
ML |
Motherwell |
15/11/1993 |
33.548 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20008 |
01/10/1957 |
20/02/1989 |
31.411 |
4.737 |
|
|
15/11/1993 |
36.148 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20009 |
08/10/1957 |
19/07/1989 |
31.800 |
4.337 |
|
|
18/11/1993 |
36.137 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47199 |
12/06/1965 |
20/07/1987 |
22.118 |
6.389 |
|
|
07/12/1993 |
28.507 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20068 |
26/06/1961 |
16/06/1987 |
25.989 |
6.482 |
|
|
07/12/1993 |
32.471 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20223 |
20/10/1967 |
10/11/1987 |
20.071 |
6.085 |
|
|
09/12/1993 |
26.156 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20089 |
03/10/1961 |
27/04/1987 |
25.581 |
6.644 |
|
|
16/12/1993 |
32.225 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20176 |
16/11/1966 |
21/10/1991 |
24.945 |
2.247 |
|
|
18/01/1994 |
27.192 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20010 |
16/10/1957 |
09/12/1991 |
34.170 |
2.115 |
|
|
19/01/1994 |
36.285 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20019 |
04/03/1958 |
15/11/1991 |
33.723 |
2.181 |
|
|
19/01/1994 |
35.904 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20011 |
29/10/1957 |
02/02/1987 |
29.282 |
6.970 |
|
|
20/01/1994 |
36.252 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20061 |
24/05/1961 |
21/01/1991 |
29.682 |
3.000 |
|
|
20/01/1994 |
32.682 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20106 |
12/12/1961 |
13/10/1993 |
31.858 |
0.293 |
|
|
28/01/1994 |
32.151 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45114 |
06/04/1961 |
17/02/1987 |
25.885 |
6.978 |
|
|
07/02/1994 |
32.863 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45013 |
24/02/1961 |
27/04/1987 |
26.186 |
6.795 |
|
|
09/02/1994 |
32.981 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45122 |
01/10/1960 |
27/04/1987 |
26.586 |
6.800 |
|
|
11/02/1994 |
33.386 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45137 |
23/11/1962 |
15/06/1987 |
24.575 |
6.753 |
|
|
03/1994 |
31.329 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45139 |
30/06/1961 |
27/04/1987 |
25.841 |
6.855 |
|
|
03/03/1994 |
32.696 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45062 |
30/05/1961 |
02/07/1987 |
26.107 |
6.677 |
|
|
04/03/1994 |
32.784 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45142 |
31/12/1960 |
18/06/1987 |
26.479 |
6.721 |
|
|
06/03/1994 |
33.200 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45076 |
30/12/1961 |
12/11/1986 |
24.885 |
7.332 |
|
|
11/03/1994 |
32.216 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45143 |
15/03/1962 |
07/05/1987 |
25.162 |
6.855 |
|
|
13/03/1994 |
32.016 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45058 |
22/04/1961 |
03/09/1987 |
26.384 |
6.534 |
|
|
15/03/1994 |
32.918 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45119 |
29/06/1961 |
07/05/1987 |
25.871 |
6.937 |
|
|
12/04/1994 |
32.808 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45138 |
25/03/1961 |
22/12/1986 |
25.762 |
7.315 |
|
|
14/04/1994 |
33.077 |
Diesel |
BR |
45 |
1Co-Co1 |
45134 |
09/11/1961 |
17/09/1987 |
25.871 |
6.663 |
|
|
05/1994 |
32.534 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31234 |
27/10/1960 |
11/06/1993 |
32.644 |
0.926 |
|
|
05/1994 |
33.570 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20160 |
19/09/1966 |
17/12/1990 |
24.260 |
3.381 |
|
|
04/05/1994 |
27.641 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20181 |
19/12/1966 |
12/11/1987 |
20.912 |
6.482 |
|
|
05/05/1994 |
27.395 |
Diesel |
BR |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25194 |
13/05/1965 |
03/06/1985 |
20.071 |
8.929 |
|
|
06/05/1994 |
29.000 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20140 |
21/05/1966 |
28/04/1993 |
26.956 |
1.047 |
|
|
15/05/1994 |
28.003 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20221 |
30/12/1967 |
10/11/1987 |
19.877 |
6.521 |
|
|
17/05/1994 |
26.397 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20220 |
25/11/1967 |
10/11/1987 |
19.973 |
6.523 |
|
|
18/05/1994 |
26.496 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20163 |
23/09/1966 |
25/09/1992 |
26.025 |
1.647 |
|
|
19/05/1994 |
27.671 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20148 |
27/06/1966 |
15/11/1991 |
25.403 |
2.523 |
|
|
24/05/1994 |
27.926 |
Electric |
BR |
85 |
Bo-Bo |
85028 |
17/08/1963 |
10/01/1990 |
26.419 |
4.373 |
|
|
25/05/1994 |
30.792 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47633 |
13/03/1965 |
01/11/1990 |
25.655 |
3.622 |
|
|
06/1994 |
29.277 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31305 |
26/04/1962 |
08/11/1991 |
29.556 |
2.603 |
|
|
06/1994 |
32.159 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26008 |
12/12/1958 |
12/03/1993 |
34.271 |
1.337 |
|
|
13/07/1994 |
35.608 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26021 |
17/04/1959 |
01/10/1991 |
32.479 |
2.874 |
|
|
08/1994 |
35.353 |
Diesel |
BR |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25305 |
01/07/1966 |
01/07/1983 |
17.011 |
11.132 |
|
|
08/1994 |
28.142 |
Diesel |
BR |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
97250 |
31/12/1966 |
12/10/1987 |
20.795 |
6.847 |
DY |
Derby |
08/1994 |
27.641 |
Diesel |
BR |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25314 |
23/11/1966 |
01/03/1983 |
16.279 |
11.466 |
|
|
08/1994 |
27.745 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20058 |
08/05/1961 |
28/02/1992 |
30.830 |
2.447 |
|
|
09/08/1994 |
33.277 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20185 |
25/02/1967 |
02/10/1992 |
25.619 |
1.871 |
|
|
16/08/1994 |
27.490 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26015 |
13/03/1959 |
23/06/1991 |
32.301 |
3.197 |
|
|
02/09/1994 |
35.499 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47518 |
12/08/1966 |
14/11/1991 |
25.274 |
2.915 |
|
|
13/10/1994 |
28.189 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47380 |
26/08/1965 |
30/07/1992 |
26.945 |
2.219 |
|
|
18/10/1994 |
29.164 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47381 |
02/09/1965 |
05/06/1992 |
26.775 |
2.455 |
|
|
18/11/1994 |
29.230 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47373 |
06/08/1965 |
05/06/1992 |
26.849 |
2.488 |
|
|
30/11/1994 |
29.337 |
Diesel |
BR |
47 |
Co-Co |
47094 |
11/05/1965 |
24/02/1992 |
26.808 |
2.781 |
|
|
05/12/1994 |
29.589 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26003 |
17/10/1958 |
04/10/1993 |
34.989 |
1.310 |
|
|
25/01/1995 |
36.299 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26027 |
06/06/1959 |
26/07/1991 |
32.159 |
3.515 |
|
|
29/01/1995 |
35.674 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26037 |
20/08/1959 |
04/10/1993 |
34.148 |
1.332 |
|
|
02/02/1995 |
35.479 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26005 |
14/11/1958 |
04/10/1993 |
34.912 |
1.362 |
|
|
13/02/1995 |
36.274 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26032 |
02/07/1959 |
04/10/1993 |
34.282 |
1.370 |
|
|
16/02/1995 |
35.652 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26036 |
14/08/1959 |
04/10/1993 |
34.164 |
1.378 |
|
|
19/02/1995 |
35.542 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20186 |
21/01/1967 |
23/07/1993 |
26.521 |
1.644 |
|
|
03/1995 |
28.164 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20151 |
12/07/1966 |
23/07/1993 |
27.049 |
1.622 |
|
|
07/03/1995 |
28.671 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20195 |
25/02/1967 |
23/07/1993 |
26.425 |
1.622 |
|
|
07/03/1995 |
28.047 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20028 |
18/12/1959 |
15/11/1991 |
31.932 |
3.312 |
|
|
08/03/1995 |
35.244 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26041 |
18/09/1959 |
24/11/1992 |
33.208 |
2.307 |
|
|
16/03/1995 |
35.515 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20025 |
27/11/1959 |
19/09/1991 |
31.833 |
3.493 |
|
|
17/03/1995 |
35.326 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20071 |
10/07/1961 |
23/07/1993 |
32.058 |
1.663 |
|
|
22/03/1995 |
33.721 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20082 |
31/08/1961 |
23/07/1993 |
31.915 |
1.666 |
|
|
23/03/1995 |
33.581 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20055 |
14/04/1961 |
23/07/1993 |
32.296 |
1.677 |
|
|
27/03/1995 |
33.973 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20090 |
29/09/1961 |
06/07/1993 |
31.789 |
1.726 |
|
|
28/03/1995 |
33.515 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20172 |
28/10/1966 |
11/10/1990 |
23.970 |
4.466 |
|
|
29/03/1995 |
28.436 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31264 |
13/04/1961 |
08/04/1991 |
30.005 |
4.022 |
|
|
04/1995 |
34.027 |
Diesel |
BR |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
20043 |
14/11/1959 |
27/06/1991 |
31.638 |
3.838 |
|
|
28/04/1995 |
35.477 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31212 |
28/07/1960 |
16/12/1991 |
31.405 |
3.414 |
|
|
05/1995 |
34.819 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31215 |
11/08/1960 |
04/06/1993 |
32.836 |
1.945 |
|
|
05/1995 |
34.781 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31221 |
01/09/1960 |
30/08/1991 |
31.014 |
3.710 |
|
|
05/1995 |
34.723 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31249 |
15/12/1960 |
16/12/1991 |
31.022 |
3.414 |
|
|
05/1995 |
34.436 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31223 |
08/09/1960 |
16/12/1991 |
31.290 |
3.499 |
|
|
06/1995 |
34.789 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26006 |
28/11/1958 |
06/09/1993 |
34.797 |
1.753 |
|
|
08/06/1995 |
36.551 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26042 |
25/09/1959 |
09/10/1992 |
33.063 |
2.677 |
|
|
13/06/1995 |
35.740 |
Diesel |
BR |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25206 |
09/07/1965 |
21/03/1986 |
20.712 |
9.258 |
|
|
21/06/1995 |
29.970 |
Diesel |
BR |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
26026 |
22/05/1959 |
24/11/1992 |
33.534 |
2.575 |
|
|
22/06/1995 |
36.110 |
Diesel |
BR |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25259 |
02/04/1966 |
03/09/1986 |
20.436 |
8.819 |
|
|
27/06/1995 |
29.255 |
Diesel |
BR |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25205 |
09/07/1965 |
09/05/1986 |
20.847 |
9.145 |
|
|
29/06/1995 |
29.992 |
Diesel |
BR |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25211 |
20/10/1965 |
25/07/1986 |
20.775 |
8.948 |
|
|
04/07/1995 |
29.723 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31156 |
23/12/1959 |
28/02/1992 |
32.205 |
3.548 |
|
|
09/1995 |
35.753 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31272 |
15/06/1961 |
15/08/1995 |
34.189 |
0.085 |
|
|
09/1995 |
34.274 |
Diesel |
BR |
31 |
A1A-A1A |
31159 |
31/12/1959 |
12/06/1996 |
36.474 |
0.008 |
|
|
06/1996 |
36.482 |
Diesel |
BR |
37 |
Co-Co |
37004 |
06/01/1961 |
12/06/1996 |
35.455 |
-0.022 |
|
|
04/06/1996 |
35.433 |